Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:William S Stickman
Case #: 2:23-cv-01300
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1343 Violation of Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jul 18, 2023
Terminated:Apr 08, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jan 14, 2024 5:41 AM EST
Defendant
COEN MARKETS, INC
Represented By
David A. Young
Bunker & Ray
contact info
Defendant
COEN OIL COMPANY, LLC
Represented By
David A. Young
Bunker & Ray
contact info
Plaintiff
VICTOR ARDENO
Represented By
Charles A. Lamberton
Lamberton Law Firm
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Mediator
CAROLE KATZ
Terminated: 01/04/2024
Represented By
Carole S. Katz
Carole Katz LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Monday, April 08, 2024
19 19 order Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Mon 04/08 3:00 PM
ORDER APPROVING18 Stipulation of Dismissal. The Clerk of Court is directed to mark this CASE CLOSED. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 04/08/24. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Stipulation of Dismissal (Atty) Mon 04/08 9:42 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by VICTOR ARDENO. (Lamberton, Charles)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2024
17 17 order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Order Thu 01/04 2:19 PM
ORDER OF COURT. Upon review of16 Report of Mediation, all deadlines in this matter are TERMINATED. The Court will await the filing of a stipulation of dismissal to close this case. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 01/04/24. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
Related: [-]
16 16 adr Report of Mediation Thu 01/04 1:40 PM
REPORT of Mediation: Mediation held on 1/4/2024. Case has been resolved. CAROLE KATZ terminated. Attorney Carole S. Katz terminated. The parties are reminded of their obligation to complete the ADR questionnaire and return same to the Clerk of Court within 5 days of the conclusion of the ADR process. The questionnaire can be accessed at www.pawd.uscourts.gov. Click on the ADR icon. (Katz, Carole)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
15 15 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Mediation Mon 11/13 11:43 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Carole Katz is appointed as mediator. Mediation to be concluded by 01/13/24. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 11/13/23. (eca)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Case Management Order Mon 11/13 11:39 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 11/30/23; Joinder of Parties due 11/30/23; Exchange of initial disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1) due by 12/04/23; Discovery ends 04/15/24; Telephonic Post-Discovery Status Conference set for 04/15/24 at 10:00 AM; Call parameters outlined herein; Summary Judgment due by 04/30/24; Response to Summary Judgment due by 05/30/24; Reply brief due by 06/14/24; Page limitations outlined herein. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 11/13/23. (eca)
Related: [-]
13 13 minutes Initial Case Management Conference Mon 11/13 11:24 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William S. Stickman: Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference held on 11/13/2023. (Court Reporter: None) (eca)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
12 12 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Tue 11/07 2:55 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Lamberton, Charles)
Related: [-]
11 11 adr Stipulation Selecting ADR process Tue 11/07 2:53 PM
STIPULATION selecting ADR process by VICTOR ARDENO. (Lamberton, Charles)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
10 10 misc Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)) Thu 10/12 4:09 PM
Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate by COEN MARKETS, INC, COEN OIL COMPANY, LLC. (Young, David)
Related: [-]
9 9 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 10/12 2:12 PM
ORDER SCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Rule 26 Meeting to be conducted on or before 11/3/2023. Rule 26 Meeting Report and Stipulation Selecting ADR Process due by 11/8/2023. Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/13/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge William S. Stickman. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 10/12/23. (eca)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 10/12 8:26 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by COEN MARKETS, INC, COEN OIL COMPANY, LLC. (Young, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
7 7 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 09/13 2:49 PM
ORDER APPROVING6 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendants shall file their responsive pleading on or before 10/15/23. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 09/13/23. (eca)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 09/13 10:52 AM
Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by COEN MARKETS, INC, COEN OIL COMPANY, LLC Answer due from COEN MARKETS, INC on 10/16/2023; COEN OIL COMPANY, LLC on 10/16/2023. (Young, David)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Deadline Thu 09/14 9:39 AM
Update Answer Deadline: Answer due from COEN MARKETS, INC, COEN OIL COMPANY, LLC on 10/15/23. (dmh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 29, 2023
5 5 service Summons/Return of Service Returned Executed Tue 08/29 1:20 PM
SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by VICTOR ARDENO. COEN OIL COMPANY, LLC served on 8/25/2023, answer due 9/15/2023. (Lamberton, Charles)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons/Return of Service Returned Executed Tue 08/29 1:19 PM
SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by VICTOR ARDENO. COEN MARKETS, INC served on 8/25/2023, answer due 9/15/2023. (Lamberton, Charles)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 21, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 08/21 8:35 AM
Summons Issued as to COEN OIL COMPANY, LLC, COEN MARKETS, INC (keh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Coen Markets, Inc.
Saturday, August 19, 2023
2 2 service Praecipe to Issue Summons Sat 08/19 1:57 PM
PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by VICTOR ARDENO (Lamberton, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons
Tuesday, July 18, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint (for Clerk of Court personnel only) Wed 07/19 3:53 PM
COMPLAINT against COEN MARKETS, INC, COEN OIL COMPANY, LLC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-7791521), filed by VICTOR ARDENO. (dmh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet