North Carolina Western District Court
Judge:Max O Cogburn, Jr
Referred: David Keesler
Case #: 3:23-cv-00422
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1693 Electronic Fund Transfers
Case Filed:Jul 13, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Aug 27, 2023 5:04 AM EDT
Defendant
Does 1-10
Defendant
Bank of America Corporation
Represented By
Amanda Leigh Groves
Winston & Strawn LLP
contact info
Elizabeth Jeanne Ireland, 28202
Winston & Strawn LLP
contact info
Defendant
Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By
Amanda Leigh Groves
Winston & Strawn LLP
contact info
Elizabeth Jeanne Ireland, 28202
Winston & Strawn LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Nadine Ballard
Represented By
Scott C. Harris
Milberg Coleman Bryson Phillips Grossman, PLLC
contact info
Marc E. Dann
Dann Law
contact info
Jennifer Sarah Czeisler
Sterlington PLLC
contact info
Brian D. Flick
Dannlaw
contact info
Israel David
Israeldavid LLC
contact info
Blake Hunter Yagman
Israel David LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, September 15, 2023
33 33 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Fri 09/15 3:31 PM
ORDER granting 30 Defendants' Consent Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending a Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. The parties shall file a joint Status Report on or before December 14, 2023, and every ninety (90) days thereafter. Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/15/23. (mga)
Related: [-]
32 32 transfer MDL Transfer Motion Fri 09/15 1:48 PM
Transfer Motion filed before the Judicial Panel MDL, Re: MDL Number 3088, MDL Title: In re: Bank of America Fraudulent Account Litigation to transfer for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings.. (brl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief,
Att: 2 Exhibits,
Att: 3 Proof of Service
Thursday, September 14, 2023
31 31 4 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Thu 09/14 8:17 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re30 Consent MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending a Decision By The Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A.. (Ireland, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
30 30 motion Stay Thu 09/14 8:12 PM
Consent MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending a Decision By The Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A.. Responses due by 9/28/2023 (Ireland, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, August 25, 2023
29 29 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Fri 08/25 3:03 PM
ORDER granting 28 Defendant's Consent Motion to Stay the Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint and Extending Briefing Schedule. Response to Motion to Consolidate and Appoint Interim Lead Counsel due 9/15/2023. Answer deadline STAYED pending ruling on Motion to Consolidate. Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 8/25/23. (mga)
Related: [-]
28 28 motion Stay Fri 08/25 11:57 AM
Consent MOTION to Stay re1 Complaint,26 Amended MOTION to Consolidate This Case with 3:23-cv-459 and 3:23-cv-491 by Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A.. Responses due by 9/8/2023 (Ireland, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, August 18, 2023
27 27 27 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Fri 08/18 4:59 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re26 Amended MOTION to Consolidate This Case with 3:23-cv-459 and 3:23-cv-491 by Nadine Ballard.(Dann, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 12 - Magers Class Action Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit 13 - Jones Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit 14 - Time Protocol
26 26 motion Consolidate Cases Fri 08/18 4:51 PM
Amended MOTION to Consolidate This Case with 3:23-cv-459 and 3:23-cv-491 by Nadine Ballard. Responses due by 9/1/2023 (Dann, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1- DannLaw Bio,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Sterlington Bio,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - LSB Firm Bio,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - RLF Firm Bio,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - WG Bio,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - Isreal Bio,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 - Milberg Bio,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8 - EW Bio,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9 - GS Bio,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10 - Pierce and Assoc Bio,
Att: 11 Exhibit 11 - Lyon Bio
Friday, August 11, 2023
notice Notice - Out of State Counsel Fri 08/11 7:55 AM
SECOND Notice to Jennifer Czeisler: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account[LINK:Link] . (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 8/18/2023. (rth)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 08, 2023
25 25 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 08/08 3:55 PM
ORDER granting 24 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re: 1 Complaint. Bank of America Corporation answer due 9/13/2023; Bank of America, N.A. answer due 9/13/2023. Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 8/8/23. (mga)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 07, 2023
24 24 motion Extension of Time Mon 08/07 5:06 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re:1 Complaint by Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A.. (Ireland, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
23 23 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 08/07 5:01 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bank of America Corporation. (Ireland, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 08/07 4:44 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bank of America, N.A.. (Ireland, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 08/07 4:38 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Leigh Groves on behalf of Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A. (Groves, Amanda)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 08/07 4:20 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Jeanne Ireland, 28202 on behalf of Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A. (Ireland, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 04, 2023
19 19 21 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Fri 08/04 5:03 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re18 MOTION to Consolidate This Case with 3:23-cv-00459 by Nadine Ballard.(Dann, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 12 - Magers Class Action Complaint
18 18 motion Consolidate Cases Fri 08/04 5:00 PM
MOTION to Consolidate This Case with 3:23-cv-00459 by Nadine Ballard. Responses due by 8/18/2023 (Dann, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - DannLaw Bio,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Sterlington Bio,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - LSB Bio,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - RLF Bio,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - WG Bio,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - Israel David Bio,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 - Milber Bio,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8 - EW Bio,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9 - GS Bio,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10 - Pierce and Assoc Bio,
Att: 11 Exhibit 11- Lyon Bio,
Att: 12 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Consolidate and Appoint Lead Counsel
Thursday, August 03, 2023
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 08/03 4:13 PM
ORDER granting 16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Jennifer Czeisler for Nadine Ballard (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 8/3/23. (mga)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice - one motion per atty Thu 08/03 2:36 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jennifer S. Czeisler Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-6169813. by Nadine Ballard. (Harris, Scott)
Related: [-]
notice Notice - Out of State Counsel Thu 08/03 4:15 PM
Notice to Jennifer Czeisler: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account[LINK:Link] . (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 8/10/2023. (mga)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 28, 2023
15 15 service Affidavit of Service Fri 07/28 1:42 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Nadine Ballard. Bank of America Corporation served on 7/24/2023, answer due 8/14/2023; Bank of America, N.A. served on 7/24/2023, answer due 8/14/2023.(Harris, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Tuesday, July 25, 2023
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 07/25 4:31 PM
ORDER granting 12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Israel David for Nadine Ballard (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 7/25/23. (mga)
Related: [-]
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 07/25 4:26 PM
ORDER granting 11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Blake Yagman for Nadine Ballard (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 7/25/23. (mga)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice - one motion per atty Tue 07/25 3:57 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Israel David Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-6157108. by Nadine Ballard. (Harris, Scott)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice - one motion per atty Tue 07/25 3:45 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Blake Yagman Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-6157098. by Nadine Ballard. (Harris, Scott)
Related: [-]
notice Notice - Out of State Counsel Tue 07/25 4:27 PM
Notice to Blake Yagman: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account[LINK:Link] . (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 8/1/2023. (mga)
Related: [-]
notice Notice - Out of State Counsel Tue 07/25 4:32 PM
Notice to Israel David: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account[LINK:Link] . (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 8/1/2023. (mga)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 20, 2023
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 07/20 1:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brian D. Flick on behalf of Nadine Ballard (Flick, Brian)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 07/20 1:09 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Marc E. Dann on behalf of Nadine Ballard (Dann, Marc)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 17, 2023
8 8 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 07/17 8:05 AM
ORDER granting 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Marc E. Dann for Nadine Ballard. Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 7/14/23. (mga)
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 07/17 7:48 AM
ORDER granting 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Brian D. Flick for Nadine Ballard (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 7/14/23. (mga)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 14, 2023
6 6 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice - one motion per atty Fri 07/14 3:59 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Marc E. Dann Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-6144646. by Nadine Ballard. (Harris, Scott)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice - one motion per atty Fri 07/14 3:56 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Brian D. Flick Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-6144644. by Nadine Ballard. (Harris, Scott)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 07/14 10:48 AM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 .(tlj)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 07/14 10:34 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nadine Ballard. (Harris, Scott)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 07/14 10:31 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Scott C. Harris on behalf of Nadine Ballard (Harris, Scott)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 07/14 10:45 AM
Case assigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr. and US Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the[LINK:Case Assignment Packet] . This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (tlj)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 13, 2023
1 1 17 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 07/13 9:22 PM
COMPLAINT against Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A. with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCWDC-6143274), filed by Nadine Ballard.(Harris, Scott)
Related: [-]