Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Denise J Casper
Case #: 1:23-cv-11596
Nature of Suit410 Other Statutes - Antitrust
Cause15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Case Filed:Jul 14, 2023
Terminated:Oct 27, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 10, 2024 4:18 AM EST
Defendant
Roadget Business Pte. Ltd.
Represented By
Harvey J. Wolkoff
Quinn Emanuel Trial Lawyers
contact info
Kevin Teruya
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
contact info
Immanuel Foster
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP
contact info
Zi Chun Wang
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan
contact info
Michael Ernest Williams
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP
contact info
Defendant
Shein Distribution Corporation
Represented By
Harvey J. Wolkoff
Quinn Emanuel Trial Lawyers
contact info
Kevin Teruya
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
contact info
Immanuel Foster
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP
contact info
Zi Chun Wang
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan
contact info
Michael Ernest Williams
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP
contact info
Defendant
Shein US Services, LLC
Represented By
Harvey J. Wolkoff
Quinn Emanuel Trial Lawyers
contact info
Kevin Teruya
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
contact info
Immanuel Foster
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP
contact info
Zi Chun Wang
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan
contact info
Michael Ernest Williams
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Whaleco Inc.
Represented By
Edward F. Haber
Shapiro Haber & Urmy LLP
contact info
Zhengping Lu
White & Case
contact info
Jack E. Pace, III
White & Case LLP
contact info
Holly Tao
White & Case, LLP
contact info
Sean Rodriguez
Boies, Schiller & Flexner LLP
contact info
Kevin C. Adam
White & Case, LLP
contact info
James P. Denvir, III
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
contact info
J. Mark Gidley
White & Case, LLP
contact info
Philip Korologos
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
contact info
Jeffrey Peter Waldron, Jr
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, October 26, 2023
51 51 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 10/26 6:03 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal / Joint Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 by Whaleco Inc.. (Adam, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
50 50 order Order Wed 10/25 2:02 PM
Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re49 Stipulation filed by Shein US Services, LLC, Roadget Business Pte. Ltd., Shein Distribution Corporation. APPROVED. Defendants will have until November 6, 2023 to respond to the First Amended Complaint, and Plaintiff will have until December 6, 2023 to respond to any filing made by Defendants in response to the First Amended Complaint. (Hourihan, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 24, 2023
49 49 misc Stipulation Tue 10/24 7:16 PM
STIPULATION re44 Amended Complaint and Proposed Order To Extend Time to Respond by Roadget Business Pte. Ltd., Shein Distribution Corporation, Shein US Services, LLC. (Wolkoff, Harvey)
Related: [-]