Tesla, Inc. v. CAP-XX, Ltd.
Texas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Rodney Gilstrap |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-00334 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 15:1126 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jul 14, 2023 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 10, 2024 3:13 AM CST |
Counter Claimant
CAP-XX, Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Tesla, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CAP-XX, Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tesla, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, March 01, 2024 | ||
30 | 30
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw
Fri 03/01 4:35 PM
ORDER granting29 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Withdraw . Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/1/2024. (nkl, ) |
|
Tuesday, February 27, 2024 | ||
29 | 29
motion
Withdraw
Tue 02/27 12:33 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION to Withdraw by CAP-XX, Ltd..(Truelove, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 1 pgs Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, February 07, 2024 | ||
28 | 28
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Wed 02/07 2:09 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul Isaac Margulies on behalf of Tesla, Inc. (Margulies, Paul) |
|
Monday, February 05, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Mon 02/05 9:36 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Ryan T Beard. (E-filers are reminded that they must also use their PACER account to submit an address change to the NextGen ECF system.) (Beard, Ryan) |
|
Monday, January 22, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
3
pgs
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 01/22 8:41 AM
NOTICE OF INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS PURSUANT TO P. R. 3-3 AND 3-4. by CAP-XX, Ltd. (Truelove, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, December 26, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 12/26 2:53 PM
NOTICE by Tesla, Inc. of Initial and Additional Disclosures (Gopenko, Daniel) |
|
Friday, December 22, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 12/22 2:20 PM
NOTICE by CAP-XX, Ltd. NOTICE OF INITIAL AND ADDITIONAL DISCLOSURES (Truelove, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, December 20, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
order
Protective Order
Wed 12/20 2:34 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER22 JOINT MOTION FOR ENTRY OF PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/20/2023. (ch, ) |
|
Tuesday, December 19, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 12/19 2:03 PM
JOINT MOTION FOR ENTRY OF PROTECTIVE ORDER by Tesla, Inc..(Smith, Melissa) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, December 18, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
9
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 12/18 4:50 PM
DISCOVERY ORDER granting19 JOINT MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/18/2023. (ch, ) |
|
20 | 20
order
Scheduling Order/Docket Control Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Mon 12/18 4:49 PM
DOCKET CONTROL ORDER granting18 JOINT MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DOCKET CONTROL ORDER Pretrial Conference set for 2/10/2025 at 09:00 AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Jury Selection set for 3/17/2025 at 09:00AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Markman Hearing set for 9/4/2024 at 09:00 AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap.. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/18/2023. (ch, ) |
|
Thursday, December 14, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 12/14 11:47 AM
JOINT MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DISCOVERY ORDER by Tesla, Inc..(Smith, Melissa) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
18 | 18
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 12/14 11:45 AM
JOINT MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DOCKET CONTROL ORDER by Tesla, Inc..(Smith, Melissa) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, December 04, 2023 | ||
minutes
Scheduling Conference/Case Management Conference
Mon 12/04 4:33 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Scheduling Conference/Case Management Conference held on 12/4/2023. Counsel for the parties appeared. Court asked whether they consented to trial before the U.S. Magistrate Judge. Court then gave counsel Claim Construction and Jury Selection/Trial dates. (Court Reporter Shawn McRoberts) (aeb) |
||
Monday, November 20, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Mon 11/20 1:21 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adam K. Yowell on behalf of CAP-XX, Ltd. (Yowell, Adam) |
|
Tuesday, November 14, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Tue 11/14 2:33 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Leigh Truelove on behalf of CAP-XX, Ltd. (Truelove, Jennifer) |
|
Thursday, November 02, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 11/02 2:27 PM
ORDER - Scheduling/Case Management Conference set for 12/4/2023 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/2/2023. (nkl, ) |
|
Tuesday, October 17, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
answer
Answer to Counterclaim
Tue 10/17 4:27 PM
ANSWER to11 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Tesla, Inc..(Gopenko, Daniel) |
|
Wednesday, September 27, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Readiness for Scheduling Conference
Wed 09/27 5:14 PM
NOTICE of Readiness for Scheduling Conference by Tesla, Inc. (Colvin, Matthew) |
|
Tuesday, September 26, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons
Tue 09/26 11:23 AM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by CAP-XX, Ltd. (Beard, Ryan) |
|
11 | 11
20
pgs
answer
Answer to Complaint Counterclaim
Tue 09/26 11:20 AM
ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Tesla, Inc. by CAP-XX, Ltd..(Beard, Ryan) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Tue 09/26 7:37 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alastair James Warr on behalf of CAP-XX, Ltd. (Warr, Alastair) |
|
notice
Notice of Magistrate Availability
Tue 09/26 11:32 AM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (nkl, ) |
||
Wednesday, August 30, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Wed 08/30 10:49 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Alan Colvin on behalf of Tesla, Inc. (Colvin, Matthew) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Wed 08/30 10:43 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel Robert Gopenko on behalf of Tesla, Inc. (Gopenko, Daniel) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Wed 08/30 10:39 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Aamir A Kazi on behalf of Tesla, Inc. (Kazi, Aamir) |
|
notice
Notice of Docket Correction
Wed 08/30 9:45 AM
***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. Document # 5, Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, ) |
||
Tuesday, August 29, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
notice
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
Tue 08/29 8:27 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Smith, Melissa) |
|
5 | 5
1
pgs
notice
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
Tue 08/29 6:50 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Smith, Melissa) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Jury Demand
Tue 08/29 6:22 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Tesla, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Tue 08/29 6:01 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of Tesla, Inc. (Smith, Melissa) |
|
Monday, July 17, 2023 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 07/17 8:30 AM
Case Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (nkl, ) |
||
notice
Notice of Magistrate Availability
Mon 07/17 8:30 AM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (nkl, ) |
||
Friday, July 14, 2023 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons
Fri 07/14 6:34 PM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Tesla, Inc. (Cordell, Ruffin) |
|
1 | 1
12
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 07/14 6:32 PM
COMPLAINT against CAP-XX, Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9601657.), filed by Tesla, Inc..(Cordell, Ruffin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet |