California Northern District Court
Judge:P Casey Pitts
Case #: 5:23-cv-03487
Nature of Suit891 Other Statutes - Agricultural Acts
Cause07:499 Agricultural Commodities Act
Case Filed:Jul 13, 2023
Terminated:Oct 25, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 09, 2024 12:43 AM PST
Creditor
Dario Melgoza Farms
Represented By
Effie F. Anastassiou
Anastassious & Associates
contact info
Cross-claimant
HSBC Bank USA, National Association
Represented By
Tyler R. Ferguson
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Daniel D Queen
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Matthew Wargin
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Cross-defendant
Lyndsey Downs
Represented By
Paul Jeffrey Johnson
Diemer And Wei LLP
contact info
Kathryn S. Diemer
Diemer & Wei LLP
contact info
Jason R Klinowski
Klinowski Damiano LLP
contact info
Cross-defendant
J&L Downs LLC
Represented By
Paul Jeffrey Johnson
Diemer And Wei LLP
contact info
Kathryn S. Diemer
Diemer & Wei LLP
contact info
Jason R Klinowski
Klinowski Damiano LLP
contact info
Cross-defendant
Jerald Downs
Represented By
Paul Jeffrey Johnson
Diemer And Wei LLP
contact info
Kathryn S. Diemer
Diemer & Wei LLP
contact info
Jason R Klinowski
Klinowski Damiano LLP
contact info
Cross-defendant
Berry People LLC
Represented By
Paul Jeffrey Johnson
Diemer And Wei LLP
contact info
Todd Stephen Kartchner
Fennemore Craig, PC
contact info
Kathryn S. Diemer
Diemer & Wei LLP
contact info
Jason R Klinowski
Klinowski Damiano LLP
contact info
Defendant
Lyndsey Downs
Represented By
Paul Jeffrey Johnson
Diemer And Wei LLP
contact info
Kathryn S. Diemer
Diemer & Wei LLP
contact info
Jason R Klinowski
Klinowski Damiano LLP
contact info
Defendant
Jerald Downs
Represented By
Paul Jeffrey Johnson
Diemer And Wei LLP
contact info
Kathryn S. Diemer
Diemer & Wei LLP
contact info
Jason R Klinowski
Klinowski Damiano LLP
contact info
Defendant
J&L Downs LLC
Represented By
Paul Jeffrey Johnson
Diemer And Wei LLP
contact info
Kathryn S. Diemer
Diemer & Wei LLP
contact info
Jason R Klinowski
Klinowski Damiano LLP
contact info
Defendant
HSBC Bank USA, National Association
Represented By
Tyler R. Ferguson
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Daniel D Queen
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Matthew Wargin
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Defendant
L. Downs
Represented By
Jason R Klinowski
Klinowski Damiano LLP
contact info
Defendant
Berry People LLC
Represented By
Paul Jeffrey Johnson
Diemer And Wei LLP
contact info
Kathryn S. Diemer
Diemer & Wei LLP
contact info
Jason R Klinowski
Klinowski Damiano LLP
contact info
Intervenor Dft
J. Downs
Intervenor Dft
L. Downs
Intervenor Dft
L. L. Downs
Intervenor Pla
Veg-Fresh Farms, LLC
Represented By
June T. Monroe
Fennemore, LLP
contact info
Intervenor Pla
The Fresh Connection, LLC
Represented By
June T. Monroe
Fennemore, LLP
contact info
Intervenor Pla
S. C. Critchley, Inc.
Represented By
Jan Leslie Kahn
Kahn Soares & Conway, LLP
contact info
Intervenor Pla
Naturipe Farms, LLC
Represented By
Lawrence Henry Meuers
Meuers Law Firm P.L.
contact info
Intervenor Pla
Westlake Brokers, Inc.
Represented By
Lawrence Henry Meuers
Meuers Law Firm P.L.
contact info
Intervenor Pla
Interfresh, Inc.
Represented By
June T. Monroe
Fennemore, LLP
contact info
Intervenor Pla
Innovative Produce, Inc.
Represented By
June T. Monroe
Fennemore, LLP
contact info
Intervenor Pla
Hayton Farms, Inc.
Represented By
Adam Rosenberg
Keller Rohrback LLP
contact info
Juli E. Farris
Keller Rohrback L.L.P.
contact info
Intervenor Pla
Growers Union, LLC
6010 McPherson Rd., Suite D1
Laredo, TX 78041
Represented By
Justin Thomas Campagne
Campagne & Campagne, A P.C.
contact info
Kate Ellis
Mccarron And Diess
contact info
Intervenor Pla
Foremost Fresh Direct, LLC
Represented By
Jan Leslie Kahn
Kahn Soares & Conway, LLP
contact info
Intervenor Pla
Dole Diversified North America, Inc.
1553 Chester Pike, Suite 205
Crum Lynne, PA 19022
Represented By
Justin Thomas Campagne
Campagne & Campagne, A P.C.
contact info
Kate Ellis
Mccarron And Diess
contact info
Intervenor Pla
Carolina Blueberry Group, LLC
11421 Highway 701
Garland, NC 28441
Represented By
Justin Thomas Campagne
Campagne & Campagne, A P.C.
contact info
Kate Ellis
Mccarron And Diess
contact info
Intervenor Pla
Camposol Fresh U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By
Pamela Tahim Thakur
Thakur Law Firm, Apc
contact info
Intervenor Pla
Better Produce, Inc.
Represented By
Lawrence Henry Meuers
Meuers Law Firm P.L.
contact info
Intervenor Pla
Agricola Cerro Prieto S.A.
Represented By
Pamela Tahim Thakur
Thakur Law Firm, Apc
contact info
Plaintiff
Schwartzman Distributing, Inc.
Represented By
Craig Alan Stokes
Stokes Law Office LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
VO Produce, LLC
Represented By
Craig Alan Stokes
Stokes Law Office LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Walker Berry Brothers, LLC
Represented By
Craig Alan Stokes
Stokes Law Office LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Comercial Greenvic, S.A.
Represented By
Craig Alan Stokes
Stokes Law Office LLP
contact info

GPO May 21 2024
ORDER granting 155 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge P. Casey Pitts on 5/21/2024. (nmc, COURT USER) (Filed on 5/21/2024)

Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, March 27, 2025
253 253 order Abstract Issued Fri 03/28 9:54 AM
ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED in the amount of $233,774.28 against Berry People LLC re252 (kmg, COURT STAFF) Modified on 3/28/2025 (ecg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]