West Virginia Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:David L Bissett
Case #: 2:23-bk-20117
Case Filed:Jul 14, 2023
Creditor Meeting:Aug 18, 2023
Terminated:Dec 05, 2023

Debtor
Contemporary Galleries of West Virginia Inc., Debtor
1615 6th Ave, Charleston, WV 25387 PO Box 2829
Charleston, WV 25330
Represented By
Emmett W. Pepper
Pepper & Nason
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Janet Smith Holbrook
Dinsmore & Shohl LLP 611 Third Avenue
Huntington, WV 25701
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
2025 Robert C. Byrd U.S. Courthouse 300 Virginia Street, East
Charleston, WV 25301


Docket last updated: 09/06/2023 12:53 PM EDT
Friday, July 14, 2023
crditcrd Auto Docket of Credit Card Fri 07/14 2:30 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK:2:23-bk-20117] ) [misc,volp7aty] ( 338.00). Receipt Number A4032075, Amount $ 338.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 45 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Fri 07/14 2:28 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition - all Schedules and Statements. Assets: $354,500.00, Liabilities: $1,093.453.39 (Pepper, Emmett)
Related: [-]