Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Thomas W Thrash, Jr
Referred: J Elizabeth Mcbath
Case #: 1:23-cv-03135
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex)
Case Filed:Jul 15, 2023
Terminated:Sep 30, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Jan 11, 2024 3:51 AM EST
Defendant
CFSI Loan Management Company
Represented By
Stephen W. Mooney
Weinberg Wheeler Hudgins Gunn & Dial, Llc-Atl
contact info
Matthew T. Gomes
Weinberg Wheeler Hudgins Gunn & Dial, Llc-Atl
contact info
Plaintiff
Minnie Gatlin
Represented By
Jaclyn Lee
Lee Law Firm, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, September 30, 2024
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Mon 09/30 11:43 AM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING36 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(ii) (bmr)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Mon 09/30 11:46 AM
Civil Case Terminated. Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath terminated from case. (bmr)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
36 36 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 09/27 4:17 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by CFSI Loan Management Company. (Gomes, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
order Order on Motion for Settlement Fri 09/13 2:29 PM
ORDER (per33 order) granting32 Joint Motion for Settlement Conference with Magistrate Judge. Ordered by Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath. (bgt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
35 35 minutes Settlement Conference Thu 08/15 4:10 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas: Settlement Conference held on 8/14/2024. Case Settled. (Tape #Zoom)(bmr)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
34 34 4 pgs order Order Scheduling Mediation Fri 06/14 12:59 PM
ORDER setting case for a video-conference mediation. This Order contains important information including dates and times for pre-mediation telephone conferences with Judge Salinas and deadlines for submitting written mediation statements. The parties are ORDERED to read the entire order and to comply with all deadlines and instructions set forth in it. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 6/14/2024. (kng)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
33 33 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Settlement Judge Fri 06/07 3:10 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Settlement Judge Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. Additionally, all pre-trial and dispositive motions deadlines are hereby stayed through the completion of the mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath on 6/7/2024. (dmb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
32 32 motion For Settlement Thu 06/06 9:58 AM
Joint MOTION for Settlement Conference with Magistrate Judge by CFSI Loan Management Company. (Gomes, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
31 31 misc Leave of Absence Wed 06/05 5:19 PM
Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 7/19/2024 through 7/29/2024, 8/19/2024 through 8/26/2024, 9/18/2024 through 9/20/2024, by Stephen W. Mooney. (Mooney, Stephen)
Related: [-]
30 30 misc Leave of Absence Wed 06/05 5:18 PM
Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 7/15/2024 through 7/26/2024, by Matthew T. Gomes. (Gomes, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
29 29 discov Certificate of Service Mon 05/13 9:38 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiff's First Amended Initial Disclosures by Minnie Gatlin.(Lee, Jaclyn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
28 28 discov Certificate of Service Wed 05/08 1:39 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena on Insperity by Minnie Gatlin.(Lee, Jaclyn)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
27 27 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Mon 04/08 11:40 AM
ORDER granting24 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Discovery ends on 5/23/2024. Motions due by 8/14/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath on 04/08/2024. (jkb)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 06, 2024
26 26 discov Certificate of Service Sat 04/06 11:54 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiff's Amended Notice of Deposition of Dodi Whitley by Minnie Gatlin.(Lee, Jaclyn)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
25 25 discov Certificate of Service Fri 04/05 4:54 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Amended Notice of Deposition of Mike Elam by Minnie Gatlin.(Lee, Jaclyn)
Related: [-]
24 24 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 04/05 4:03 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Corresponding Deadlines by Minnie Gatlin.(Lee, Jaclyn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
23 23 discov Certificate of Service Tue 03/12 9:27 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Notice of Deposition of Dodi Whitley by Minnie Gatlin.(Lee, Jaclyn)
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 02, 2024
22 22 discov Certificate of Service Sat 03/02 1:55 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiff's Notice of Deposition of Mike Elam by Minnie Gatlin.(Lee, Jaclyn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
21 21 discov Certificate of Service Wed 02/07 8:55 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiff's Amended Responses to Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories by Minnie Gatlin.(Lee, Jaclyn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2024
20 20 notice Notice (Other) Thu 01/04 5:08 PM
NOTICE by CFSI Loan Management Company Defendant's Notice of Subpoena (Gomes, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
19 19 discov Certificate of Service Mon 12/04 2:45 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by CFSI Loan Management Company.(Gomes, Matthew)
Related: [-]
18 18 discov Certificate of Service Mon 12/04 11:41 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiff's Responses to Defendant's First Request for Production of Documents by Minnie Gatlin.(Lee, Jaclyn)
Related: [-]
17 17 discov Certificate of Service Mon 12/04 11:40 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiff's Responses to Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories by Minnie Gatlin.(Lee, Jaclyn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 30, 2023
16 16 7 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Thu 11/30 1:08 PM
ORDER granting15 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath on 11/30/2023. (jkb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
15 15 motion Protective Order Wed 11/29 3:35 PM
Consent MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Confidentiality of Discovery Materials by CFSI Loan Management Company.(Gomes, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Stipulated Protective Order Regarding Confidentiality of Discovery Materials
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Wed 11/29 2:57 PM
ORDER denying without prejudice13 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath on 11/29/2023. (jkb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
13 13 motion Protective Order Tue 11/28 2:11 PM
Consent MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Confidentiality of Discovery Materials by CFSI Loan Management Company.(Gomes, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Stipulated Protective Order Regarding Confidentiality of Discovery Materials
Thursday, October 19, 2023
12 12 order Scheduling Order Thu 10/19 12:33 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: re:6 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Discovery ends on 4/18/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath on 10/19/2023. (dmb)
Related: [-]
11 11 discov Certificate of Service Thu 10/19 10:01 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents to Defendant by Minnie Gatlin.(Lee, Jaclyn)
Related: [-]
10 10 discov Certificate of Service Thu 10/19 10:00 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant by Minnie Gatlin.(Lee, Jaclyn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
9 9 discov Certificate of Service Wed 10/18 10:34 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re8 Initial Disclosures and Defendant's First Interrogatories and Request for Documents by CFSI Loan Management Company.(Gomes, Matthew)
Related: [-]
8 8 discov Initial Disclosures Wed 10/18 10:31 AM
Initial Disclosures by CFSI Loan Management Company.(Gomes, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
7 7 discov Certificate of Service Tue 10/17 2:15 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by Minnie Gatlin.(Lee, Jaclyn)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 16, 2023
6 6 misc Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Mon 10/16 12:14 PM
JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by CFSI Loan Management Company. (Gomes, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
misc Clerk's Notation for LOA/CIP Thu 09/21 10:43 AM
Clerk's Notation re5 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Reviewed and approved by Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath on 09/21/2023. (nav)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
misc Clerk's Notation for LOA/CIP Wed 09/20 11:45 AM
Clerk's Notation re5 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Reviewed and approved by Judge Thrash. (jeh)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
5 5 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 09/18 9:20 AM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by CFSI Loan Management Company. (Gomes, Matthew)
Related: [-]
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 09/18 9:18 AM
ANSWER to1 COMPLAINT by CFSI Loan Management Company. Discovery ends on 2/15/2024.(Gomes, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 27, 2023
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 07/27 1:44 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Minnie Gatlin. CFSI Loan Management Company waiver mailed on 7/19/2023, answer due 9/18/2023. (Lee, Jaclyn)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 21, 2023
misc Clerk's Notation for LOA/CIP Fri 07/21 4:26 PM
Clerk's Notation re2 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Reviewed and approved by Judge Thrash. (jeh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 20, 2023
2 2 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 07/20 2:19 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Minnie Gatlin. (Lee, Jaclyn)
Related: [-]
Saturday, July 15, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 07/17 11:39 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Minnie Gatlin. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-12745147)(nmb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet