Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Judge:William C Griesbach
Case #: 1:23-cv-00936
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jul 13, 2023
Terminated:Aug 15, 2023

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Tuesday, August 15, 2023
8 8 order Judgment Tue 08/15 4:03 PM
JUDGMENT approved by Judge William C Griesbach on 8/15/2023. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party) (jmk)
Related: [-]
7 7 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee Tue 08/15 4:00 PM
SCREENING ORDER signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 8/15/2023 GRANTING2 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. It is further ordered that this action is DISMISSED for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. The clerk shall enter judgment accordingly. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party and officer in charge)(Griesbach, William)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 31, 2023
misc Initial Partial Filing Fee Received Mon 07/31 2:07 PM
INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE Received: $2.85, Receipt Number: GB 6191; the payment of all future filing fees will be maintained by the financial department. (jmk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 20, 2023
6 6 misc Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Thu 07/20 11:29 AM
Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Scott Paul Gandt. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (jmk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 18, 2023
5 5 4 pgs order Order Directing Prisoner Payment Tue 07/18 8:41 AM
ORDER that within 30 days plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $2.85 as an initial partial filing fee in this action, signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 7/17/2023. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party, Officer in Charge)(Griesbach, William)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 17, 2023
4 4 misc Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement Mon 07/17 11:49 AM
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Scott Paul Gandt. (lh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 13, 2023
3 3 misc Letter from Clerk re Consent to Magistrate Thu 07/13 12:07 PM
LETTER from the clerk to Scott Gandt re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. Also requesting that a six-month certified prisoner trust account statement be filed within 21 days. (jmk)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee Thu 07/13 11:59 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Scott Paul Gandt. (jmk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Note re Prisoner Trust Account
1 1 cmp Complaint - Prisoner Thu 07/13 11:57 AM
PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed against Katheryn Wegner by Scott Paul Gandt. (jmk)
Related: [-]