Arizona District Court
Judge:Diane J Humetewa
Case #: 2:23-cv-01402
Nature of Suit380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Jul 17, 2023
Terminated:Jul 23, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jan 13, 2024 1:43 AM MST
Defendant
Holly Crea
Represented By
Kyle Banfield
Carpenter Hazlewood Delgado & Bolen Llp - Tempe
contact info
Chad Philip Miesen
Carpenter Hazlewood Delgado & Bolen Llp - Tempe
contact info
Defendant
Eric Tune
Represented By
Kyle Banfield
Carpenter Hazlewood Delgado & Bolen Llp - Tempe
contact info
Chad Philip Miesen
Carpenter Hazlewood Delgado & Bolen Llp - Tempe
contact info
Defendant
Paul Lillis
Represented By
Kyle Banfield
Carpenter Hazlewood Delgado & Bolen Llp - Tempe
contact info
Chad Philip Miesen
Carpenter Hazlewood Delgado & Bolen Llp - Tempe
contact info
Defendant
DMB Mesa Proving Grounds LLC
Represented By
Jennifer Hadley Catero
Snell & Wilmer Llp - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Robert Arthur Henry
Snell & Wilmer Llp - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Defendant
DMB Associates Incorporated
Represented By
Jennifer Hadley Catero
Snell & Wilmer Llp - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Robert Arthur Henry
Snell & Wilmer Llp - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Defendant
Christina Christian
Represented By
Kyle Banfield
Carpenter Hazlewood Delgado & Bolen Llp - Tempe
contact info
Chad Philip Miesen
Carpenter Hazlewood Delgado & Bolen Llp - Tempe
contact info
Defendant
Brookfield Residential Properties ULC
Represented By
Jennifer Hadley Catero
Snell & Wilmer Llp - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Robert Arthur Henry
Snell & Wilmer Llp - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Defendant
Brookfield Residential (Arizona) LLC
Represented By
Jennifer Hadley Catero
Snell & Wilmer Llp - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Robert Arthur Henry
Snell & Wilmer Llp - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Defendant
Brookfield Eastmark LLC
Represented By
Jennifer Hadley Catero
Snell & Wilmer Llp - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Robert Arthur Henry
Snell & Wilmer Llp - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Defendant
Tom Bongiorno
Represented By
Kyle Banfield
Carpenter Hazlewood Delgado & Bolen Llp - Tempe
contact info
Chad Philip Miesen
Carpenter Hazlewood Delgado & Bolen Llp - Tempe
contact info
Defendant
DMB/Brookfield Eastmark LLC
Represented By
Jennifer Hadley Catero
Snell & Wilmer Llp - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Robert Arthur Henry
Snell & Wilmer Llp - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Plaintiff
Breanna Brinton- Rodriguez
Represented By
Ron Kilgard
Keller Rohrback Llp - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Daniel Mogin
Mogin Rubin LLP
contact info
Gary A Gotto
Keller Rohrback Llp - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Daniel J Mogin
Mogin Rubin LLP
contact info
Timothy Z LaComb
Mogin Rubin LLP
contact info
Tim LaComb
Mogin Rubin LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Rachel Archibald
Represented By
Ron Kilgard
Keller Rohrback Llp - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Daniel Mogin
Mogin Rubin LLP
contact info
Gary A Gotto
Keller Rohrback Llp - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Daniel J Mogin
Mogin Rubin LLP
contact info
Timothy Z LaComb
Mogin Rubin LLP
contact info
Tim LaComb
Mogin Rubin LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Monica Miller
Represented By
Ron Kilgard
Keller Rohrback Llp - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Daniel Mogin
Mogin Rubin LLP
contact info
Gary A Gotto
Keller Rohrback Llp - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Daniel J Mogin
Mogin Rubin LLP
contact info
Timothy Z LaComb
Mogin Rubin LLP
contact info
Tim LaComb
Mogin Rubin LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Travis Miller
Represented By
Ron Kilgard
Keller Rohrback Llp - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Daniel Mogin
Mogin Rubin LLP
contact info
Gary A Gotto
Keller Rohrback Llp - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Daniel J Mogin
Mogin Rubin LLP
contact info
Timothy Z LaComb
Mogin Rubin LLP
contact info
Tim LaComb
Mogin Rubin LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Osvaldo Rodriguez
Represented By
Ron Kilgard
Keller Rohrback Llp - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Daniel Mogin
Mogin Rubin LLP
contact info
Gary A Gotto
Keller Rohrback Llp - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Daniel J Mogin
Mogin Rubin LLP
contact info
Timothy Z LaComb
Mogin Rubin LLP
contact info
Tim LaComb
Mogin Rubin LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Dirk Shupe
Represented By
Ron Kilgard
Keller Rohrback Llp - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Daniel Mogin
Mogin Rubin LLP
contact info
Gary A Gotto
Keller Rohrback Llp - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Daniel J Mogin
Mogin Rubin LLP
contact info
Timothy Z LaComb
Mogin Rubin LLP
contact info
Tim LaComb
Mogin Rubin LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM MST
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
52 52 27 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 07/23 3:00 PM
ORDER granting31 ,32 Motions Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims and Compel Arbitration. Plaintiffs are compelled to arbitrate their claims on an individual basis according to the Section 11.2 Arbitration Agreement. This matter is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 7/23/24. (DXD)
Related: [-]