Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Julie S Sneed
Referred: Robert M Norway
Case #: 6:23-cv-01367
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Jul 20, 2023
Terminated:Apr 22, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 16, 2024 3:45 AM EST
Defendant
Chad Johnson
Represented By
Natalie J. Storch
Littler Mendelson, PA
contact info
Kimberly J. Doud
Littler Mendelson, PC
contact info
Defendant
Lady Jane's Altamonte Springs, FL LLC.
Represented By
Natalie J. Storch
Littler Mendelson, PA
contact info
Kimberly J. Doud
Littler Mendelson, PC
contact info
Defendant
Lady Jane's Haircuts For Men Holding Company, LLC.
Represented By
Natalie J. Storch
Littler Mendelson, PA
contact info
Kimberly J. Doud
Littler Mendelson, PC
contact info
Defendant
Lady Jane's Orlando-UCF FL, LLC.
Represented By
Natalie J. Storch
Littler Mendelson, PA
contact info
Kimberly J. Doud
Littler Mendelson, PC
contact info
Defendant
Lady Jane's Winter Park FL, LLC.
Represented By
Natalie J. Storch
Littler Mendelson, PA
contact info
Kimberly J. Doud
Littler Mendelson, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Stephanie Rybarczyk
Represented By
Noah E. Storch
Richard Celler Legal, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
28 28 4 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 04/30 4:48 PM
ORDER approving settlement agreements and dismissing case. Signed by Judge Julie S. Sneed on April 30, 2024. (SC)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
27 27 notice Notice (Other) Mon 04/29 4:14 PM
NOTICE by Chad Johnson, Lady Jane's Altamonte Springs, FL LLC., Lady Jane's Haircuts For Men Holding Company, LLC., Lady Jane's Orlando-UCF FL, LLC., Lady Jane's Winter Park FL, LLC. (JOINT) OF FILING ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT BY ARBITRATOR(Storch, Natalie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
26 26 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Report and Recommendations Mon 04/29 3:10 PM
ORDER granting 16 Motion to Dismiss and adopting 17 Report and Recommendations. This matter remains closed. Signed by Judge Julie S. Sneed on April 29, 2024. (SC)
Related: [-]
25 25 minutes Status Conference Mon 04/29 11:42 AM
Minute Entry. Virtual Proceedings held before Judge Julie S. Sneed: ZOOM STATUS CONFERENCE held on 4/29/2024. Court Reporter: Heather Suarez (GNB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
24 24 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 04/25 2:50 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE by Chad Johnson, Lady Jane's Altamonte Springs, FL LLC., Lady Jane's Haircuts For Men Holding Company, LLC., Lady Jane's Orlando-UCF FL, LLC., Lady Jane's Winter Park FL, LLC.. (Storch, Natalie)
Related: [-]
23 23 notice Notice of Hearing Thu 04/25 10:22 AM
NOTICE OF ZOOM VIDEO HEARING: Status Conference set for 4/29/2024 at 11:00 AM in Zoom Video Conference before Judge Julie S. Sneed. The Clerk will be sending everyone an invitation to the conference via email. If you have any questions, please contact chambers at CHAMBERS_FLMD_SNEED@flmd.uscourts.gov. Although the conference is taking place by video, all parties should dress appropriately for this Court proceeding. Furthermore, the parties are hereby reminded that under Local Rule 5.01 the taking of photographs, the operation of recording or transmission devices, and the broadcasting or televising of proceedings in any courtroom or hearing room of this Court, or the environs thereof, either while the Court is in session or at recesses between sessions when Court officials, lawyers, jurors, witnesses or other persons connected with judicial proceedings of any kind are present, are prohibited. (GNB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
22 22 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Tue 04/23 9:52 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JDR)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
21 21 1 pgs order Order Mon 04/22 5:15 PM
60-DAY ORDER OF DISMISSAL. All pending motions, if any, are denied as moot. The Clerk is directed to CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Julie S. Sneed on April 22, 2024. (SC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
20 20 order Order Wed 04/10 11:59 AM
ENDORSED ORDER re 18 Notice of Settlement. The parties are reminded of their obligation under Lynn's Foods and that they may consent to the jurisdiction of the assigned magistrate judge to resolve any forthcoming joint motion to approve their FLSA settlement agreement and dismiss the case with prejudice. Doing so would allow the resolution of the motion without the necessity of the issuance of a report and recommendation. If the parties would like to consent to the magistrate judge resolving any motion and granting the relief requested therein, they must all sign and file Form AO 85A, available at https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/forms/all. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway on 4/10/2024. (JBS)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
19 19 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 03/18 10:50 AM
Case Reassigned to District Judge Julie S. Sneed. New case number: 6:23-cv-1367-JSS-RMN. Judge Wendy W. Berger no longer assigned to the case. (AJS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
18 18 adr Mediation report Wed 02/28 1:01 PM
MEDIATION report Hearing held on January 29, 2024. Hearing outcome: Settled.. (Burruezo, Carlos)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
17 17 motion Report and Recommendations Thu 01/11 4:57 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re Defendants' 16 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Motion to Stay and Compel Arbitration and Strike Class and Collective Allegations. I respectfully recommend that the Court grant the motion, dismiss the complaint and Plaintiffs' claims, and administratively close this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway on 1/11/2024. (Norway, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 06, 2023
16 16 motion Dismiss Mon 11/06 6:15 PM
MOTION to Dismiss OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO STAY AND COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STRIKE CLASS AND COLLECTIVE ALLEGATIONS, AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT by All Defendants.(Storch, Natalie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
15 15 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / Reply Tue 10/10 7:13 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting Defendants' 13 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before November 6, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway on 10/10/2023. (Norway, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
14 14 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Fri 10/06 4:28 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Natalie J. Storch on behalf of Chad Johnson, Lady Jane's Altamonte Springs, FL LLC., Lady Jane's Haircuts For Men Holding Company, LLC., Lady Jane's Orlando-UCF FL, LLC., Lady Jane's Winter Park FL, LLC.. Lead Counsel: Natalie J. Storch. (Storch, Natalie)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Extension of Time to File Response / Reply Fri 10/06 4:24 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Complaint by Chad Johnson, Lady Jane's Altamonte Springs, FL LLC., Lady Jane's Haircuts For Men Holding Company, LLC., Lady Jane's Orlando-UCF FL, LLC., Lady Jane's Winter Park FL, LLC.. (Storch, Natalie)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of appearance Fri 10/06 3:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly J. Doud on behalf of Chad Johnson, Lady Jane's Altamonte Springs, FL LLC., Lady Jane's Haircuts For Men Holding Company, LLC., Lady Jane's Orlando-UCF FL, LLC., Lady Jane's Winter Park FL, LLC. (Doud, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Fri 10/06 3:26 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Natalie J. Storch on behalf of Chad Johnson, Lady Jane's Altamonte Springs, FL LLC., Lady Jane's Orlando-UCF FL, LLC., Lady Jane's Winter Park FL, LLC.. Lead Counsel: Natalie J. Storch. (Storch, Natalie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 10, 2023
10 10 notice Notice of consent to join Thu 08/10 1:32 PM
NOTICE of consent to join by Stephanie Rybarczyk of Opt-in Plaintiff Maegan Childers .(Storch, Noah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Opt-in Plaintiff Maegan Childers
9 9 notice Notice of consent to join Thu 08/10 1:24 PM
NOTICE of consent to join by Stephanie Rybarczyk of Opt-in Plaintiff Elena Rosario .(Storch, Noah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Opt-in Plaintiff Elena Rosario
Wednesday, August 09, 2023
8 8 notice Notice of consent to join Wed 08/09 4:45 PM
NOTICE of consent to join by Stephanie Rybarczyk of Opt-in Plaintiff Joy Sanders .(Storch, Noah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Opt-in Plaintiff Joy Sanders
7 7 notice Notice of consent to join Wed 08/09 4:33 PM
NOTICE of consent to join by Stephanie Rybarczyk of Opt-in Plaintiff Yahweh Ben .(Storch, Noah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Yahweh Ben
6 6 notice Notice of consent to join Wed 08/09 4:22 PM
NOTICE of consent to join by Stephanie Rybarczyk of Opt-in Plaintiff Jessica Mills .(Storch, Noah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Jessica Mills
Wednesday, July 26, 2023
5 5 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Report and Recommendations Wed 07/26 12:09 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 7/26/2023. (RMF)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Order Wed 07/26 12:06 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: The Middle District of Florida's revised Local Rules become effective February 1, 2021 and can be found on the Court's public website https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/local-rules. Additionally, the undersigned has issued Standing Orders, available at https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/judges/wendy-berger, that apply to all proceedings before the undersigned. For a just and efficient resolution of this case, the parties are DIRECTED to read and comply with the Middle District of Florida's Local Rules and this Court's Standing Orders. See Local Rule 1.01(a). Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 7/26/2023. (RMF)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 24, 2023
3 3 service Summons issued Mon 07/24 11:55 AM
SUMMONS issued as to Chad Johnson, Lady Jane's Altamonte Springs, FL LLC., Lady Jane's Haircuts For Men Holding Company, LLC., Lady Jane's Orlando-UCF FL, LLC., Lady Jane's Winter Park FL, LLC. (BCB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 20, 2023
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 07/20 4:46 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Wendy W. Berger and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway. New case number: 6:23-cv-1367-WWB-RMN. (AM)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 07/20 3:16 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-21062555) filed by Stephanie Rybarczyk.(Storch, Noah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Consent to Become Party Plaintiff Form,
Att: 2 Exhibit B-Scheduling,
Att: 3 Exhibit C-Website excerpts,
Att: 4 Exhibit D-Dresscode,
Att: 5 Exhibit E-MW Notification Letter,
Att: 6 Proposed Summons Lady Jane's Winter Park,
Att: 7 Proposed Summons Lady Jane's Orlando,
Att: 8 Proposed Summons Lady Jane's Altamonte Springs,
Att: 9 Proposed Summons Lady Jane's Haircuts for Men Holding Company, LLC,
Att: 10 Proposed Summons Chad Johnson,
Att: 11 Civil Cover Sheet