Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:David S Cercone
Case #: 2:23-cv-01281
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1051 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Jul 14, 2023
Terminated:Nov 29, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 10, 2024 4:24 AM EST
Defendant
ELITE CASINO EVENTS, LLC
Plaintiff
ELITE CASINO EVENTS, LLC
Represented By
David G. Oberdick
Meyer, Unkovic & Scott LLP
contact info

GPO Dec 31 2025
MEMORANDUM OPINION resolving 19 Defendant's Motion for a New Trial Under Rule 59, which has been construed as a motion to lift default judgment. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 12/31/24. (mwm)

Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
29 29 1 pgs order Order on Motion for New Trial Tue 12/31 2:31 PM
ORDER denying19 Defendant's Motion for a New Trial Under Rule 59, which has been construed as a motion to lift default judgment. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 12/31/24. (mwm)
Related: [-]
28 28 6 pgs order Memorandum Opinion Tue 12/31 2:29 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION resolving19 Defendant's Motion for a New Trial Under Rule 59, which has been construed as a motion to lift default judgment. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 12/31/24. (mwm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
27 27 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 06/20 5:34 PM
ORDER GRANTING the25 Motion for Warren Norred to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kezia O. L. Taylor on 06/20/2024. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
26 26 misc Errata (to be used by filers) Tue 06/18 5:02 PM
Errata re25 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by ELITE CASINO EVENTS, LLC. Reason for Correction: Certificate of Good Standing. (Norred, Warren)
Related: [-]
misc QC - Generic (only use if no other QC events apply) Tue 06/18 11:16 AM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re25 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. ERROR: Certificate of Good Standing was not attached. CORRECTION: Attorney is advised to file a Certificate of Good Standing using the Errata event and link it to the Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (keh)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
25 25 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required) Mon 06/17 6:12 PM
First MOTION for attorney Warren V. Norred to Appear Pro Hac Vice, for Defendant (Filing fee $70, Receipt # BPAWDC-8316261) by ELITE CASINO EVENTS, LLC. Motion(s) referred to Kezia O.L. Taylor. (Norred, Warren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Affidavit
Monday, April 15, 2024
24 24 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/15 11:43 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jaden Hope Rankin-Wahlers on behalf of ELITE CASINO EVENTS, LLC. (Rankin-Wahlers, Jaden)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
22 22 misc Errata (to be used by filers) Fri 03/29 9:26 AM
Errata re21 Brief in Opposition to Motion, by ELITE CASINO EVENTS, LLC. Reason for Correction: Attorney signature missing required information. (Oberdick, David)
Related: [-]
misc QC - Attorney Signature Deficient Fri 03/29 8:45 AM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re21 Brief in Opposition to Motion,. ERROR: Attorney signature missing required information. CORRECTION: Attorney directed to comply with requirements of LCvR 5.2(B) and refile the document using the Errata event. (keh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
21 21 respm Brief / Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion Thu 03/28 4:06 PM
BRIEF in Opposition re19 Motion for New Trial filed by ELITE CASINO EVENTS, LLC. (Oberdick, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Exhibit,
Att: 8 Exhibit,
Att: 9 Exhibit,
Att: 10 Exhibit,
Att: 11 Exhibit,
Att: 12 Exhibit,
Att: 13 Exhibit,
Att: 14 Proposed Order
20 20 misc Proposed Order Thu 03/28 1:29 AM
Proposed Order re19 Motion for New Trial by ELITE CASINO EVENTS, LLC. (Norred, Warren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Friday, March 22, 2024
misc QC - No Proposed Order Attached Fri 03/22 9:53 AM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re19 Motion for New Trial. ERROR: Proposed Order, which is required for all motions in civil cases per Local Rule LCvR7, was not attached. CORRECTION: Attorney is advised to file a proposed order by using the Proposed Order event and linking it to the document in question. (keh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
19 19 3 pgs motion New Trial Thu 03/21 3:20 PM
MOTION for New Trial by ELITE CASINO EVENTS, LLC. (Norred, Warren)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 15, 2024
18 18 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Modify Thu 02/15 10:09 AM
MODIFIED ORDER AND ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINSTDEFENDANT, ELITE CASINO EVENTS, LLC granting17 Motion to Modify. Details more fully stated in Order. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 2/15/2024. (lyk)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 02/09 10:45 AM
Judge David S. Cercone presiding and Magistrate Judge Kezia O.L. Taylor referrred. Magistrate Judge Kezia O.L. Taylor no longer presiding. Motions referred to Kezia O.L. Taylor. (bjr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
17 17 8 pgs motion Modify Thu 02/08 4:23 PM
MOTION to Modify 12 Clerk's Entry of Default by ELITE CASINO EVENTS, LLC. (Oberdick, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 01/03 3:39 PM
This case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kezia O. L. Taylor pursuant to Administrative Order 2:23-mc-1237. Judge David S. Cercone no longer assigned to case. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sms)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
16 16 misc Patent/Trademark Documents - Judgment Wed 11/29 3:26 PM
NOTIFICATION of Decision sent to Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks re15 Order on Motion for Default Judgment. (keh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Order,
Att: 2 Docket Sheet
15 15 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Wed 11/29 9:41 AM
ORDER AND ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT, ELITE CASINO EVENTS, LLC granting13 Motion for Default Judgment. Judgment entered in favor of Plaintiff, Elite Casino Events, LLC and against Defendant, Elite Casino Events, LLC in the amount of $42,421.83. Details more fully stated in Order. Clerk to mark case CLOSED. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 11/29/2023. (lyk) Modified text on 11/29/2023. (keh)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
14 14 respm Brief / Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Mon 11/27 2:44 PM
BRIEF in Support re13 Motion for Default Judgment filed by ELITE CASINO EVENTS, LLC. (Oberdick, David)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Default Judgment Mon 11/27 2:39 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment against ELITE CASINO EVENTS, LLC by ELITE CASINO EVENTS, LLC. (Oberdick, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Proposed Order
Thursday, November 02, 2023
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 11/03 10:31 AM
This case has been reassigned to Judge David S. Cercone pursuant to Administrative Order 2:23-mc-1237. Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan no longer assigned to case. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sms)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
12 12 order Clerk's Entry of Default Wed 11/01 4:13 PM
CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to ELITE CASINO EVENTS, LLC (keh)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 30, 2023
10 10 misc Request for Default Mon 10/30 3:46 PM
REQUEST by ELITE CASINO EVENTS, LLC for entry of DEFAULT against ELITE CASINO EVENTS, LLC . (Oberdick, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
11 11 service Summons/Return of Service Returned Executed Wed 11/01 4:08 PM
SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by ELITE CASINO EVENTS, LLC. ELITE CASINO EVENTS, LLC served on 10/4/2023, answer due 10/25/2023. (keh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E
9 9 misc Affidavit Wed 10/11 2:27 PM
AFFIDAVIT re8 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,7 Errata,1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued by ELITE CASINO EVENTS, LLC Affiant: David G. Oberdick. (Oberdick, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E
Monday, October 02, 2023
8 8 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Mon 10/02 6:01 PM
ORDER GRANTING the6 Motion for Alternative Service of Process on Defendant. Service is permitted beyond the original 90-day period for an additional 30 days. Plaintiff may affect service upon Defendant Elite Casino Events LLC via at least one of the following: 1. Defendant's business email (Info@EliteCasinoEvent.com); 2. Regular mail to: Elite Casino Events, LLC 1001 Altamesa Blvd. Fort Worth, TX 76134 / Elite Casino Events, LLC 2205 North Henderson Avenue Dallas, TX 75206; and/or 3. Posting at the home address of Elaine Davidson, the CEO of Defendant: 1913 Windmill Hill Lane Desoto, TX 75115. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 10/02/2023. (jmb)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
7 7 misc Errata Fri 09/29 10:53 AM
Errata re6 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, ALTERNATIVE SERVICE OF PROCESS ON DEFENDNANT by ELITE CASINO EVENTS, LLC. Reason for Correction: Missing Exhibit. (Oberdick, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Proposed Order
6 6 motion Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies) Fri 09/29 8:48 AM
MOTION re1 Complaint, filed by ELITE CASINO EVENTS, LLC,2 Summons Issued FOR ALTERNATIVE SERVICE ON DEFENDANT ELITE CASINO EVENTS LLC by ELITE CASINO EVENTS, LLC. (Oberdick, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Proposed Order
Tuesday, July 25, 2023
5 5 2 pgs order Order Tue 07/25 12:30 PM
ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss, as more fully stated in said order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 07/25/2023. (jmb)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 17, 2023
4 4 misc Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)) Mon 07/17 10:39 AM
Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by ELITE CASINO EVENTS, LLC. (Oberdick, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 14, 2023
3 3 misc Patent/Trademark Documents - Complaint Fri 07/14 3:11 PM
PATENT/TRADEMARK DOCUMENTS ISSUED. (keh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Docket Sheet
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 07/14 2:15 PM
Summons Issued as to ELITE CASINO EVENTS, LLC (keh)
Related: [-]
1 1 18 pgs cmp Complaint (for Clerk of Court personnel only) Fri 07/14 2:14 PM
COMPLAINT against ELITE CASINO EVENTS, LLC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-7784349), filed by ELITE CASINO EVENTS, LLC. (keh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D
misc QC - Party did not file Disclosure Statement pursuant to LR 7.1.A Fri 07/14 3:15 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re1 Complaint. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement identifying all parent companies, subsidiaries, and affiliates that have issued shares or debt securities to the public as required pursuant to LR 7.1.A. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days under Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)). Disclosure Statement due by 7/21/2023. (keh)
Related: [-]