Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-11620

Pennsylvania Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Ashely M Chan
Case #: 2:23-ap-00052
Nature of Suit21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property
Case Filed:Jul 12, 2023
Terminated:Sep 13, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
CadleRock Joint Venture, L.P.
100 North Center Street
Newton Falls, OH 44444
Represented By
DAVID BANKS
Banks & Banks
contact info
Plaintiff
Frank A. Penna
1001 Limekiln Pike
Ambler, PA 19002
Represented By
WILLIAM D. SCHROEDER, JR
contact info
Plaintiff
Lisa Paone Penna
1001 Limekiln Pike
Ambler, PA 19002
Represented By
WILLIAM D. SCHROEDER, JR
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 1:10 PM EDT
Friday, September 13, 2024
court Close Adversary Case Fri 09/13 2:55 PM
Adversary Case 2:23-ap-52 Terminated for Statistical Purposes. (G., Jeanette)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2024
utility Disposition of Adversary Thu 08/29 10:39 AM
Disposition of Adversary 2:23-ap-52 settled. (Barbetta, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 08/02 12:35 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 08/01/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #6 )
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
6 6 1 pgs order Order on Generic Motion Tue 07/30 12:46 PM
Order granting4 Motion for Entry of Order Incorporating Agreed Stipulation. It is hereby declared and decreed that the attached "Agreement to Settle Adversary Action" is approved and made an Order of the Court. Per the agreement, this court order concludes the adversary action. (Barbetta, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
5 5 misc Certificate of Service Tue 07/23 10:56 AM
Supplemental Certificate of Service to Motion for Entry of Order Incorporating Agreed Stipulation Filed by WILLIAM D. SCHROEDER JR on behalf of Frank A. Penna, Lisa Paone Penna Related [+]. (SCHROEDER, WILLIAM)
Related: [-] 4
4 4 motion Generic Motion Tue 07/23 10:33 AM
Motion for Entry of Order Incorporating Agreed Stipulation Filed by Frank A. Penna, Lisa Paone Penna Represented by WILLIAM D. SCHROEDER JR(Counsel). (SCHROEDER, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Att: 3 Service List
Thursday, July 27, 2023
3 3 court Document Thu 07/27 3:24 PM
Waiver of Service of Summons by Jeffrey Sobeck, General Counsel for CadleRock Joint Venture LP Filed by WILLIAM D. SCHROEDER JR on behalf of Frank A. Penna, Lisa Paone Penna Related [+]. (SCHROEDER, WILLIAM)
Related: [-] 1
Thursday, July 13, 2023
2 2 court Summons Issued Thu 07/13 11:21 AM
1 Summons Issued to Plaintiff(s) to be served upon Defendant(s) CadleRock Joint Venture, L.P. Date Issued 7/13/2023, Answer Due 8/14/2023. (G., Jeanette)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 12, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 07/12 1:52 PM
Adversary case 23-00052 Complaint by WILLIAM D. SCHROEDER JR on behalf of Frank A. Penna, Lisa Paone Penna against CadleRock Joint Venture, L.P.. Fee Amount $0.00 . (21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)) (SCHROEDER, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B