California Central District Court
Judge:Mark C Scarsi
Referred: Alka Sagar
Case #: 2:23-cv-05858
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Jul 19, 2023
Terminated:Aug 07, 2024
Last checked: Monday Jan 15, 2024 12:48 AM PST
Defendant
XuDong Team
Plaintiff
Akrura PTE. LTD.
Represented By
Zheng Liu
Rimon PC
contact info
Shelley Ivan
Rimon PC
contact info
Mark Steven Lee
Rimon PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/21/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
40 40 misc Report of Determination of Copyright Action (CLOSE) (AO 121) Thu 08/08 3:14 PM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) (lc)
Related: [-]
39 39 judgmentCV Judgment - Default by Judge Thu 08/08 3:13 PM
JUDGMENT by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: 1. Judgment is entered in favor of Akrura PTE. LTD. and against XuDong Team. 2. Defendant and all of its agents and representatives, and any other persons and entities acting on Defendants behalf or with them, are permanently enjoined and restrained re Plaintiffs Blood Pressure mobile application (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFICS COMPLIANCE REQUIREMENTS AND DEADLINES AS ENUMERATED HEREIN). Related to: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant XuDong Team34 . ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated ) (lc)
Related: [-]
38 38 order Default Judgment Thu 08/08 2:59 PM
ORDER RE: MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT34 by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: Plaintiff's motion for default judgment is GRANTED. The Court awardsPlaintiff permanent injunctive relief (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFICS AND DEADLINES AND AS ENUMERATED HEREIN). The Court will enter a judgment consistent with this order (lc)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
37 37 respm Supplement (Motion related) Mon 04/29 12:34 PM
SUPPLEMENT to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant XuDong Team34 filed by Plaintiff Akrura PTE. LTD..(Lee, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Shelley Ivan in Support of Plaintiff's Rule 55(b) Motion for Default Judgment and Supplemental Brief,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
36 36 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Wed 04/17 4:55 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING MOTION (ECF No.34 ) UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: The Court has considered the matters raised with respect to the Motion for Default Judgment Against Defendant XuDong Team (ECF No.34 ) and has concluded that pursuant to Local Rule 7.15, the matter can be decided without oral argument. The Court advises counsel that the Motion(s), noticed for hearing on April 22, 2024, has been taken under submission and off its motion calendar. No appearance by counsel is necessary. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smo)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
35 35 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Mon 04/15 4:57 PM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER REQUIRING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. The Court on its own motion orders supplemental briefing on whether the Court has personal jurisdiction over Defendant XUDong Team. The briefing should address whether exercising personal jurisdiction in this case comports with federal due process. Plaintiff shall file the supplemental brief, which may not exceed 3,500 words, and any supporting evidence by April 29, 2024. (rolm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
34 34 motion Default Judgment Wed 03/13 4:34 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant XuDong Team filed by Plaintiff Akrura PTE. LTD.. Motion set for hearing on 4/22/2024 at 09:00 AM before Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (Lee, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum Plaintiffs Motion for Rule 55b Default Judgment,
Att: 2 Declaration LR 55-1 Declaration of M. Lee In Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Default Judgment,
Att: 3 Proposed Order Proposed Order Entering Final Default Judgment Against Defendant XuDong Team
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
33 33 order Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form Tue 03/05 12:26 PM
DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to XuDong Team, (Per 3/5/2024 Minute Order) (lc)
Related: [-]
32 32 order Entry of Default Tue 03/05 12:24 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: ORDER RE: REQUEST FOR RENEWED ENTRY OF DEFAULT30 . Plaintiff Akrura PTE. LTD. moves for entry of default Defendant XuDong Team. The Clerk referred the motion to the Court for resolution. The Court grants the motion and directs the Clerk to enter default. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFICS). (lc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
31 31 notice Deficiency - Default /Default Judgment (CV-52b) - optional html form Thu 02/29 9:52 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY Re: Renewed NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Entry of Default against Defendant XuDong Team 30 . The Clerk cannot enter the requested relief as: Request for Entry of Default has been forwarded to the assigned Judge. 1) Clerk not authorized to process default on foreign entity ;2) Filer cites service of Process was per Order for service by alternative means, by e-mail. Therefore clerk unable to determine propriety of email service; 3) This is filer's second request and in response to the second order to show cause. NOTE: Filer filed same request twice (Duplicate no. 29 under incorrect event "for default judgment". ONLY this erroneous duplicate filing no. 29 has been termed and No. 30 is the Operative request. (lc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
30 30 motion Default Wed 02/28 5:31 PM
Renewed NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Entry of Default against Defendant XuDong Team filed by Plaintiff Akrura PTE. LTD.. (Ivan, Shelley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of S. Ivan iso Plaintiff's Renewed Motion for Entry of Default
29 29 motion Default Judgment Wed 02/28 3:45 PM
Renewed NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant XuDong Team filed by Plaintiff Akrura PTE. LTD.. (Ivan, Shelley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of S. Ivan iso Plaintiff's Renewed Motion for Entry of Default
28 28 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Wed 02/28 8:24 AM
Second Order to Show Cause (LOP) by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 3/6/2024. (smo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
27 27 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Tue 01/30 2:35 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Akrura PTE. LTD., upon Defendant XuDong Team served on 1/30/2024, answer due 2/20/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Defendant at fox.xuxiaodong@gmail.com in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified (Ivan, Shelley)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2024
26 26 order Entry of Default Mon 01/29 12:17 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (ECF No.24 ) AND EXTENDING DEADLINE TO COMPLETE ALTERNATIVE SERVICE by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. The Court denies Plaintiff's motion for default for failing to substantially comply with the Court's prior order authorizing alternative service. The Court refuses entry of default. On its own motion, the Court extends the deadline to complete service to February 12, 2024. (lom)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
25 25 notice Deficiency - Default /Default Judgment (CV-52b) - optional html form Fri 01/12 10:19 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Entry of Default against Defendants XuDong Team 24 . The Clerk cannot enter the requested relief as: Request for Entry of Default has been forwarded to the assigned Judge. Per Clerk's Office procedures the request has been forwarded to the Judge: 1) Clerks are Not authorized to determine Propriety of Service of Process on a Foreign Entity, and in addition, service of process was 2) Per E-mail as PER ORDER of the Court. 3) Clerk notes no "Confirmation re receipt of email service by defendant" found in proof as filed docket no. 22 nor in the set of Request for default documents. (lc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
24 24 motion Default Thu 01/11 4:03 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Entry of Default against Defendants XuDong Team filed by Plaintiff Akrura PTE. LTD.. (Ivan, Shelley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Shelley Ivan in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Default by the Clerk Pursuant to FRCP 50(a)
Thursday, January 04, 2024
23 23 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Thu 01/04 2:43 PM
Order to Show Cause (LOP) by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 1/11/2024. (smo)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 01, 2023
22 22 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Fri 12/01 2:54 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Akrura PTE. LTD., upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Defendant company via the fox.xuxiaodong@gmail.com email address pursuant to the Order to Serve Defendant with Process by Alternative Means (Dkt. No. 15) in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified (Ivan, Shelley)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 30, 2023
21 21 order Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form Thu 11/30 3:58 PM
RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: PROOF OF SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Akrura PTE. LTD., upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure19 by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. The document is stricken. (lc)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 17, 2023
20 20 notice Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Fri 11/17 11:22 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)19 . The following error(s) was/were found: Filer selected incorrect Statute Prompt as "FRCP 5(b)(2)(D)" resulting in erroneous docket text as service of process made on Clerk's Office as agent for defendant and Missing information as to who, how and when service was made...therefore CM system failed to calculate an answer due date. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 16, 2023
19 19 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Thu 11/16 1:53 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Akrura PTE. LTD., upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Ivan, Shelley)
Related: [-]
18 18 order Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form Thu 11/16 12:59 PM
RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: Service of Summons and Complaint pursuant to 8:1451(b) Returned Executed 60 days16 by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. The document is stricken. (smo)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Thu 11/16 12:43 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Service of Summons and Complaint pursuant to 8:1451(b) Returned Executed 60 days,16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Service of summons and complaint returned executed 21 days. This is a copyright case... incorrect event with cited statute and 60 days not applicable. Other error(s) with document(s): Note: To assist in a search for correct events, please use the "SEARCH" option for a "key word" to narrow the selection process. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
16 16 service Service of Summons and Complaint pursuant to 8:1451(b) Returned Executed 60 days Wed 11/15 2:40 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Akrura PTE. LTD., upon Defendant XuDong Team served on 10/31/2023, answer due 1/2/2024. in compliance with statute not specified by method of service not specified. Original Summons NOT returned. PROOF OF ALTERNATIVE SERVICE PURSUANT TO ORDER (DKT. No. 15); DECLARATION OF SHELLEY IVAN (Ivan, Shelley)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 31, 2023
15 15 order For Order Tue 10/31 2:57 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE DEFENDANT WITHPROCESS BY ALTERNATIVE MEANS14 . The Court grants the application as to email service and denies the application as to FedEx express mail and electronic publication. The Court directs Plaintiff to provide a copy of this Order to Defendant by email.Plaintiff represents that it intends to serve Defendant abroad, so the deadline to complete service under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m) appears to be inapplicable. Nonetheless, the Court may set a reasonable time limit for service in a foreign country. The Court orders thatservice of Defendant be completed within 45 days. Failure to complete and file proof of service by this deadline will result in dismissal of Plaintiffs claims without prejudice under Federal Rule of Procedure 41(b). (lc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
14 14 7 pgs motion Order Thu 10/12 5:00 PM
EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Alternative Service filed by Plaintiff Akrura PTE. LTD.. (Lee, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Shelley Ivan in Support of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Alternative Service,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order for Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Alternative Service
Friday, July 28, 2023
13 13 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 07/28 4:08 PM
ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Shelley Ivan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Akrura PTE. LTD and designating Mark S. Lee as local counsel12 by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (lc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 26, 2023
12 12 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Wed 07/26 6:04 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Shelley Ivan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Akrura PTE. LTD. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 7/25/2023, Receipt No. 35737204) filed by Plaintiff Akrura PTE. LTD.. (Lee, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, July 25, 2023
11 11 notice Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form Wed 07/26 4:27 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Shelley Ivan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Akrura PTE. LTD. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-35737204)10 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Case information is incomplete. DJ and MJ initials missing on application and proposed order. Please note DJ and MJ Notice of Assignment, dated 7/20/23, Dkt. 5. Other error(s) with document(s): Please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed for either applicant or local counsel. See Instructions for Applicants (1). (lt)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Tue 07/25 5:59 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Shelley Ivan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Akrura PTE. LTD. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-35737204) filed by Plaintiff Akrura PTE. LTD.. (Lee, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Special Case Pro Hac Vice
Thursday, July 20, 2023
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Thu 07/20 3:02 PM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (dbe)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 07/20 2:48 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant XuDong Team. (sh)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Thu 07/20 2:44 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Thu 07/20 2:43 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Thu 07/20 2:43 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Mark C. Scarsi and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (sh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 19, 2023
4 4 misc Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) (AO-121) Wed 07/19 7:01 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by AKRURA PTE. LTD., a Singapore company. (Lee, Mark)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 07/19 6:58 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff AKRURA PTE. LTD., a Singapore company, identifying Akrura PTE. LTD.. (Lee, Mark)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Summons Request Wed 07/19 6:53 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff AKRURA PTE. LTD., a Singapore company. (Lee, Mark)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 07/19 6:48 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-35702717 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff AKRURA PTE. LTD., a Singapore company. (Attorney Mark Steven Lee added to party AKRURA PTE. LTD., a Singapore company(pty:pla))(Lee, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet