New York Southern District Court
Judge:Jessica G L Clarke
Case #: 1:23-cv-06149
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332nr Diversity: Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Jul 17, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Jan 13, 2024 4:00 AM EST
Counter Claimant
CIMABUE LTD.
Represented By
Scott W. Epstein
Antin Ehrlich & Epstein
contact info
Counter Claimant
Max Pincione
Represented By
Jeffrey A. Antin
Antin, Ehrlich & Epstein, P.C.
contact info
Scott W. Epstein
Antin Ehrlich & Epstein
contact info
Counter Defendant
CIMABUE LTD.
Counter Defendant
Ninotchka Manus
Represented By
Richard Paul Stone
Costello, Cooney & Fearon, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Max Pincione
Represented By
Jeffrey A. Antin
Antin, Ehrlich & Epstein, P.C.
contact info
Scott W. Epstein
Antin Ehrlich & Epstein
contact info
Plaintiff
Ninotchka Manus
Represented By
Richard Paul Stone
Costello, Cooney & Fearon, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
149 149 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 04/22 6:21 PM
STIPULATION IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, that the time for Defendants, Max Pincione, Cimabue Ltd., and Consulting Concepts International, Inc., to respond to the First Amended Complaint (Dkt. No. 142) is extended until the 21st day of May 2025. IT IS HEREBY FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED that Defendants agree to (i) consent to personal jurisdiction of the Court (ii) accept service of the First Amended Complaint in the above-captioned action, and (iii) waive all defenses to service of process. IT IS HEREBY FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED that Defendants will not raise an affirmative defense regarding improper service of the First Amended Complaint herein. Facsimile signatures shall be deemed as originals with the same full force and effect. SO ORDERED. CIMABUE LTD. answer due 5/21/2025; Consulting Concepts Intenational answer due 5/21/2025; Max Pincione answer due 5/21/2025. (Signed by Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke on 4/22/2025) (jca)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
148 148 misc Proposed Stipulation and Order Mon 04/21 4:01 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Ninotchka Manus. Related [+]
Related: [-] ich, Carter
147 147 misc Proposed Case Management Plan Mon 04/21 3:57 PM
PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Ninotchka Manus. Related [+]
Related: [-] ich, Carter
Thursday, April 17, 2025
146 146 service Summons Issued Thu 04/17 2:42 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Norah Al Saud..(jgo)
Related: [-]
145 145 service Summons Issued Thu 04/17 2:41 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Belperron Jewelers..(jgo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
144 144 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 04/16 6:28 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Norah Al Saud a/k/a Nourah Bint Saad, re:142 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Ninotchka Manus. Related [+]
Related: [-] ich, Carter
143 143 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 04/16 6:27 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Belperron Jewelers, re:142 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Ninotchka Manus. Related [+]
Related: [-] ich, Carter
142 142 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 04/16 6:26 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending139 Amended Complaint, against ABC Corps 1-5, Norah Al Saud, Belperron Jewelers, CIMABUE LTD., Consulting Concepts Intenational, JOHN/JANE DOES 1-5, Emerald, diamond and platinum ring by Harry Winston : (AGL Certificate Number 1106498), Max Pincione.Document filed by Ninotchka Manus. Related document:139 Amended Complaint,. Related [+]
Related: [-] ich, Carter
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Wed 04/16 3:40 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Carter August Reich to RE-FILE re: Document No. 139 Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected; Cimabue LTD must be added as a Defendant, Emerald, diamond and platinum ring by Harry Winston, Does 1-5 and ABC Corps 1-5 must be added. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (sj)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 04/16 3:42 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Carter August Reich to RE-FILE Document No. 140 Request for Issuance of Summons, 141 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The summons requested was not processed due to the deficient pleading. Please file your request for summons when you correct and refile your pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
Related: [-]
utility Add Party for Pleading Wed 04/16 6:25 PM
ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents CIMABUE LTD., Emerald, diamond and platinum ring by Harry Winston : (AGL Certificate Number 1106498), JOHN/JANE DOES 1-5, ABC Corps 1-5 added. Party added pursuant to139 Amended Complaint,.Document filed by Ninotchka Manus. Related document:139 Amended Complaint,. Related [+]
Related: [-] ich, Carter
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
141 141 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 04/15 6:27 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Norah Al Saud a/k/a Nourah Bint Saad, re:139 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Ninotchka Manus. Related [+]
Related: [-] ich, Carter
140 140 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 04/15 6:27 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Belperron Jewelers, re:139 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Ninotchka Manus. Related [+]
Related: [-] ich, Carter
139 139 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 04/15 6:24 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending136 Amended Complaint, against Norah Al Saud, Belperron Jewelers, CIMABUE LTD., Consulting Concepts Intenational, Max Pincione.Document filed by Ninotchka Manus. Related document:136 Amended Complaint,. Related [+]
Related: [-] ich, Carter
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Tue 04/15 1:36 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Carter August Reich to RE-FILE re: Document No. 136 Amended Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected; Add Cimabue LTD to CM ECF as a defendant. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 04/15 1:36 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Carter August Reich to RE-FILE Document No. 138 Request for Issuance of Summons, 137 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The summons requested was not processed due to the deficient pleading. Please file your request for summons when you correct and refile your pleading.. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Add Party for Pleading Tue 04/15 6:20 PM
ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents CIMABUE LTD. added. Party added pursuant to136 Amended Complaint,.Document filed by Ninotchka Manus. Related document:136 Amended Complaint,. Related [+]
Related: [-] ich, Carter