New York Southern District Court
Judge:John P Cronan
Case #: 1:23-cv-06044
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e-2e Job Discrimination (Unlawful Employment Practices)
Case Filed:Jul 13, 2023
Terminated:Mar 20, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 09, 2024 3:54 AM EST
Defendant
Andy Finley
Represented By
Angela M. Wanslow
Paduano & Weintraub LLP
contact info
Lisia Lynette Leon
Paduano & Weintraub LLP
contact info
Defendant
Michael Strauss
Represented By
Caitlyn Claire O'Neill
Kaufman Dolowich And Voluck, LLP
contact info
Jennifer E. Sherven
Kaufman Dolowich & Voluck LLP
contact info
Erika Hannah Rosenblum
Kaufman Dolowich & Voluck LLP
contact info
Defendant
Vanguard Construction and Development Company Inc.
Represented By
Caitlyn Claire O'Neill
Kaufman Dolowich And Voluck, LLP
contact info
Jennifer E. Sherven
Kaufman Dolowich & Voluck LLP
contact info
Erika Hannah Rosenblum
Kaufman Dolowich & Voluck LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Socrates Soto
Represented By
Gregory Calliste, Jr
Phillips And Associates
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Thursday, March 20, 2025
56 56 2 pgs order Order of Dismissal Thu 03/20 12:22 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL The Court has been informed that the parties have reached a settlement in principle in this case. Accordingly, it is ordered that this action is dismissed without costs and without prejudice to restoring the action to the Court's calendar, provided the application to restore the action is made within thirty days of this Order in the event the settlement agreement is not completed and executed. Any such application filed after thirty days from the date of this Order may be denied solely on that basis. If the parties wish for the Court to retain jurisdiction for the purposes of enforcing any settlement agreement, they must submit the settlement agreement to the Court by the deadline to reopen to be so ordered by the Court. Pursuant to 3.G of the Court's Individual Rules and Practices for Civil Cases, unless the Court orders otherwise, the Court will not retain jurisdiction to enforce a settlement agreement unless it is made part of the public record. Any pending motions are moot. All conferences are canceled. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 3/20/2025) (jca)
Related: [-]