California Northern District Court
Judge:Araceli Martinez-Olguin
Case #: 3:23-cv-03543
Nature of Suit362 Torts - Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Medical Malpractice
Case Filed:Jul 17, 2023
Terminated:Apr 04, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jan 13, 2024 12:45 AM PST
Defendant
CIA
Defendant
DHS
Defendant
FBI
Defendant
Merck
Defendant
Pfizer
Defendant
Salinas Valley Memorial Hospital
Facility, Medical Malpractice Policy -- Dr. Gus Halamandaris 450 E Romie Lane
Salinas, CA 93901
Defendant
Secret Service
Defendant
Security and Exchange Commission
Defendant
Southwestern Vermont Medical Center Surgery Center
Facility, Physicians, Surgeons, Medical Malpractice Policy 955 A Blanco Circle
Salinas, CA 93901
Defendant
Stanford Neuroscience Health Center
Facility, Surgeons, Medical Malpractice Policy -- Dr. Jon Park 213 Quarry Road
Palo Alto, CA 94304
Defendant
USPS
Defendant
USSOCOM
Plaintiff
Christopher Martinez
7335 Valle Pacifico Road
Prunedale, CA 93907
Plaintiff
Terrance Turner
Service Zero Professional Services 45520 East Severn Way #410
Sterling, VA 20166

GPO Jan 23 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Objections due by 2/6/2024. (shy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
GPO Apr 04 2024
ORDER ADOPTING 9 Report and Recommendations and DISMISSING the case. The Court DENIES as moot 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin on April 4, 2024. (amolc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
GPO Apr 04 2024
JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin on April 4, 2024. (amolc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)

Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, April 04, 2024
13 13 order Judgment Thu 04/04 10:22 AM
JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin on April 4, 2024. (amolc3, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
12 12 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Order on Report and Recommendations Thu 04/04 10:20 AM
ORDER ADOPTING 9 Report and Recommendations and DISMISSING the case. The Court DENIES as moot 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin on April 4, 2024. (amolc3, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
11 11 misc Objection Wed 01/24 1:10 PM
OBJECTIONS to re9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Terrance Turner FBI EMERGENCY CLIENTS BEING SPIED ON AND CONTACTED THROUGH MULTIPLE CASE DEFENDANTS by Terrance Turner. (Turner, Terrance)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 01/23 3:29 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 1/23/2024.(ark, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
9 9 motion Report and Recommendations Tue 01/23 1:31 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Objections due by 2/6/2024. (shy, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
8 8 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Thu 10/12 10:04 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE: The parties are hereby notified that the initial case management conference is vacated and removed from Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse's 10/20/2023 calendar. The Court shall add the case management conference back to calendar, if and when necessary. (shy, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 01, 2023
7 7 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Fri 09/01 4:47 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Christopher Martinez.. (Turner, Terrance)
Related: [-]
Saturday, August 26, 2023
6 6 misc Letter Sat 08/26 8:26 PM
Letter from Terrance Turner INFORMATION, A CONFESSION . (Turner, Terrance)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 25, 2023
5 5 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Fri 08/25 12:23 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF CHRISTOPHER MARTINEZ Re: Consent or Declination. Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 9/8/2023. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . (shy, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Sunday, July 30, 2023
4 4 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Sun 07/30 2:25 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Terrance Turner.. (Turner, Terrance)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 17, 2023
3 3 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Tue 07/18 9:35 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/13/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/20/2023 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor. (bar, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 07/18 9:33 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Terrance Turner, I. (bar, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 07/18 9:30 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed by Christopher Martinez, Terrance Turner, I. Consent/Declination due by 7/31/2023.(bar, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Envelope