Kentucky Western District Court
Case #: 3:23-cr-00083
Case Filed:Jul 19, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Jul 20, 2023 3:33 AM EDT
Defendant
Richard A. Pelphrey (1)
Represented By
Steven C. Schroering
contact info
Howard Patrick King, Jr.
H Patrick King Jr. Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Jo E. Lawless
U.S. Attorney Office - Louisville
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/20/2023 4:05 AM EDT
Tuesday, June 27, 2023
1 1 CRIMINAL COMPLAINT signed by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards as to Richard Pelphrey (1). (SRH) [3:23-mj-00428-RSE]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit in Support of Criminal Complaint
2 2 Sealed Document . (SRH) [3:23-mj-00428-RSE]
Related: [-]
Friday, June 30, 2023
Arrest of Richard Pelphrey. (SRH) [3:23-mj-00428-RSE]
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER ON INITIAL APPEARANCE for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards: Initial Appearance as to Richard Pelphrey held, via video conference, on 6/30/2023. The defendant elected to waive his right to a preliminary hearing. Detention Hearing set for 7/5/2023 at 2:30 PM in Louisville Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. The defendant is remanded to the custody of the United States Marshals Service pending further order of the Court. (Digitally recorded proceeding) cc: counsel (SRH) [3:23-mj-00428-RSE]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 05, 2023
4 4 APPEARANCE Bond Entered with Order Setting Conditions of Release as to Richard Pelphrey. (JM) [3:23-mj-00428-RSE]
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 06, 2023
5 5 ORDER ON DETENTION HEARING for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay: Detention Hearing as to Richard Pelphrey held on 7/5/2023. The defendant is released on an unsecured bond in the amount of $100,000.00 with conditions pending further order of the Court. The defendant may be released on July 6, 2023 at 9:00 a.m. (Court Reporter: Digitally Recorded.) cc: counsel, USP (JM) [3:23-mj-00428-RSE]
Related: [-]
6 6 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency re3 Order on Initial Appearance. Reason for Deficiency: failure to register to file electronically pursuant to GO 2008-03. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 7/24/2023. (KJA) [3:23-mj-00428-RSE]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 19, 2023
Schedule set. (DLW)
Related: [-]
7 7 INDICTMENT as to Richard A. Pelphrey (1) count 1. (DLW)
Related: [-]
8 8 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (DLW)
Related: [-]
9 9 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jo E. Lawless appearing for USA. (DLW)
Related: [-]
11 11 SEALED UNREDACTED INDICTMENT re7 Indictment. (DLW)
Related: [-]
12 12 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Steven C. Schroering appearing for Richard A. Pelphrey (Schroering, Steven)
Related: [-]
13 13 Sealed Document (DLW)
Related: [-]