New Jersey District Court
Judge:Susan D Wigenton
Referred: Michael A Hammer
Case #: 2:23-cv-03863
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Case Filed:Jul 19, 2023
Last checked: Monday Jan 15, 2024 3:52 AM EST
Defendant
JAZWARES, LLC
Represented By
MARISA RAUCHWAY
Chiesa Shahinian & Giantomasi PC
contact info
APRIL CAMPOS
Chiesa Shahinian & Giantomasi PC
contact info
ABIGAIL JEAN REMORE
Chiesa Shahinian & Giantomasi PC
contact info
Defendant
KELLY TOYS HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By
MARISA RAUCHWAY
Chiesa Shahinian & Giantomasi PC
contact info
APRIL CAMPOS
Chiesa Shahinian & Giantomasi PC
contact info
ABIGAIL JEAN REMORE
Chiesa Shahinian & Giantomasi PC
contact info
Notice Only
PHV MOEZ KABA
Notice Only
PHV SOURABH MISHRA
Notice Only
PHV AMBER MUNOZ
Plaintiff
KIDROBOT, LLC
Represented By
SCOTT S. CHRISTIE
Mccarter & English, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
NECA LLC
Represented By
SCOTT S. CHRISTIE
Mccarter & English, LLP
contact info

GPO Apr 24 2025
OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 4/24/2025. (mxw, )

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, April 24, 2025
85 85 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Discovery Thu 04/24 4:56 PM
ORDER denying Plaintiff's61 Motion for Discovery Sanction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 4/24/2025. (mxw, )
Related: [-]
84 84 28 pgs order Opinion Thu 04/24 4:55 PM
OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 4/24/2025. (mxw, )
Related: [-]