South Carolina District Court
Case #: 9:23-cr-00461
Case Filed:Jun 14, 2023
Last checked: Friday Jul 14, 2023 3:24 AM EDT
Defendant
Lorenzo Boles (1)
Represented By
Charles William Cochran
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Janet Carra Henderson
Us Attorneys Office (chas)
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/14/2023 4:17 AM EDT
Wednesday, June 14, 2023
2 2 INDICTMENT (Sealed Grand Jury Ballot attached) as to Lorenzo Boles (1) count(s) 1. (egra, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 GJ Ballot
5 5 ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF Arrest WARRANT as to Lorenzo Boles. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 06/14/2023. (egra, )
Related: [-]