Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:23-bk-31633

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Christopher M Lopez
Case #: 4:23-ap-03124
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jul 13, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
F S I Construction, Inc.
4424 W. Sam Houston Pkwy N. Suite 440
Houston, TX 77041
Represented By
F S I Construction, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Elias Lee Hinojosa
3206 Spring Greens
Kingwood, TX 77359
Represented By
Wai Ping Cheung
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 06/26 11:33 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 06/26/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Generic Order
Monday, June 24, 2024
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Generic Motion (Adversary) Mon 06/24 2:12 PM
Default Judgment Related [+]. Signed on 6/24/2024. (zac4)
Related: [-] 12
Thursday, June 13, 2024
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 06/13 11:42 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 06/13/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Generic Order
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
14 14 misc Proposed Order Tue 06/11 2:35 PM
Proposed Order RE: proposed Writ of Execution - to be issued by Clerk (Filed By Elias Lee Hinojosa ) Related [+] (Cheung, Wai Ping)
Related: [-] 13 Generic Order
13 13 order Generic Order Tue 06/11 11:20 AM
Default Judgment Related [+]. Signed on 6/11/2024. (zac4)
Related: [-] 10 Statement
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
12 12 motion Generic Motion (Adversary) Tue 05/28 12:29 PM
Motion for entry of final judgment Filed by Elias Lee Hinojosa (Cheung, Wai Ping)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order final judgment
Thursday, May 16, 2024
11 11 misc Proposed Order Thu 05/16 3:00 PM
Proposed Order RE: Proposed Default Judgment (Filed By Elias Lee Hinojosa ) Related [+] (Cheung, Wai Ping)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,10 Statement
Friday, October 27, 2023
10 10 misc Statement Fri 10/27 4:42 PM
Statement Summary of Requested Attorney's Fees and Costs (Filed By Elias Lee Hinojosa ) Related [+] (Cheung, Wai Ping)
Related: [-] 8 Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Att: 1 Exhibit attachment: attorney activity log
Thursday, October 26, 2023
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 10/26 11:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 10/26/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Tuesday, October 24, 2023
8 8 order Default Judgment Tue 10/24 1:53 PM
Default Order Related [+]. Signed on 10/24/2023. (RosarioSaldana)
Related: [-] 6
Thursday, August 17, 2023
7 7 misc Certificate Thu 08/17 4:41 PM
Certificate Supplemental Certificate of Service (Filed By Elias Lee Hinojosa ) Related [+] (Cheung, Wai Ping)
Related: [-] 6 Motion for Default Judgment
6 6 motion Default Judgment Thu 08/17 4:17 PM
Motion for Default Judgment. Filed by Elias Lee Hinojosa (Cheung, Wai Ping)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - executed summon and certificate of service
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Texas Secretary of State Business Organizations Inquiry showing name and address of Defendants registered agent
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Thursday, July 20, 2023
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 07/20 1:53 PM
Summons Service Executed on F S I Construction, Inc. 7/14/2023. (Cheung, Wai Ping)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 14, 2023
4 4 court Summons Issued Fri 07/14 1:22 PM
Summons Issued on F S I Construction, Inc. Date Issued 7/14/2023. (TerriHanniable)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 13, 2023
3 3 misc Summons - Request for Issuance Thu 07/13 2:44 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons on F S I CONSTRUCTION, INC.. (Cheung, Wai Ping)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice Thu 07/13 2:31 PM
Notice civil cover page . Filed by Elias Lee Hinojosa (Cheung, Wai Ping)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint [system event] Thu 07/13 2:26 PM
Adversary case 23-03124 Nature of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Complaint by Elisa Lee Hinojosa Jr., Elias Lee Hinojosa against F S I Construction, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (Cheung, Wai Ping)
Related: [-]