Maryland District Court
Judge:Theodore D Chuang
Case #: 8:23-cv-01918
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jul 18, 2023
Re-opened:Jan 18, 2024
Terminated:Jan 18, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jan 14, 2024 6:12 AM EST
Defendant
Nextmarvel Inc.
Plaintiff
Nia Cleveland
Represented By
Sergei Lemberg
Lemberg Law LLC
contact info

GPO Jan 18 2024
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 1/18/2024. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)

Docket last updated: 82 minutes ago
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
19 19 3 pgs order Order Wed 08/21 3:02 PM
ORDER granting18 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Nextmarvel Inc. d/b/a Vooglam; JUDGMENT entered in favor of Plaintiff against Defendant; CLOSING case. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 8/21/2024. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
18 18 motion Default - Judgment Tue 07/30 3:06 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Nextmarvel Inc. d/b/a Vooglam by Nia Cleveland(Lemberg, Sergei)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
17 17 1 pgs order Order Tue 07/16 3:26 PM
ORDER directing Cleveland to file a status report within 14 days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 7/16/2024. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 18, 2024
16 16 order Judgment - Default Thu 01/18 9:58 AM
DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff against Nextmarvel Inc. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 1/17/2024. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
15 15 8 pgs order Memorandum Opinion Thu 01/18 9:41 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 1/18/2024. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2023
14 14 service Affidavit of Service Tue 12/12 11:36 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Motion for Default and for Discovery served on Bianca Gonzalez on 12/06/2023, filed by Nia Cleveland.(Lemberg, Sergei)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Monday, December 04, 2023
13 13 motion Default - Judgment Mon 12/04 5:40 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to by Nia Cleveland(Lemberg, Sergei)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Declaration of Stephen Taylor,
Att: 3 Exhibit A,
Att: 4 Exhibit B,
Att: 5 Exhibit C,
Att: 6 Exhibit D,
Att: 7 Exhibit E
Monday, November 20, 2023
12 12 1 pgs order Order Mon 11/20 4:30 PM
ORDER directing Cleveland to file and serve by mail on Defendant Nextmarvel, Inc. a Motion for Default Judgment, or show cause why such motion would be inappropriate within 14 days of this Order. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 11/20/2023. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
11 11 notice Notice of Default Wed 10/18 9:40 AM
NOTICE OF DEFAULT as to Nextmarvel Inc. (c/m 10/18/2023 ds2s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Clerks Entry of Default Wed 10/18 9:34 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Nextmarvel Inc. (c/m 10/18/2023 ds2s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
9 9 motion Default - Clerk's Entry of Tue 10/10 9:57 AM
MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default for want of answer or other defense by Nia Cleveland(Lemberg, Sergei)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Sergei Lemberg,
Att: 2 Exhibit A
Thursday, October 05, 2023
8 8 1 pgs order Order Thu 10/05 3:13 PM
ORDER Directing Cleveland to file and serve on Nextmarvel Inc.a motion for clerk's entry of default. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 10/5/2023. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 16, 2023
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 08/16 2:50 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nia Cleveland. Nextmarvel Inc. served on 8/8/2023, answer due 8/29/2023.(Lemberg, Sergei)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 09, 2023
6 6 order Case Management Order Wed 08/09 3:42 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 8/9/2023. (ds2s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 08, 2023
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 08/08 9:06 AM
Case Reassigned to Judge Theodore D. Chuang. Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms no longer assigned to the case. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 19, 2023
4 4 order 25 Pct Mag - Case Management Order Wed 07/19 11:17 AM
Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 7/19/2023. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 07/19 10:47 AM
Summons Issued 21 days as to Nextmarvel Inc.(kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
notice 25 Pct Mag - Notice of Case Assignment to a Magistrate Judge Wed 07/19 11:04 AM
NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Gina L. Simms. Nia Cleveland or counsel for Nia Cleveland are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded[LINK:here] , counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 8/2/2023. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 18, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 07/18 12:01 PM
COMPLAINT against Nextmarvel Inc. d/b/a Vooglam ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-10713371.), filed by Nia Cleveland.(Lemberg, Sergei)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons