Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Steven D Grimberg
Referred: Russell G Vineyard
Case #: 1:23-cv-03145
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex)
Case Filed:Jul 17, 2023
Terminated:Sep 17, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jan 13, 2024 3:58 AM EST
Defendant
North Point Ministries, Inc
Represented By
Kristina Kathleen Griffin
Hall, Gilligan, Roberts & Shanlever LLP
contact info
Matthew J. Gilligan
Hall, Gilligan, Roberts & Shanlever LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Erinleigh H. Kinyanjui
2516 Woodridge Dr
Decatur, GA 30033


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
33 33 misc Judgment - Clerk Tue 09/17 12:18 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Defendant against Plaintiff DISMISSING this case with prejudice. (tas)
Related: [-]
32 32 1 pgs order Order on Final Report and Recommendation Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Tue 09/17 11:52 AM
ORDER ADOPTING29 Final Report and Recommendation as the Order of this Court and GRANTING21 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. This action is DISMISSED with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to close this case. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 9/17/2024. (tas)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Tue 09/17 11:54 AM
Civil Case Terminated. (tas)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Tue 09/17 12:20 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Erinleigh H. Kinyanjui re33 Clerk's Judgment,32 Order on Final Report and Recommendation, Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. (tas)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
utility Submission to District Judge Mon 09/16 10:05 AM
Submission of FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re21 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by North Point Ministries, Inc,29 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re3 Complaint, filed by Erinleigh H. Kinyanjui, to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg. (dnb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2024
31 31 30+ pgs order Order Thu 08/29 12:19 PM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 8/29/2024. (tas)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Thu 08/29 9:13 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Erinleigh H. Kinyanjui re30 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation,29 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re3 Complaint, filed by Erinleigh H. Kinyanjui. (tas)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Thu 08/29 12:32 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Erinleigh H. Kinyanjui re31 Order. (tas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
30 30 2 pgs order Order for Service of Report and Recommendation Thu 08/29 9:10 AM
ORDER for Service of29 Final Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 8/28/2024. (tas)
Related: [-]
29 29 motion Report and Recommendation - Final Thu 08/29 8:26 AM
FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that3 Complaint, filed by Erinleigh H. Kinyanjui be DISMISSED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 8/28/2024. (tas)
Related: [-]
motion Report and Recommendation - Final Thu 08/29 9:08 AM
FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that21 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by North Point Ministries, Inc be GRANTED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate this referral. Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 8/28/2024. (tas)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
28 28 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 08/26 2:09 PM
AMENDED ANSWER to3 COMPLAINT by North Point Ministries, Inc. (tas)
Related: [-]
27 27 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Order on Motion to Amend Mon 08/26 1:01 PM
ORDER GRANTING26 MOTION for Extension of Time Extend Stay of Discovery , and20 MOTION to Amend Answer. The pretrial deadlines and discovery period are stayed pending the District Judges ruling on defendant's motion for judgment on the pleadings, [Doc. 21], which will be addressed in a separate Report and Recommendation. Clerk is DIRECTED to enter on the docket the amended answer filed with the motion, [Doc. 20-3], which shall become the operative pleading in place of defendant's prior answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 8/26/2024. (tas)
Related: [-]
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Mon 08/26 12:25 PM
Submission of26 MOTION for Extension of Time Extend Stay of Discovery , to Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard. (dnb)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Mon 08/26 2:11 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Erinleigh H. Kinyanjui re27 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, Order on Motion to Amend. (tas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
26 26 motion Extension of Time Wed 08/07 7:50 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time Extend Stay of Discovery by North Point Ministries, Inc.(Gilligan, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Motion to Extend Stay
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
25 25 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Order on Report and Recommendation Wed 07/31 1:19 PM
ORDER ADOPTING22 Report and Recommendations and GRANTING10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiff's claims pursuant to the Equal Pay Act and Fair Labor Standards Act, in addition to her unspecified state law claims, are DISMISSED. Kinyanjui's Title VII claim is DISMISSED to the extent it relies on conduct that occurred prior to 10/8/2020. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 7/31/2024. (tas)
Related: [-]
misc Clerk's Notation for LOA/CIP Wed 07/31 10:50 AM
ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER: Clerk's Notation re: certificates of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement ECF12 ,16 ; no conflicts identified. Approved by Judge Grimberg.(dnb)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Wed 07/31 1:26 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Erinleigh H. Kinyanjui re25 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Order on Report and Recommendation. (tas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
utility Submission to District Judge Tue 07/09 3:44 PM
Submission of22 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by North Point Ministries, Inc, to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg. (dnb)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
23 23 2 pgs order Order for Service of Report and Recommendation Fri 06/21 1:02 PM
ORDER for Service of22 Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 6/21/2024. (tas)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Report and Recommendation Fri 06/21 1:01 PM
NON-FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by North Point Ministries, Inc be GRANTED, and Plaintiff's claims pursuant to the EPA and FSLA, in addition to her unspecified state law claims, be DISMISSED. Further, it is RECOMMENDED that Kinyanjuis Title VII claim be DISMISSED to the extent it relies on conduct that occurred prior 10/8/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 6/21/2024. (tas)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Judgment on the Pleadings Fri 06/21 1:40 AM
MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings with Brief In Support by North Point Ministries, Inc. (Gilligan, Matthew)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Amend Fri 06/21 1:38 AM
MOTION to Amend with Brief In Support by North Point Ministries, Inc.(Gilligan, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend Answer,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Amended Answer (Redlined),
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Amended Answer (Final),
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Fri 06/21 1:04 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Erinleigh H. Kinyanjui re22 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by North Point Ministries, Inc,23 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. (tas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
19 19 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Wed 04/10 1:16 PM
ORDER GRANTING14 Motion to Stay and the pretrial deadlines and discovery period are stayed pending the District Judges ruling on defendant's partial motion to dismiss, [Doc. 10], which will be addressed in a separate Report and Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 4/10/2024. (tas)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Wed 04/10 1:20 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Erinleigh H. Kinyanjui re19 Order on Motion to Stay. (tas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
18 18 discov Initial Disclosures Wed 02/28 11:05 AM
Initial Disclosures by North Point Ministries, Inc.(Gilligan, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
17 17 misc Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Wed 01/17 9:57 AM
JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by North Point Ministries, Inc.(Gilligan, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Scheduling Order
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
16 16 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 01/16 4:05 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Erinleigh H. Kinyanjui. (jbu)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Tue 01/16 3:43 PM
Plaintiff's Portion of JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Erinleigh H. Kinyanjui. (jbu)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Tue 01/09 1:08 PM
Submission of10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , to Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard. (adg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
14 14 motion Stay Tue 01/02 2:53 PM
MOTION to Stay Discovery and Other Deadlines by North Point Ministries, Inc.(Gilligan, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Stay Discovery and Other Deadlines
Thursday, December 21, 2023
13 13 order Guidelines for Discovery and Motion Practice Thu 12/21 2:25 PM
Guidelines for Discovery and Motion Practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 12/21/2023. (dgr)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Thu 12/21 2:26 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Erinleigh H. Kinyanjui re13 Order-Guidelines for Discovery and Motion Practice. (dgr)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
12 12 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 12/18 4:32 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by North Point Ministries, Inc. (Gilligan, Matthew)
Related: [-]
11 11 34 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Mon 12/18 4:30 PM
Defendant's ANSWER to3 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by North Point Ministries, Inc. Discovery ends on 5/16/2024.(Gilligan, Matthew)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 12/18 4:25 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by North Point Ministries, Inc. (Gilligan, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
9 9 service Request for Waiver of Service Tue 10/17 3:39 PM
REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service mailed to North Point Ministries, Inc. on 10/17/2023. If waiver not returned by 11/21/2023, prepare personal service package. (tas)
Related: [-]
8 8 respoth Response to Order to Show Cause Tue 10/17 3:33 PM
Construed by Clerk as RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re:4 Order to Show Cause, filed by Erinleigh H. Kinyanjui. (tas)
Related: [-]
7 7 utility Remark Tue 10/17 3:31 PM
Remark: USM Form and Summons Received. (tas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 USM Form,
Att: 2 Summons
6 6 discov Initial Disclosures Tue 10/17 3:29 PM
Initial Disclosures by Erinleigh H. Kinyanjui.(tas)
Related: [-]
5 5 minutes Show Cause Hearing Tue 10/17 12:34 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard: Show Cause Hearing held on 10/17/2023. Plaintiff provided a response in writing as well as her forms for service, summonses, and initial disclosures. The Court excused plaintiff's non-compliance, and plaintiff was advised of her responsibilities and cautioned that failure to comply with local rules and Court orders may result in sanctions including recommendation of dismissal of this action. (Tape #FTR)(tas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
4 4 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 10/10 11:02 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff is ORDERED to appear for a Show Cause Hearing on 10/17/2023 at 11:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 2022 before Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard to show cause, in person and in writing, why this case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. See LR 41.3, NDGa.; Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). Plaintiff is further ORDERED to return the completed USM 285 form, summons, and the initial disclosures form at the hearing or prior to 10/17/2023. Failure to comply with this Order may result in sanctions, which could include dismissal of this action. If plaintiff no longer intends to prosecute this action, she may file a motion to voluntarily dismiss the action prior to 10/17/2023, and be relieved from appearing for the show cause hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 10/10/2023. (tas)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Tue 10/10 11:03 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Erinleigh H. Kinyanjui re4 Order to Show Cause. (tas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 31, 2023
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Thu 08/31 10:12 AM
Submission of2 Order re Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard. (slc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 03, 2023
3 3 cmp Complaint Thu 08/03 1:11 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Erinleigh H. Kinyanjui.(tht)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
2 2 4 pgs order Order on Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 08/03 12:43 PM
ORDER granting1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to send plaintiff the USM 285 form, summons, and initial disclosures form. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to complete the USM 285 form, summons, and initial disclosures form, and to return one for the defendant named in the complaint within twenty (20) days from the entry date of this Order, to the Clerk of Court. Upon receipt of the forms by the Clerk, the Clerk is DIRECTED to prepare a service waiver package for the named defendant. In the event that the defendant does not return the Waiver of Service form to the Clerk of Court within thirty-five (35) days following the date on which the service waiver package was mailed, the Clerk is DIRECTED to prepare and transmit to the U.S. Marshals Service a service package for the defendant. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to serve upon the defendant or defendants counsel a copy of every additional pleading or other document which is filed with the Clerk of Court. Plaintiff is also REQUIRED to KEEP the Court and the defendant advised of her current address at all times during the pendency of this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 08/03/2023. (tht)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Thu 08/03 12:56 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Erinleigh H. Kinyanjui re2 Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Forms sent to party: USM 285; Summons; Initial Disclosures. (tht)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 18, 2023
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Tue 07/18 10:01 AM
Submission of1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard. (nmb)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 17, 2023
1 1 motion Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 07/18 10:00 AM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Erinleigh H. Kinyanjui.(nmb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet