Brooks v. Next Level Relief, LLC et al
Kentucky Western District Court | |
Judge: | David J Hale |
Referred: | Colin H Lindsay |
Case #: | 3:23-cv-00365 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:201 Denial of Overtime Compensation |
Case Filed: | Jul 18, 2023 |
Terminated: | Apr 09, 2025 |
Last checked: Sunday Jan 14, 2024 5:29 AM EST |
Defendant
Justin Bowie
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Brandon Cain
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Next Level Relief, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dwan Brooks
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dairon Daniel Perez Aguilar
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dioveon Allen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kadasha Allen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Irvin Alvarez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Noah Andres
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Javier Aponte
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Juan Carlos Araujo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cesar Arias
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
German Cardenas Arias
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rafael Cervantes Avila
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Iryan Baptiste
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tanya Basham
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shirley Beckham
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sonya Birt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jean Bonhomme
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Beverly Bourdet
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carltez Briggs
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Diamond Brown
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
McKenzy Brown
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Luckson Calixte
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kalyn Carter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Anthony Carter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alexander Quesada Castillo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rainel Quesada Castillo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Klebert Charles
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lyn Clark
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lunise Clervil
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chaya Coleman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Yoinel Aguilar Colina
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shannon Cummings
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Arturo Davila
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jamarus Davis-Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jakerra Dean
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elizabeth Delgado
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jahmarey Dennison
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bertram Denson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Milou Destin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alicia Doe
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TaLiyah Douglas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tawanda Dozier
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sabrina English
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pedro Espinoza
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Estudillo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jorge Flores
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Keni Gaines
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Aaron Gilyard
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lily Giraud-Red Cloud
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Domanic Godbold
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Reynier Gomez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nereida Gongora
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Teresa Gray
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LaToya Hammond
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kiera Hooks
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tyler Howard
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jericka Isadore
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ron James
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elsie Jean
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cedric Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cora D. Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Deven Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kamiya Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Randy Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Reginald Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Taylor A. Jones
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alexander Juan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sun Shar Juste
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Judith Kershaw
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kathy Killyon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Deontray Knight
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tamika Kuykendall
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tulio Zurbaran Leal
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jessica Levant
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Camryn Little
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Martinez Lopez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alexander Toro Lugo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Trishaun Major
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Loretta J. Martin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Montrell Martin-DuBose
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shequita Mason
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anthony McFarlin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charity McIntyre
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chong Cha McLaurin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nicholas McLaurin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shawn McLaurin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ricardo Maximo Palmero Medina
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rolando Medina, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Froilan Menocal
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elton Miles, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Victor H. Miranda
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shelia Mitchem
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brandy Morris
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kadina Morris
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Evans Murillo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cortelious Murphy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Margie Nabors
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Henry Nesly
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeremy Ogden
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nydia Ollison
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Aldair Palmero
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ja Pears
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Giovanni Perez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shrita Perryman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maria Ramirez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Victor Ramirez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rosalind Randelson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Isaiah Robinson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Malik Robinson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anthony Rodriguez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kathy Ann Rodriguez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Valeria Rodriguez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Blanca Romero
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cherry W. Russell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sostenes Salazar
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kendrick Shields
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Destiny Simpson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Danna Michell Barahon Solis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jackeline Solis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marcial Solis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
C. Sparkman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Uriah Stephens
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Genice Steverson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lovely Sylvain
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Reginald Taylor
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joshua Tolston
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tyrone Turner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maria Vega
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cristobal Victoria
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jaden Wade
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nina Wade
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Armani Watson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brittany White
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
India White
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CaDarrell Wilcox
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Princess Williams
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tarandell Williams, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Herminia Rodriguez de Cervantes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robespier Aguirre
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Aurora Araujo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Samuel Chapa
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Reukerria Jackson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lesli Jordan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jody Juliusson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maraya Loeza
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Aliyah Major
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Johana Morales
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Oscar Oliva
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brice Randolph
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Damille Reynolds
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tyauna Statum
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DeQuinn Stephens
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronnie Williams
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Friday, May 09, 2025 | ||
85 | 85
![]() ORDER Signed by Judge David J. Hale on 5/8/25 granting84 Motion to Alter Judgment: The Judgment in this matter (D.N.83 ) is AMENDED to reflect that Defendants Next Level Relief, LLC, Brandon Cain, and Justin Bowie are jointly and severally liable to Plaintiffs for the amount stated in the Judgment. In addition, the Judgment is FURTHER AMENDED to reflect that the amounts attributable to each Plaintiff shall be consistent with the spreadsheet attached to Plaintiffs' motion for default judgment (D.N.81 -2) and motion to amend(D.N.84 -2). The 4/9/2025 Judgment (D.N.83 ) shall otherwise remain unchanged and in effect. cc: Counsel (DJT) |
|
Wednesday, May 07, 2025 | ||
84 | 84
![]() MOTION to Alter Judgment or Amend Default Judgment or in the Alternative for Entry of Judgment by Plaintiff Dwan Brooks (Bohrer, Philip) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |