New York Southern District Court
Judge:Cathy Seibel
Case #: 7:23-cv-06135
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1442 Notice of Removal - Suit against Federal Officer
Case Filed:Jul 17, 2023
Terminated:Jun 18, 2024
Case in other court:Supreme Court Westchester County, 75052/2022
Last checked: Saturday Jan 13, 2024 3:58 AM EST
Defendant
Rite Aid of New York, Inc.
Defendant
Navitus Health Solutions, LLC
Defendant
Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Defendant
Novartis AG
Defendant
Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Defendant
Optum, Inc.
Defendant
OptumRx Inc.
Represented By
Steven Lawrence Penaro
Alston & Bird, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Defendant
Rite Aid Corporation
Defendant
Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.,
Defendant
Rite Aid of Maryland Inc.
Defendant
Navitus Holdings, LLC
Defendant
Sandoz, Inc.
Defendant
Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.
Defendant
Target Corporation
Represented By
Rory Collins
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Defendant
The Stop & Shop Supermarket Company LLC
Defendant
UnitedHealth Group Incorporated
Defendant
Wegmans Food Markets, Inc.
Represented By
Joshua Mark Agins
Hodgson Russ LLP
contact info
Defendant
West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.
Defendant
Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.
Defendant
Novartis Inc.
Defendant
Express Scripts, Inc.
Represented By
Ellison Sylvina Ward Merkel
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan
contact info
Haley Irene Plourde-Cole
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan (nyc)
contact info
Defendant
Ahold Delhaize USA, Inc.
Defendant
American Sales Company, LLC
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Defendant
Assertio Therapeutics
Defendant
Associated Pharmacies, Inc.
Defendant
Costco Wholesale Corporation
Defendant
Express Scripts Holding Company
Represented By
Ellison Sylvina Ward Merkel
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan
contact info
Haley Irene Plourde-Cole
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan (nyc)
contact info
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Defendant
Henry Schein Medical Systems, Inc.
Defendant
Henry Schein, Inc.
Defendant
Indivior Inc.
Defendant
KPH Healthcare Services, Inc.
Represented By
Zachary Martin Mattison
Sugarman Law Firm, LLP
contact info
Defendant
KVK-Tech, Inc.
Defendant
Kinney Drugs
Represented By
Zachary Martin Mattison
Sugarman Law Firm, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Koninklijke Ahold Delhaize N.V.
Defendant
Medco Health Solutions, Inc.
Represented By
Ellison Sylvina Ward Merkel
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan
contact info
Haley Irene Plourde-Cole
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan (nyc)
contact info
Defendant
Merck-Medco
Represented By
Ellison Sylvina Ward Merkel
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan
contact info
Haley Irene Plourde-Cole
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan (nyc)
contact info
Plaintiff
Madison County, NY
Represented By
Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Napoli Shkolnik
contact info
Paul Joseph Napoli
contact info
Shayna Erin Sacks
Napoli Bern Ripka & Associates
contact info
Salvatore Charles Badala
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Westchester County NY
Represented By
Shayna Erin Sacks
Napoli Bern Ripka & Associates
contact info
Salvatore Charles Badala
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Westchester County, NY
Represented By
Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Napoli Shkolnik
contact info
Paul Joseph Napoli
contact info
Salvatore Charles Badala
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Monday, February 03, 2025
52 52 10 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion Mon 02/03 6:17 PM
OPINION & ORDER re: (48 in 7:23-cv-06120-CS, 45 in 7:23-cv-06117-CS, 45 in 7:23-cv-06123-CS, 45 in 7:23-cv-06127-CS, 46 in 7:23-cv-06128-CS, 46 in 7:23-cv-06107-CS, 49 in 7:23-cv-06112-CS, 49 in 7:23-cv-06136-CS, 45 in 7:23-cv-06113-CS, 46 in 7:23-cv-06126-CS, 45 in 7:23-cv-06115-CS, 45 in 7:23-cv-06125-CS, 50 in 7:23-cv-06131-CS, 49 in 7:23-cv-06135-CS, 46 in 7:23-cv-06133-CS, 50 in 7:23-cv-06108-CS, 50 in 7:23-cv-06118-CS, 50 in 7:23-cv-06109-CS, 50 in 7:23-cv-06106-CS, 153 in 7:23-cv-06096-CS, 45 in 7:23-cv-06104-CS, 50 in 7:23-cv-06124-CS, 50 in 7:23-cv-06130-CS, 49 in 7:23-cv-06132-CS, 50 in 7:23-cv-06098-CS, 46 in 7:23-cv-06114-CS, 45 in 7:23-cv-06119-CS, 50 in 7:23-cv-06134-CS, 49 in 7:23-cv-06116-CS, 45 in 7:23-cv-06121-CS, 50 in 7:23-cv-06103-CS, 46 in 7:23-cv-06129-CS, 50 in 7:23-cv-06110-CS, 52 in 7:23-cv-06097-CS) MOTION for Attorney Fees . filed by Livingston County, NY, Yates County, NY, Chenango County, NY, Tioga County,, Schoharie County, NY, Orleans County, NY, City of Ithaca, NY, Town of Lancaster, NY, Rensselaer County, NY, Warren County, NY, Chautauqua County, NY, Clinton County, NY, City of Mount Vernon, NY, Cattaraugus County, NY, Steuben County, NY, Chemung County, NY, Madison County, NY, Schuyler County, NY, Saratoga County, NY, Hamilton County, NY, Town of Cheektowaga, NY, Cayuga County, NY, Otsego County, NY, Cortland County, NY, Genesee County, NY, Town of Amherst, NY, Essex County, NY, Town of Tonawanda, NY, City of Kingston, NY, Tompkins County, NY, Putnam County, NY, Franklin County, NY, Niagara County, New York, Westchester County. For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiffs' motions for attorney's fees are DENIED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to docket this Order in the above-captioned case and the thirty-three related cases (listed in footnote 1) and terminate the pending motions for attorney's fees in the same. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 2/3/2025) Filed In Associated Cases: 7:23-cv-06096-CS et al. (vfr)
Related: [-]