California Northern District Court
Judge:P Casey Pitts
Case #: 5:23-cv-03501
Nature of Suit195 Contract - Contract Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:Jul 13, 2023
Terminated:Oct 04, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 09, 2024 12:45 AM PST
Defendant
David Brown
Defendant
Scott Lamb
Defendant
Matthew Dean Petersen
Defendant
Derrick Raynes
Defendant
TruVision Health LLC
Plaintiff
Deborah Garcia
Represented By
Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Robinson Calcagnie, Inc.
contact info
Tracy Hughes
Robinson Calcagnie
contact info
Kevin Frank Calcagnie
Robinson Calcagnie Robinson Shapiro Davis Inc
contact info
Plaintiff
Tonya Mundy
Represented By
Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Robinson Calcagnie, Inc.
contact info
Tracy Hughes
Robinson Calcagnie
contact info
Kevin Frank Calcagnie
Robinson Calcagnie Robinson Shapiro Davis Inc
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
12 12 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 10/04 1:36 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by Deborah Garcia, Tonya Mundy (Hughes, Tracy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 31, 2023
11 11 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings Thu 08/31 2:24 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Case Management Conference. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/19/2023 is continued to 10/26/2023 01:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (nmc, COURT USER)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 15, 2023
10 10 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Tue 08/15 4:56 PM
CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/19/2023 at 1:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/5/2023. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges/pitts-p-casey-pcp/] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (nmc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 10, 2023
9 9 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 08/10 11:17 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge P. Casey Pitts for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 8/10/2023.(bw, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
8 8 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Thu 08/10 9:43 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND WILL BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 09, 2023
7 7 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Wed 08/09 4:19 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Deborah Garcia, Tonya Mundy.. (Hughes, Tracy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 27, 2023
6 6 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Thu 07/27 11:08 AM
2ND CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff(s) shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 8/10/2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 14, 2023
5 5 service Summons Issued Fri 07/14 3:01 PM
Summons Issued as to David Brown, Scott Lamb, Matthew Dean Petersen, Derrick Raynes, TruVision Health LLC. (jrs, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Fri 07/14 2:15 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/10/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/17/2023 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (jrs, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 13, 2023
3 3 misc Proposed Summons Thu 07/13 5:13 PM
Proposed Summons. (Hughes, Tracy)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Thu 07/13 4:50 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/27/2023. (bar, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 07/13 4:46 PM
COMPLAINT against David Brown, Scott Lamb, Matthew Dean Petersen, Derrick Raynes, TruVision Health LLC ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18447699.). Filed byDeborah Garcia, Tonya Mundy.(Hughes, Tracy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet