California Central District Court
Judge:Kenly Kiya Kato
Referred: Shashi H Kewalramani
Case #: 5:23-cv-01395
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jul 17, 2023
Terminated:Jan 22, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Jan 13, 2024 12:52 AM PST
Defendant
County of San Bernardino
Represented By
Laurel Ann Hoehn
San Bernardino County Counsel Office
contact info
Defendant
Alberto Cuevas
Represented By
Laurel Ann Hoehn
San Bernardino County Counsel Office
contact info
Defendant
John Meyers
Represented By
Laurel Ann Hoehn
San Bernardino County Counsel Office
contact info
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Deanna Bonds
Represented By
Jerry L Steering
Law Offices Of Jerry Steering
contact info
Brenton Aitken Hands
Law Office Of Jerry Steering
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/22/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
45 45 order Summary Judgment Dismiss Case Wed 01/22 3:38 PM
MINUTES (In Chambers) Order GRANTING Defendants' Motion for Involuntary Dismissal [Dkt. 44] by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. Accordingly, Defendants' Motion for Involuntary Dismissal is GRANTED, and this matter is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Finally, Plaintiff shall pay Defendants $820.00 for time spent preparing the instant unopposed motion. Payment shall be made no later than February 14, 2025. Failure to comply may result in additional sanctions. (See document for further information).; finding as moot43 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Action; granting44 MOTION to Dismiss Case. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (aco)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
44 44 motion Dismiss Case Mon 01/06 2:56 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendants' Motion for Involuntary Dismissal filed by Defendants County of San Bernardino, John Meyers, Alberto Cuevas. Motion set for hearing on 2/6/2025 at 09:30 AM before Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (Traver, Hayden)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Order Dated 12 3-2024
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Emails to Plaintiff, Dated 12 4-2024 & 12 9-2024
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Emails to Plaintiff, Dated 12 19-2024 & 12 20-2024
Att: 4 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Defendants' Motion for Involuntary Dismissal
43 43 motion Summary Judgment Mon 01/06 2:09 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Action filed by Defendants County of San Bernardino, John Meyers, Alberto Cuevas. Motion set for hearing on 2/6/2025 at 09:30 AM before Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (Traver, Hayden)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Defendants' Separate Statement of Uncontroverted Facts in Support of Defendants' MSJ,
Att: 2 Defendants' Exhibit List in Support of their MSJ; Declaration of Hayden T. Traver in Support Thereof,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit A - Declaration of John Meyers,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit B - Declaration of Alberto Cuevas,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit C - Copy of CD with Video Surveillance Footage,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit D - Copy of Detective Malcolm Page's Video Surveillance Review Report,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit E - Copy of CD with Deputy Alberto Cuevas' Belt Recorder Audio,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit F - Photo of Knife,
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit G - Photo of Collided Toyota Matrix and Hyundai Elantra,
Att: 10 Exhibit Exhibit H - Copy of Plaintiff Deanna Bonds' Complaint, filed on July 18, 2023,
Att: 11 Exhibit Exhibit I - Defendants Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint, filed on September 19, 2023,
Att: 12 Notice of Lodging Non-Paper Exhibit C and Exhibit E in Support of Defendants' MSJ,
Att: 13 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Defendants' MSJ
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
42 42 minutes Discovery Hearing For Order re Discovery Matter Wed 12/18 11:38 AM
MINUTES OF RE41 Motion for Order; Discovery Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani: The Court held an informal discovery hearing regarding the deposition of Plaintiff. Pro Se Plaintiff Deanna Bonds was not present, and attorney Hayden Traver appeared on behalf of Defendants. The Court was unable to proceed on discussion of any discovery because Plaintiff failed to appear. The Court sanctions Plaintiff in the amount of $500 payable to the Court no later than December 31, 2024 unless Plaintiff shows good cause why she was unable to attend to today's hearing. Defense counsel may file any additional motions regarding sanctions before the District Judge.Time: :5 mins. CRD: D. CastellanosCourt Recorder: CourtSmart No. 4. (dc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
41 41 1 pgs motion Order re Discovery Matter Tue 12/17 9:33 AM
MOTION for Order for Informal Discovery Dispute. Zoom Video Conference set for 12/18/2024 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (dc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
40 40 order For Order Tue 12/03 1:48 PM
MINUTES (In Chambers) Order GRANTING Defendants' Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order and to Compel Plaintiff's Participation in Discovery [Dkt. 38] by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. Accordingly, Defendants' request to continue the discovery hearing cut-off and to compel Plaintiff's participation in discovery is GRANTED. The discovery hearing cut-off is continued to December 31, 2024. In addition, Defendants' request to continue all dates is GRANTED as follows: 1. Motion hearing cut-off: February 6, 2025 2. Last day to conduct settlement conference: February 7, 2025 3. Final pretrial conference: March 20, 2025 at 10:30 a.m 4. Jury trial: April 7, 2025 at 8:30 a.m. Finally, Plaintiff shall pay Defendants $512.50 for time spent preparing the instant unopposed motion. Payment shall be made no later than December 22, 2024. Failure to comply may result in additional sanctions. (See document for further information).; granting38 MOTION for Order for Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order and to Compel Plaintiff's Participation in Discovery. (aco)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
39 39 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Thu 11/14 5:22 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order and to Compel Plaintiff's Participation in Discovery 38 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed document was not submitted or was not submitted as a separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (rolm)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
38 38 14 pgs motion Order Fri 11/08 3:48 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order and to Compel Plaintiff's Participation in Discovery filed by Defendants County of San Bernardino, John Meyers, Alberto Cuevas. Motion set for hearing on 12/12/2024 at 09:30 AM before Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (Traver, Hayden)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Notice of Deposition of Plaintiff Deanna Bonds, 3 12-2024
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Email to Jerry Steering re Deposition of Plaintiff Deanna Bonds, Dated 3 11-2024
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Email from Jerry Steering re Motion to be Relieved, Dated 5 21-2024
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Notice of Continued Deposition of Plaintiff Deanna Bonds, 8 7-2024
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Discovery Propounded to Plaintiff Deanna Bonds from San Bernardino County, 6 18-2024
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit F - Email to Deanna Bonds, Dated 8 13-2024
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit G - Email to Deanna Bonds, Dated 8 16-2024
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit H - Email to Deanna Bonds, Dated 9-12-2024
37 37 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Fri 11/08 3:37 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Hayden Traver counsel for Defendants County of San Bernardino, John Meyers, Alberto Cuevas. Laurel A. Hoehn is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants San Bernardino County, John Meyers and Alberto Cuevas. (Traver, Hayden)
Related: [-]
36 36 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Fri 11/08 3:31 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Hayden Traver counsel for Defendants County of San Bernardino, John Meyers, Alberto Cuevas. Adding Hayden T. Traver as counsel of record for San Bernardino County, John Meyers and Alberto Cuevas for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants San Bernardino County, John Meyers and Alberto Cuevas. (Attorney Hayden Traver added to party County of San Bernardino(pty:dft), Attorney Hayden Traver added to party John Meyers(pty:dft), Attorney Hayden Traver added to party Alberto Cuevas(pty:dft))(Traver, Hayden)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
35 35 order Substitute Attorney Tue 06/04 11:55 AM
ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. The Court hereby orders that the request of L. Steering and Brenton Aitken Hands to withdraw as attorney of record for Plaintiff Deanna Bonds is hereby GRANTED.; granting32 REQUEST TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY. (aco)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
34 34 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Mon 06/03 11:59 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: REQUEST TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY Jerry Lawrence Steering as counsel of record 32 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed document was not submitted or was not submitted as a separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (aco)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
33 33 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Fri 05/31 4:51 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Deanna Bonds, re Order on Motion for Removal,,,, Motion Hearing,,,31 served on 5/31/2024. (Steering, Jerry)
Related: [-]
32 32 motion Substitute Attorney (G-01) Fri 05/31 1:47 PM
REQUEST TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY Jerry Lawrence Steering as counsel of record filed by Plaintiff Deanna Bonds. (Steering, Jerry)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
31 31 minutes Motion Hearing Removal Thu 05/23 3:44 PM
MINUTES OF Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel of Record [Dkt. 28] Motion Hearing held before Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. The Court confers with counsel regarding the Motion. Mr. Steering states his client does not wish to proceed with representation by Mr. Steering's firm. Ms. Hoehn states Defendants do not oppose the granting of the Motion. Therefore, the Court orders as follows: 1. Mr. Steering shall contact Plaintiff regarding her willingness to sign a Request for Approval of Substitution or Withdrawal of Counsel, Form G-01. 2. The Court finds good cause exists to relieve Jerry L. Steering and Brenton Aitken Hands as counsel for Plaintiff. Therefore, the Motion, dkt. 28, is GRANTED. (See document for further information).; granting28 MOTION for Removal of Counsel of Record. Court Recorder: Riverside CourtSmart Courtroom Three. (aco)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
30 30 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Fri 05/10 11:54 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato: On the Court's own motion, the hearing on the Motion for Removal of Counsel of Record [Dkt.28 ] is hereby CONTINUED from May 16, 2024, to May 23, 2024, at 9:30 a.m. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (npo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
29 29 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Tue 04/23 9:22 AM
NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato: The Court has updated its procedures in civil cases, including the recommended timelines in the Court's Schedule of Pretrial Dates form and the requirements and deadlines for filing pretrial documents. The parties are hereby directed to review the updated Civil Standing Order, Order Setting Scheduling Conference, and Civil Trial Scheduling Order, which are available on the Court's website at[LINK:https://www.cacd.uscourts.gov/honorable-kenly-kiya-kato.] THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cbr)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2024
28 28 motion Removal Fri 04/12 6:24 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Removal of Counsel of Record. filed by Plaintiff Deanna Bonds. Motion set for hearing on 5/16/2024 at 09:30 AM before Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (Steering, Jerry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 Declaration,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Thursday, February 08, 2024
27 27 adr Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11) - optional html form Thu 02/08 8:25 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Jeffrey Kravitz has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (lst)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 28, 2023
26 26 order Order/Referral to ADR (No 2) (Mediation Panel) (ADR-12) Thu 12/28 5:22 PM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 12/06/2024. (tc)
Related: [-]
25 25 order Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only Thu 12/28 5:21 PM
CIVIL TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. Amended Pleadings due by 12/28/2023. Discovery cut-off 9/12/2024. Motions due by 12/5/2024. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 12/6/2024. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/23/2025 10:30 AM before Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. Jury Trial set for 2/10/2025 08:30 AM before Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (tc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 30, 2023
24 24 misc Status Report Thu 11/30 8:22 PM
STATUS REPORT Plaintiff's Rule 26 Scheduling Conference Report filed by Plaintiff Deanna Bonds. (Steering, Jerry)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Thu 11/30 5:02 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Defendants' Scheduling Conference Report ; estimated length of trial 5 days, filed by Defendants County of San Bernardino, Alberto Cuevas, John Meyers..(Hoehn, Laurel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Schedule of Pre Trial and Trial Dates Worksheet
Wednesday, November 22, 2023
22 22 4 pgs order Order Wed 11/22 9:42 AM
REASSIGNMENT ORDER by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato: Please refer to the Order for complete details. (cbr)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2023
21 21 cs_rasgn Chief District Judge Transferring Case Tue 11/21 9:59 AM
ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#23-121) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Kenly Kiya Kato, this case is transferred from Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong to the calendar of Judge Kenly Kiya Kato for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:23-cv-01395-KK-SHKx. (rn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
20 20 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 11/07 12:59 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiffs response to the Courts Order to Show Cause. (ECF No.19 }. The Court is satisfied that Plaintiff is diligently prosecuting the action. The Order to Show Cause (ECF No.17 ) is hereby discharged. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dbe) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
19 19 misc Declaration Mon 10/02 6:02 PM
DECLARATION of Jerry Lawrence Steering re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,,17 Declaration of Jerry L. Steering In Reponse to OSC re Failure to Diligently Prosecute Action filed by Plaintiff Deanna Bonds. (Steering, Jerry)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
18 18 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Tue 09/26 10:04 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. Scheduling Conference set for 12/14/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. (kd)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
17 17 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Mon 09/25 6:10 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The Court hereby orders plaintiff (s) to show cause in writing no later than OCTOBER 2, 2023 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. As an alternative to a written response by plaintiff(s), the Court will accept one of the following as an appropriate response to this OSC if it is filed on or before the above date, as evidence that the matter is being prosecuted diligently: Defendants Answer to Complaint OR Plaintiff=s Request for Entry of Default No oral argument of this matter will be heard unless ordered by the Court. The Order will stand submitted upon the filing of a responsive pleading or motion on or before the date upon which a response by plaintiff(s) is due. Plaintiff counsel is ordered to serve this document on defendant(s) within 24 hours after entry on the docket. (yl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
16 16 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Tue 09/19 4:39 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Deanna Bonds, upon Defendant County of San Bernardino served on 8/29/2023, answer due 9/19/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon County of San Bernardino in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity (Steering, Jerry)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Tue 09/19 4:35 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Deanna Bonds, upon Defendant John Meyers served on 8/29/2023, answer due 9/19/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon John Meyers in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Steering, Jerry)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Tue 09/19 4:32 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Deanna Bonds, upon Defendant Alberto Cuevas served on 8/29/2023, answer due 9/19/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Alberto Cuevas in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Steering, Jerry)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 09/19 2:12 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants County of San Bernardino, Alberto Cuevas, John Meyers, identifying San Bernardino County; John Meyers; and Alberto Cuevas. (Hoehn, Laurel)
Related: [-]
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 09/19 2:07 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants County of San Bernardino, Alberto Cuevas, John Meyers.(Attorney Laurel Ann Hoehn added to party County of San Bernardino(pty:dft), Attorney Laurel Ann Hoehn added to party Alberto Cuevas(pty:dft), Attorney Laurel Ann Hoehn added to party John Meyers(pty:dft))(Hoehn, Laurel)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 04, 2023
11 11 misc Affidavit Fri 08/04 5:03 PM
AFFIDAVIT by affiant: Deanna Bonds Declaration of Deanna Bonds re Successor in Interest to Marlon Bonds filed by Plaintiff Deanna Bonds (Steering, Jerry)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 28, 2023
10 10 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Fri 07/28 11:35 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's website under Judge Frimpong's Procedures and Schedules. Please read the Standing Order carefully. It is the responsibilities of the parties to maintain familiarly with the Standing Order and any future amendments that the Court may issue by periodically checking the Court's website for the operative version of the Standing Order. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 18, 2023
9 9 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 07/18 5:26 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants County of San Bernardino, Alberto Cuevas, John Meyers. (et)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Tue 07/18 5:22 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
Related: [-]
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 07/18 5:21 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 07/18 5:21 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (et)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 17, 2023
5 5 notice Summons Request Mon 07/17 7:05 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Deanna Bonds. (Steering, Jerry)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 07/17 7:03 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Deanna Bonds, (Steering, Jerry)
Related: [-]
3 3 trial Jury Demand Mon 07/17 7:02 PM
DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Plaintiff Deanna Bonds.. (Steering, Jerry)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 07/17 7:01 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Deanna Bonds. (Steering, Jerry)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 07/17 6:59 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-35686264 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Deanna Bonds. (Attorney Jerry L Steering added to party Deanna Bonds(pty:pla))(Steering, Jerry)
Related: [-]