Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Sean D Jordan
Referred: Bill Davis
Case #: 4:23-cv-00649
Nature of Suit896 Other Statutes - Arbitration
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Jul 13, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 09, 2024 2:51 AM CST
Petitioner
Gina Caplan
gcaplan824@outlook.com 20 Rimwood Lane
Howell, NJ 07731
Petitioner
Joseph Caplan
20 Rimwood Lane
Howell, NJ 07731
Respondent
Bogota Savings Bank
Represented By
John Benjamin Lawrence
Baker Botts Llp - Dallas
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 09/03 4:08 PM
Pursuant to[LINK:General Order 24-06] , case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Bill Davis. Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson no longer assigned to the case. (mcg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 09, 2023
8 8 notice Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Thu 11/09 12:21 PM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Bogota Savings Bank identifying Corporate Parent Bogota Financial Corp., Corporate Parent Bogota Financial, MHC for Bogota Savings Bank. (Lawrence, John)
Related: [-]
7 7 respoth Response to Non-Motion Thu 11/09 12:04 PM
RESPONSE to1 Complaint,, and Motion to Vacate by Bogota Savings Bank.(Lawrence, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Kirstie Wallace,
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Wallace Declaration,
Att: 3 Exhibit B to Wallace Declaration,
Att: 4 Exhibit C to Wallace Declaration,
Att: 5 Exhibit D to Wallace Declaration,
Att: 6 Exhibit E to Wallace Declaration,
Att: 7 Exhibit F to Wallace Declaration,
Att: 8 Exhibit G to Wallace Declaration,
Att: 9 Exhibit H to Wallace Declaration,
Att: 10 Exhibit I to Wallace Declaration,
Att: 11 Exhibit J to Wallace Declaration,
Att: 12 Exhibit K to Wallace Declaration,
Att: 13 Declaration of Bruce H. Texter,
Att: 14 Declaration of Kevin Pace
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 11/08 9:46 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Caplan, Gina Caplan. Bogota Savings Bank served on 10/16/2023.(ch, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Monday, October 02, 2023
5 5 misc Non-Pris Pro Se Consent to Receive Electronic Notice Mon 10/02 3:17 PM
Non-prisoner pro se consent to receive electronic notice filed by Gina Caplan. (jmb, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 09/21 2:40 PM
SUMMONS Issued as to Bogota Savings Bank, mailed to petitioner for service. (daj, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 07, 2023
misc Filing Fee Received Thu 09/07 3:18 PM
Filing fee received: $ 402, receipt number 6-65505 (gsm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 13, 2023
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 07/13 3:42 PM
Case assigned to District Judge Sean D. Jordan and referred to Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson. (jmb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate referral
1 1 7 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 07/13 3:38 PM
PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD AND FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGEMENT ENFORCING ITS TERMS, AND SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF LAW, filed by Joseph Kaplan, Gina Kaplan. (jmb) (jmb, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Affidavit/Declaration of Gina Kaplan,
Att: 3 Affidavit/Declaration of Joseph Kaplan,
Att: 4 Proposed Order,
Att: 5 Request for Fiat Setting Hearing,
Att: 6 Affidavit/Declaration of Service (1),
Att: 7 Affidavit/Declaration of Service (2),
Att: 8 Affidavit/Declaration of Service (3),
Att: 9 Affidavit/Declaration of Gina Kaplan,
Att: 10 Rule 201. Judicial Notice of Adjudicative Facts,
Att: 11 Exhibit A,
Att: 12 Exhibit B,
Att: 13 Exhibit C,
Att: 14 Exhibit D
Att: 15 (7/13/2023) Civil Cover Sheet
notice Notice of Magistrate Availability Thu 07/13 3:43 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (jmb)
Related: [-]