Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Jack Zouhary
Case #: 3:23-cv-01382
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12131 Americans with Disabilities
Case Filed:Jul 18, 2023
Terminated:Dec 05, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jan 14, 2024 6:13 AM EST
Defendant
Dave White Chevrolet, Inc.
1000 Jackson Street
Toledo, OH 43624
Represented By
Amy L. Butler
Fisherbroyles - Toledo
contact info
Anthony J. Calamunci, Sr.
Fisherbroyles - Toledo
contact info
Defendant
Dave White Chevrolet, LLC
6480 Monroe Street
Sylvania, OH 43560
Represented By
Amy L. Butler
Fisherbroyles - Toledo
contact info
Anthony J. Calamunci, Sr.
Fisherbroyles - Toledo
contact info
Plaintiff
Douglas W. Simrell
4656 W. Sylvania Avenue Apt. 203
Toledo, OH 43623
Represented By
David T.A. Albrechta
Albrechta & Albrechta
contact info
Eleni Kennebeck Albrechta
Albrechta & Albrechta
contact info
Tod J. Thompson
contact info
Joseph F. Albrechta
Albrechta & Coble
contact info
Christopher E Liebold
Albrechta & Coble - Fremont
contact info
Joseph A. Urenovitch
Law Office Of Joseph A. Urenovitch
contact info

GPO Oct 03 2023
Order denying Defendants' Motion to dismiss as moot. (Related Doc # 4). Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 10/3/2023.(M,SM)
GPO May 29 2024
Memorandum Opinion and Order granting Plaintiff's motion for leave to file a supplemental notice of authority, (Doc. No. 13), and denying Defendants' motion to dismiss. (Doc. No. 8). Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 5/29/2024. (M,SM)

Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, December 05, 2024
31 31 1 pgs order Order Thu 12/05 12:40 PM
CORRECTED DISMISSAL ORDER . Settlement Conference held on December 3, 2024 resulted in a settlement. Settled and dismissed without prejudice. Defendants to bear federal court costs. Any subsequent Dismissal with prejudice filed within 30 days shall supersede this Order. This Court also retains jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the settlement. Judge Jack Zouhary on 12/5/2024. (Court Reporter: Stacey Kiprotich) (3 hours, 30 mins) (V,S)
Related: [-]
30 30 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Minute Order _ Settlement Conference Thu 12/05 11:26 AM
DISMISSAL ORDER . Settlement Conference held on December 3, 2024 resulted in a settlement. Settled and dismissed without prejudice. Each party is to bear its own costs. Any subsequent Dismissal with prejudice filed within 30 days shall supersede this Order. This Court also retains jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the settlement. Judge Jack Zouhary on 12/5/2024. (Court Reporter: Stacey Kiprotich) (3 hours, 30 mins) (V,S)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
29 29 1 pgs order Order reassigning case Wed 12/04 11:29 AM
Order of Reassignment . Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 3.1(b)(5), with the concurrence of Judge Jack Zouhary and the approval of Chief Judge Sara Lioi, this case shall be transferred to the docket of Judge Jack Zouhary to conduct all further proceedings. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 12/4/2024. (D,L)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judge Wed 12/04 12:40 PM
Judge Jack Zouhary assigned as Presiding Judge on case. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick terminated. (R,EM)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
28 28 minutes ~Util - Set Hearings Minute Order _ Telephone Conference Mon 10/28 3:13 PM
ORDER. Phone Status Conference held on 10/28/2024. This Court set a settlement conference for Tuesday, December 3, 2024 at 10:30 AM before the Honorable Jack Zouhary, United States District Judge, at the United District Court, 1716 Spielbusch, Annex Suite 485, Toledo, Ohio. Lead counsel and parties, or a representative with full authority to negotiate and settle shall appear at the conference. Each party shall submit an ex parte statement summarizing theirrespective settlement position to Chambers (zouhary_chambers@ohnd.uscourts.gov) by Tuesday, November 26, 2024 . The statement shall not become part of the case record. Judge Jack Zouhary on 10/28/2024. (10 mins) (D,L)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
oth_evt Notice of Hearing or Conference Thu 10/24 11:25 AM
Notice [non-document] of Phone Conference set for Monday, October 28, 2024 at 2:30 PM before Judge Jack Zouhary. Counsel shall call the District Court conference line (to be emailed)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
order Order Order of Referral to Judicial Officer for Mediation or Settlement Wed 10/23 3:40 PM
Order [non-document] referring case to United States District Judge Jack Zouhary for mediation. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 10/23/2024. (M,SM)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
27 27 minutes 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Minute Order _ Telephone Conference Fri 10/18 2:47 PM
Order of Telephone Conference held on 10/17/2024. Time: 10 minutes. The parties shall notify my chambers via email (helmick_chambers@ohnd.uscourts.gov) of their preferences, if any, with respect to mediation by October 25, 2024. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 10/17/2024. (M,SM)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
26 26 notice Notice (atty event) Mon 09/30 4:11 PM
Plaintiff's Amended Notice of Expert Disclosure filed by Douglas W. Simrell.(Albrechta, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Steven Kalniz
25 25 notice Notice (atty event) Mon 09/30 9:41 AM
Plaintiff's Notice of Expert Disclosure filed by Douglas W. Simrell.(Albrechta, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Steven Kalniz
Monday, September 16, 2024
order Order on Motion to vacate Mon 09/16 11:06 AM
Order [non-document] granting Defendants' unopposed motion to vacate and reschedule the October 16, 2024 telephone status conference. This conference will now be held on October 17, 2024, at 11:30 AM with counsel to call the court's bridge line 877-411-9748, access code 1231873. In the interest of efficiency, should counsel for either side have a conflict at this time, they shall jointly contact my chambers to reschedule the conference rather than filing a further motion for this relief. Related [+]. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 9/16/2024.(M,SM)
Related: [-] 24
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
24 24 motion Vacate Wed 09/11 4:53 PM
Unopposed Motion to vacate and Reschedule October 16, 2024, Telephone Conference filed by Dave White Chevrolet, Inc., Dave White Chevrolet, LLC. (Calamunci, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
23 23 notice Notice (atty event) Tue 07/23 4:47 PM
Notice to Withdraw as Co-Counsel for Plaintiff filed by Douglas W. Simrell. (Albrechta, Eleni)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
22 22 order Stipulation & Order Mon 07/22 10:48 AM
Stipulation & Order to transfer discovery. re20 . Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 7/22/2024. (M,SM)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to withdraw as attorney Mon 07/22 10:50 AM
Order [non-document] granting attorney David T.A. Albrechta's Motion to withdraw as Plaintiff's counsel. Related [+]. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 7/22/2024.(M,SM)
Related: [-] 21
Friday, July 19, 2024
21 21 motion Withdraw as Attorney Fri 07/19 1:49 PM
Motion by David T. Albrechta to withdraw as attorney filed by Plaintiff Douglas W. Simrell. (Albrechta, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
20 20 notice Stipulation (atty event) Thu 07/18 2:45 PM
Proposed Stipulation to Transfer Discovery filed by Douglas W. Simrell. (Albrechta, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
19 19 order Minute Order _ Case Management Conference Wed 07/03 10:20 AM
Order of Case Management Conference held on 7/3/2024. Time: 10 minutes. Case is assigned to the standard track. Fact Discovery due by 5/30/2025. Telephone Conference set for 10/16/2024, at 11:30 AM, with counsel to call the court's bridge line at 877-411-9748, access code 1231873. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 7/3/2024. (M,SM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
18 18 notice Report of Parties Planning Meeting (atty event) Thu 06/20 4:15 PM
Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Douglas W. Simrell. (Albrechta, Joseph)
Related: [-]
17 17 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Thu 06/20 11:42 AM
Answer to5 Amended complaint, filed by Dave White Chevrolet, Inc., Dave White Chevrolet, LLC. (Calamunci, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
16 16 order Case Management Conference Scheduling Order Wed 05/29 9:37 AM
Case Management Conference Scheduling Notice : Case management conference to be held on 7/3/2024 at 09:30 AM before Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick. Counsel to call the court's bridge line at 877-411-9748, access code 1231873.(M,SM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting
15 15 minutes ~Util - Terminate Motions Memorandum Opinion and Order Wed 05/29 9:26 AM
Memorandum Opinion and Order granting Plaintiff's motion for leave to file a supplemental notice of authority, (Doc. No.13 ), and denying Defendants' motion to dismiss. (Doc. No.8 ). Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 5/29/2024. (M,SM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
14 14 resp Response Tue 03/12 2:34 PM
Response to13 Motion for leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by All Defendants. (Calamunci, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
13 13 motion Leave Fri 03/01 11:39 AM
Motion for leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by Plaintiff Douglas W. Simrell. Related document(s)9 .(Albrechta, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Notice of Filing State Statutory Authority,
Att: 2 Exhibit Statutory Authority
Monday, November 06, 2023
12 12 notice Initial Disclosures (atty event) Mon 11/06 2:05 PM
Initial Disclosures filed by Douglas W. Simrell. (Albrechta, Joseph)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement (atty event) Mon 11/06 12:55 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Dave White Chevrolet, Inc.. (Calamunci, Anthony)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement (atty event) Mon 11/06 12:54 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Dave White Chevrolet, LLC. (Calamunci, Anthony)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Notice of Failure to File Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 11/06 11:59 AM
Notice by Clerk that Dave White Chevrolet, Inc., & Dave White Chevrolet, LLC failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (K,AR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
9 9 resp Response Wed 11/01 12:51 PM
Response to8 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Douglas W. Simrell's First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)91)(6) with Memorandum in Support filed by Douglas W. Simrell. (Albrechta, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2023
8 8 motion Dismiss Thu 10/19 3:24 PM
Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Douglas W. Simrell's First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)91)(6) with Memorandum in Support filed by Dave White Chevrolet, Inc., Dave White Chevrolet, LLC. Related document(s)5 . (Calamunci, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion to dismiss Tue 10/03 4:29 PM
Order denying Defendants' Motion to dismiss as moot. Related [+]. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 10/3/2023.(M,SM)
Related: [-] 4
Thursday, September 28, 2023
6 6 resp Response Thu 09/28 11:23 AM
Response to4 Motion to Dismiss Complaint with Memorandum in Support filed by Douglas W. Simrell. (Albrechta, Joseph)
Related: [-]
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 09/28 11:21 AM
First Amended complaint against All Defendants. Filed by Douglas W. Simrell. (Albrechta, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Notice of Right to Sue,
Att: 2 Exhibit Worksharing Agreement,
Att: 3 Exhibit Termination Report,
Att: 4 Exhibit Affidavit of Allison Paxton,
Att: 5 Exhibit Record of Proceedings
Friday, September 15, 2023
4 4 motion Dismiss Fri 09/15 11:12 AM
Motion to dismiss filed by Dave White Chevrolet, Inc., Dave White Chevrolet, LLC. Related document(s)1 . (Calamunci, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 24, 2023
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 07/24 9:24 AM
Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Douglas W. Simrell. All Defendants filed on behalf of Douglas W. Simrell (Albrechta, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 18, 2023
2 2 oth_evt Magistrate Consent Form Issued by Intake Tue 07/18 2:19 PM
Magistrate Consent Form issued. No Summons issued none were provided. (K,AR)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 07/18 1:07 PM
Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-12090982.. Filed by Douglas W. Simrell. (Albrechta, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Notice of Right to Sue,
Att: 3 Exhibit Termination Report,
Att: 4 Exhibit Affidavit,
Att: 5 Exhibit Record of Proceedings,
Att: 6 Waiver of Service of Summons,
Att: 7 Waiver of Service of Summons
utility Add and Terminate Judge Tue 07/18 2:14 PM
Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick assigned to case. (K,AR)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Tue 07/18 2:15 PM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. (K,AR)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Notice re Prompt Service Tue 07/18 2:19 PM
Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant. Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a). (K,AR)
Related: [-]