Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Virginia M Hernandez Cov
Referred: Sean P Flynn
Case #: 8:23-cv-01617
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(a) Injunction against Misappropriation of Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Jul 18, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Jan 14, 2024 5:28 AM EST
Defendant
John Brown
Represented By
William J. Cook
Cook Law, P.A.
contact info
Paul B. Thanasides
Mcintyre
contact info
Joshua L. Hawes
Mcintyre
contact info
Defendant
Thomas Andrew Van De Motter
Represented By
William J. Cook
Cook Law, P.A.
contact info
Paul B. Thanasides
Mcintyre
contact info
Joshua L. Hawes
Mcintyre
contact info
Defendant
Jake Lawless
Represented By
William J. Cook
Cook Law, P.A.
contact info
Paul B. Thanasides
Mcintyre
contact info
Joshua L. Hawes
Mcintyre
contact info
Defendant
Alexander Hart
Represented By
William J. Cook
Cook Law, P.A.
contact info
Paul B. Thanasides
Mcintyre
contact info
Joshua L. Hawes
Mcintyre
contact info
Defendant
Joshua Arnold
Represented By
William J. Cook
Cook Law, P.A.
contact info
Paul B. Thanasides
Mcintyre
contact info
Joshua L. Hawes
Mcintyre
contact info
Defendant
Paul Venzor
Represented By
William J. Cook
Cook Law, P.A.
contact info
Paul B. Thanasides
Mcintyre
contact info
Joshua L. Hawes
Mcintyre
contact info
Defendant
Trevor Toma
Represented By
William J. Cook
Cook Law, P.A.
contact info
Paul B. Thanasides
Mcintyre
contact info
Joshua L. Hawes
Mcintyre
contact info
Defendant
Jeff Ruby
Represented By
William J. Cook
Cook Law, P.A.
contact info
Paul B. Thanasides
Mcintyre
contact info
Joshua L. Hawes
Mcintyre
contact info
Defendant
Michael Prusik
Represented By
William J. Cook
Cook Law, P.A.
contact info
Paul B. Thanasides
Mcintyre
contact info
Joshua L. Hawes
Mcintyre
contact info
Defendant
Microchip USA, LLC
Represented By
William J. Cook
Cook Law, P.A.
contact info
Paul B. Thanasides
Mcintyre
contact info
Joshua L. Hawes
Mcintyre
contact info
Defendant
Mitchell Kogge
Represented By
William J. Cook
Cook Law, P.A.
contact info
Paul B. Thanasides
Mcintyre
contact info
Joshua L. Hawes
Mcintyre
contact info
Defendant
Kimie Koga
Represented By
William J. Cook
Cook Law, P.A.
contact info
Paul B. Thanasides
Mcintyre
contact info
Joshua L. Hawes
Mcintyre
contact info
Defendant
Tyler Ayala
Represented By
William J. Cook
Cook Law, P.A.
contact info
Paul B. Thanasides
Mcintyre
contact info
Joshua L. Hawes
Mcintyre
contact info
Mediator
Bradford Kimbro
Represented By
Bradford D. Kimbro
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Direct Components, Inc.
Represented By
John Christopher Getty
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.
contact info
William Edward Grob
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart, P.C. - Tampa
contact info
Marielly Abzun
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Joseph Centrone
Terminated: 08/08/2023


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, May 15, 2025
279 279 minutes Discovery Hearing Thu 05/15 6:15 PM
Minute Entry. In Person Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn: Discovery Hearing held on 5/15/2025. (DIGITAL) (EJC)
Related: [-]
278 278 notice Notice of Hearing Thu 05/15 3:27 PM
NOTICE of hearing: Case Management Conference set for 6/23/2025 at 02:00 PM in Tampa Courtroom 11 B before Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. (ACS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
277 277 motion Sanctions Wed 05/14 8:48 PM
MOTION for Sanctions to Exclude Unproduced Evidence at Trial by Joshua Arnold, Tyler Ayala, John Brown, Alexander Hart, Kimie Koga, Mitchell Kogge, Jake Lawless, Microchip USA, LLC, Michael Prusik, Jeff Ruby, Trevor Toma, Thomas Andrew Van De Motter, Paul Venzor. (Thanasides, Paul)
Related: [-]
276 276 respm Response to motion Wed 05/14 11:51 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re250 MOTION to Compel Responses to DCI's Second Requests for Production to Microchip USA filed by Joshua Arnold, Tyler Ayala, John Brown, Alexander Hart, Kimie Koga, Mitchell Kogge, Jake Lawless, Microchip USA, LLC, Michael Prusik, Jeff Ruby, Trevor Toma, Thomas Andrew Van De Motter, Paul Venzor. (Thanasides, Paul)
Related: [-]
275 275 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 05/14 11:11 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re254 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Court Order and to Exceed Time Limit for Plaintiff's Deposition filed by Direct Components, Inc..(Zinober, Peter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Excerpts from Hearing Transcript
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
274 274 motion Compel Tue 05/13 6:18 PM
Ninth MOTION to Compel Discovery by Joshua Arnold, Tyler Ayala, John Brown, Alexander Hart, Kimie Koga, Mitchell Kogge, Jake Lawless, Microchip USA, LLC, Michael Prusik, Jeff Ruby, Trevor Toma, Thomas Andrew Van De Motter, Paul Venzor.(Thanasides, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
273 273 motion Motion to Seal Tue 05/13 6:14 PM
Unopposed MOTION to file DOCUMENT Under Seal Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(d) under seal by Joshua Arnold, Tyler Ayala, John Brown, Alexander Hart, Kimie Koga, Mitchell Kogge, Jake Lawless, Microchip USA, LLC, Michael Prusik, Jeff Ruby, Trevor Toma, Thomas Andrew Van De Motter, Paul Venzor(Thanasides, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Sealed Item
272 272 motion Compel Tue 05/13 6:06 PM
Eighth MOTION to Compel Discovery by Joshua Arnold, Tyler Ayala, John Brown, Alexander Hart, Kimie Koga, Mitchell Kogge, Jake Lawless, Microchip USA, LLC, Michael Prusik, Jeff Ruby, Trevor Toma, Thomas Andrew Van De Motter, Paul Venzor.(Thanasides, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 2,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 3,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 4,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 5,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 6,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit 8,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit 9,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit 10,
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit 11,
Att: 10 Exhibit Exhibit 12,
Att: 11 Exhibit Exhibit 13,
Att: 12 Exhibit Exhibit 14,
Att: 13 Exhibit Exhibit 15,
Att: 14 Exhibit Exhibit 16,
Att: 15 Exhibit Exhibit 17,
Att: 16 Exhibit Exhibit 18,
Att: 17 Exhibit Exhibit 19,
Att: 18 Exhibit Exhibit 20,
Att: 19 Exhibit Exhibit 21,
Att: 20 Exhibit Exhibit 22,
Att: 21 Exhibit Exhibit 23,
Att: 22 Exhibit Exhibit 24,
Att: 23 Exhibit Exhibit 25,
Att: 24 Exhibit Exhibit 26,
Att: 25 Exhibit Exhibit 27,
Att: 26 Exhibit Exhibit 28,
Att: 27 Exhibit Exhibit 29,
Att: 28 Exhibit Exhibit 30,
Att: 29 Exhibit Exhibit 31,
Att: 30 Exhibit Exhibit 32,
Att: 31 Exhibit Exhibit 33,
Att: 32 Exhibit Exhibit 34,
Att: 33 Exhibit Exhibit 35
271 271 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Tue 05/13 4:47 PM
ENDORSED ORDER denying 270 Defendants' Motion for Leave to File a Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 5/13/2025. (ACS)
Related: [-]
270 270 motion Leave to File Document Tue 05/13 3:15 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Appoint Referee by Joshua Arnold, Tyler Ayala, John Brown, Alexander Hart, Kimie Koga, Mitchell Kogge, Jake Lawless, Microchip USA, LLC, Michael Prusik, Jeff Ruby, Trevor Toma, Thomas Andrew Van De Motter, Paul Venzor. (Thanasides, Paul)
Related: [-]
269 269 order Order on Motion to Compel Tue 05/13 10:25 AM
ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot 265 Defendants' Eighth Motion to Compel, based on Defendants' Notice of Withdrawal of Motion (Doc. 267). Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 5/13/2025. (ACS)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
268 268 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 05/12 8:13 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re242 MOTION to Appoint Expert / Referee for Future Depositions of Plaintiff's Witnesses or to Permit Such Depositions to be Conducted at the Court filed by Direct Components, Inc..(Zinober, Peter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit
267 267 misc Notice of Withdrawal of Motion Mon 05/12 5:35 PM
NOTICE of WITHDRAWAL of motion re265 Motion to Compelfiled by Joshua Arnold, Trevor Toma, Michael Prusik, Kimie Koga, Thomas Andrew Van De Motter, Alexander Hart, Jeff Ruby, Mitchell Kogge, Tyler Ayala, Jake LawlessMicrochip USA, LLC, John Brown, Paul Venzor by Joshua Arnold, Tyler Ayala, John Brown, Alexander Hart, Kimie Koga, Mitchell Kogge, Jake Lawless, Microchip USA, LLC, Michael Prusik, Jeff Ruby, Trevor Toma, Thomas Andrew Van De Motter, Paul Venzor (Thanasides, Paul)
Related: [-]
266 266 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 05/12 3:43 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re252 MOTION for Protective Order regarding Microchip's Unprofessional Conduct of the 30(B)(6) Deposition filed by Joshua Arnold, Tyler Ayala, John Brown, Alexander Hart, Kimie Koga, Mitchell Kogge, Jake Lawless, Microchip USA, LLC, Michael Prusik, Jeff Ruby, Trevor Toma, Thomas Andrew Van De Motter, Paul Venzor.(Thanasides, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Saturday, May 10, 2025
265 265 motion Compel Sat 05/10 6:56 PM
Eighth MOTION to Compel discovery by Joshua Arnold, Tyler Ayala, John Brown, Alexander Hart, Kimie Koga, Mitchell Kogge, Jake Lawless, Microchip USA, LLC, Michael Prusik, Jeff Ruby, Trevor Toma, Thomas Andrew Van De Motter, Paul Venzor.(Thanasides, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Friday, May 09, 2025
264 264 motion Sanctions Fri 05/09 6:42 PM
MOTION for Sanctions by Joshua Arnold, Tyler Ayala, John Brown, Alexander Hart, Kimie Koga, Mitchell Kogge, Jake Lawless, Microchip USA, LLC, Michael Prusik, Jeff Ruby, Trevor Toma, Thomas Andrew Van De Motter, Paul Venzor.(Thanasides, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit E,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit F,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit G,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit D
263 263 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / Reply Fri 05/09 4:56 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 262 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion to Appoint a Discovery Referee (Doc. 242) is due by 5/12/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 5/9/2025. (ACS)
Related: [-]
262 262 motion Extension of Time to File Response / Reply Fri 05/09 3:16 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to242 MOTION to Appoint Expert / Referee for Future Depositions of Plaintiff's Witnesses or to Permit Such Depositions to be Conducted at the Court by Direct Components, Inc.. (Abzun, Marielly)
Related: [-]
261 261 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Strike Fri 05/09 12:12 PM
ORDER denying 245 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 5/9/2025. (ACS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
260 260 order Order Thu 05/08 2:15 PM
ENDORSED ORDER re 254 Defendants' Motion to Compel. Plaintiff is directed to file a response to the motion by noon on Wednesday, May 14, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 5/8/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 5/8/2025. (ACS)
Related: [-]
259 259 order Order Thu 05/08 2:13 PM
ENDORSED ORDER re 252 Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order. Defendants are directed to file a response to the motion by noon on Wednesday, May 14, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 5/8/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 5/8/2025. (ACS)
Related: [-]
258 258 order Order Thu 05/08 2:11 PM
ENDORSED ORDER re 250 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Responses to DCI's Second Requests for Production. Defendants are directed to file a response to the motion by noon on Wednesday, May 14, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 5/8/2025. (ACS)
Related: [-]
257 257 notice Notice of Hearing on Motion Thu 05/08 2:07 PM
AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTIONS. A Motion Hearing is set for 5/15/2025 at 10:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 11 B before Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. The Court will hear argument on: Defendants' Motion to Compel (Doc. 200); Plaintiff's Motion to Compel (Doc. 217); Defendants' Sixth and Seventh Motions to Compel (Docs. 221, 235); Defendants' Motion to Appoint Discovery Referee (Doc. 242); Plaintiff's Motion to Strike (Doc. 245); Plaintiff's Motion to Compel (Doc. 250); Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order (Doc. 252); and Defendants' Motion to Compel (Doc. 254).(ACS)
Related: [-]
256 256 order Sealed Order on Motion to Seal Thu 05/08 1:54 PM
ENDORSED ORDER denying 253 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Seal Exhibit 4 to its Motion for Protective Order. The Court has already authorized the sealed filing of the deposition transcript at issue (see Docs. 238-1, 241). Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 5/8/2025. (ACS)
Related: [-]
255 255 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Thu 05/08 1:27 PM
ENDORSED ORDER denying 248 Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 5/8/2025. (ACS)
Related: [-]