California Central District Court
Judge:Stephen V Wilson
Referred: Maria A Audero
Case #: 2:22-cv-06501
Nature of Suit376 Other Statutes - Qui Tam (31 U.S.C. § 3729(a))
Cause31:3730 Qui Tam False Claims Act
Case Filed:Sep 12, 2022
Terminated:Jul 28, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Jul 20, 2023 8:07 PM PDT
Defendant
Global Integrated Medical Group, Inc.
Defendant
Normita Sierra
Defendant
John Mark Sison
Plaintiff
Lincoln Analytics, Inc.
Represented By
Stephen Chahn Lee
Law Office Of Stephen Chahn Lee, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
United States of America


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, July 28, 2023
16 16 1 pgs order Dismissing Case Fri 07/28 4:17 PM
ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Plaintiff and Relator Lincoln Analytics, Inc. hereby, and upon order of the Court, dismisses without prejudice this action in its entirety, said dismissal being without prejudice as to the United States of America. Pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Plaintiff and Relator Lincoln Analytics, Inc. hereby, and upon order of the Court, dismisses without prejudice this action in its entirety, said dismissal being without prejudice as to the United States of America. RE: Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of an Action15 . (Case Terminated. Made JS-6.) (aco)
Related: [-]
15 15 3 pgs notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Fri 07/28 12:46 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by relator plaintiff Lincoln Analytics, Inc.. Dismissal is without prejudice as to the United States. (Lee, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 18, 2023
14 14 4 pgs order Order Wed 07/19 1:24 PM
ORDER RE: UNITED STATES' NOTICE OF ELECTION TO DECLINEINTERVENTION AND STIPULATION RE: UNSEALING OF CASE13 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. The seal is lifted from this action in all respects, except as specified in Paragraph 3 below. The Complaint is unsealed and the Relator shall serve it upon the defendants; 2. This Order and the United States Notice of Election to Decline Intervention and Stipulation Re: Unsealing of Case are both unsealed, and the Relator shall serve both upon the defendants with the Complaint; 3. All other contents of the Court's file in this action, filed and lodged to date, shall remain permanently under seal and shall not be made public or served upon any defendant or other party or person; 4. The seal is lifted as to all papers and records filed or lodged in this action after the date of this Order; 5. The parties shall serve all pleadings, notices, motions, orders, and other papers hereafter filed or lodged in this action, including supporting memoranda and any notice of appeal, upon the United States as provided for in 31 U.S.C. § 3730(c)(3); and 6. Should the Relator or defendants propose that this action be dismissed, settled, or otherwise discontinued, the parties shall provide the United States with notice of the same and the Court will provide the United States with an opportunity to be heard before ruling or granting its approval. (lom)
Related: [-]
13 13 6 pgs notice Notice (Other) Wed 07/19 1:15 PM
UNITED STATES' NOTICE OF ELECTION TO DECLINE INTERVENTION AND STIPULATION RE: UNSEALING OF CASE filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (lom)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 18, 2023
12 12 SEALED - ORDER GRANTING IN PART EXTENDING SEAL AND UNITED STATES' ELECTION PERIOD (bm)
Related: [-]
11 11 SEALED - MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF STIPULATION REQUESTING EXTENSION OF SEAL AND UNITED STATES' ELECTION PERIOD; DECLARATION OF HUNTER B. THOMSON IN SUPPORT THEREOF (bm)
Related: [-]
10 10 SEALED - STIPULATION REQUESTING EXTENSION OF SEAL AND UNITED STATES' ELECTION PERIOD (bm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 01, 2022
9 9 SEALED - ORDER EXTENDING SEAL AND UNITED STATES' ELECTION PERIOD (bm)
Related: [-]
8 8 SEALED - MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF STIPULATION REQUESTING EXTENSION OF SEAL AND UNITED STATES ELECTION PERIOD; DECLARATION OF JOHN LEE IN SUPPORT THEREOF (bm)
Related: [-]
7 7 SEALED - STIPULATION REQUESTING EXTENSION OF SEAL AND UNITED STATES' ELECTION PERIOD (bm)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 16, 2022
6 6 6 pgs NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 15, 2022
5 5 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (et)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 12, 2022
2 2 SEALED RULE 7.1 STATEMENT DISCLOSURE filed by Plaintiff Lincoln Analytics, Inc. (et)
Related: [-]
1 1 15 pgs COMPLAINT against Defendants Global Integrated Medical Group, Inc., Normita Sierra, John Mark Sison. Case assigned to Judge Stephen V. Wilson for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (Filing fee $ 402 PAID.) Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Lincoln Analytics, Inc.. (et) Modified on 7/19/2023 (lom).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet