New York Southern District Court
Judge:Lorna G Schofield
Case #: 1:23-cv-06143
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity Action
Case Filed:Jul 16, 2023
Re-opened:Jan 25, 2024
Terminated:Feb 21, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jan 13, 2024 4:01 AM EST
Defendant
Manhattan Institute for Policy Research
Plaintiff
Oliver D. Smith


Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, March 08, 2024
20 20 service Marshal's Process Receipt and Return of Service Executed Complaints Thu 03/14 11:41 AM
MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Summons and Complaint served. Manhattan Institute for Policy Research served on 3/1/2024, answer due 3/22/2024. Service was accepted by Manhattan Inst. of Policy Research(no person listed)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
19 19 order Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Signed ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Wed 02/21 12:47 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that Plaintiff Oliver D. Smith ("Smith"), appearing pro se, hereby dismisses this action with prejudice and, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), against Defendant Manhattan Institute for Policy Research ("MI"). Each party to bear its own expenses, costs, and attorneys' fees. Defendant MI has not answered the Complaint, nor filed a motion for Summary Judgment. Accordingly, Plaintiff may dismiss MI without further Order of this Court. The Plaintiff has reached a private out of court settlement agreement with MI. So Ordered. Manhattan Institute for Policy Research terminated. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 2/21/2024) (mml)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
misc Notice to Court Regarding Voluntary Dismissal Tue 02/20 10:19 AM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. 18 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge Lorna G. Schofield for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal in a Pro Se case. (km)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
18 18 1 pgs notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 01/25 3:30 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL, pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Manhattan Institute for Policy Research. Document filed by Oliver D. Smith. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). (sc) Modified on 1/25/2024 (nb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
17 17 misc FRCP 4 Service Package - Mailed Wed 01/17 4:39 PM
INFORMATION PACKAGE MAILED to Oliver D. Smith at 7 Aldenham Road Radlett, Herfordshire WD7 8AU, England, on 1/17/2024 Re:15 Order of Service, Terminate Motions. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a flyer about the free legal assistance clinic located in the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse (only in non prisoner cases), a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge, a form for you to complete if you consent to receive filings electronically (only in nonprisoner cases).(sha)
Related: [-]
16 16 service Summons Issued Wed 01/17 4:32 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Manhattan Institute for Policy Research. (sha)
Related: [-]
misc FRCP 4 Service Package - Hand Delivered to U.S.M. Wed 01/17 4:34 PM
FRCP 4 SERVICE PACKAGE HAND DELIVERED TO U.S.M.: on 1/12/2024 Re: Judge Lorna G. Schofield15 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: Complaint, Summons, IFP, Order of Service, Completed U.S.M. form(s) for defendant(s) Manhattan Institute for Policy Research. (sha)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
15 15 4 pgs order Order of Service ~Util - Terminate Motions Fri 01/05 4:34 PM
ORDER OF SERVICE: The Clerk of Court is instructed to issue a summons for Manhattan Institute for Policy Research, complete the USM-285 form with the address for this Defendant, and deliver all documents necessary to effect service to the U.S. Marshals Service. Plaintiff's request for counsel (ECF No. 10) is denied without prejudice to renewal at a later date. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail an information package to Plaintiff. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore IFP status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). SO ORDERED. Motions terminated:10 APPLICATION for the Court to Request Counsel filed by Oliver D. Smith. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/5/2024) (mml)
Related: [-]
14 14 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing Fri 01/05 4:28 PM
MEMO ENDORSED ORDER terminating5 Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing; granting9 Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to permit Plaintiff access to the electronic case filing system. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/5/2024) (mml)
Related: [-]
13 13 3 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Fri 01/05 11:59 AM
ORDER: Initial Conference set for 3/6/2024 at 04:20 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. The parties shall call (888) 363-4749 and enter the access code 558-3333. The telephonic conference is public, and the time of the conference is approximate, but the parties shall be ready to proceed by that time. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/5/2024) (vfr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2024
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment Thu 01/04 4:06 PM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (va)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Thu 01/04 4:07 PM
Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (va)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 12/12 4:10 PM
NOTICE OF PRO SE APPEARANCE by Oliver D. Smith. (sc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
10 10 motion Court to Request Counsel Thu 09/14 12:20 PM
APPLICATION, Re: for the Court to Request Pro Bono Counsel. Document filed by Oliver D. Smith.(sc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 30, 2023
9 9 motion Permission for Electronic Case Filing Thu 08/31 10:58 AM
MOTIO Related [+]FOR PERMISSION FOR ELECTRONIC CASE FILING, Re: for Permission for Oliver Smith to participate in electronic case filing in this case. Document filed by Oliver D. Smith.(sc)
Related: [-] vised
8 8 notice Notice (Other) Thu 08/31 9:28 AM
(REMARK)NOTICE, Re: that the plaintiff has filed another Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing. The original filed motion on 7/16/23 did not use a print-out of the following form, so I have now corrected this if there was any error Document filed by Oliver D. Smith. (sc)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 07, 2023
7 7 misc Remark Mon 08/07 12:52 PM
REQUEST FOR SERVICE MATERIALS. Document filed by Oliver D. Smith. (sc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
Monday, July 31, 2023
6 6 1 pgs order Order Granting IFP Application Mon 07/31 5:26 PM
ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. § 1915. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/31/2023) (vn)
Related: [-]
Sunday, July 16, 2023
5 5 motion Permission for Electronic Case Filing Mon 07/17 3:05 PM
MOTION for Permission for Oliver D. Smith to participate in electronic case filing in this case. Document filed by Oliver D. Smith..(rdz)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Pro Se Consent to Receive Electronic Service Mon 07/17 3:03 PM
PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Oliver D. Smith consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Oliver D. Smith..(rdz)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 07/17 3:01 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET.(rdz)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 07/17 3:00 PM
REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Oliver D. Smith..(rdz)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 07/17 2:58 PM
COMPLAINT against Manhattan Institute for Policy Research. Document filed by Oliver D. Smith..(rdz)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 07/17 2:58 PM
Case Designated ECF. (rdz)
Related: [-]