California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:23-cr-01470
Case Filed:Jul 19, 2023
Last checked: Friday Jul 21, 2023 12:45 AM PDT
Defendant
Manuel Joseph Mariscal (1)
Represented By
Roxana Sandoval
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Federal Defenders
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info
Lyndzie Marie Carter
U.S. Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/26/2025 9:19 PM PDT
Thursday, June 08, 2023
ORDER granting2 Motion for Order as to Manuel Joseph Mariscal (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 6/8/23.(no document attached) (fjp) [3:23-mj-02055-DEB]
Related: [-]
1 1 4 pgs COMPLAINT as to Manuel Joseph Mariscal (1). (fjp) (Main Document 1 replaced on 6/26/2023 to unseal) (jpp). [3:23-mj-02055-DEB]
Related: [-]
2 2 2 pgs MOTION for Order by USA as to Manuel Joseph Mariscal. (fjp) [3:23-mj-02055-DEB]
Related: [-]
Friday, June 09, 2023
4 4 2 pgs NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Lyndzie Marie Carter appearing for USA. (cc: AUSA Lyndzie M. Carter) (jpp)Attorney Lyndzie Marie Carter added to party USA(pty:pla) [3:23-mj-02055-DEB]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 21, 2023
Arrest of Manuel Joseph Mariscal. (no document attached) (mef) [3:23-mj-02055-DEB]
Related: [-]
Friday, June 23, 2023
5 5 Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Manuel Joseph Mariscal: Initial Appearance set for 6/23/2023 before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher. (no document attached) (mef) [3:23-mj-02055-DEB]
Related: [-]
6 6 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher: Government oral motion to unseal the case is granted. Initial Appearance as to Manuel Joseph Mariscal held on 6/23/2023. Appointed Attorney Federal Defenders for Manuel Joseph Mariscal. Detention Hearing as to Manuel Joseph Mariscal held on 6/23/2023. USA oral motion for detention(Flight and Danger); motion granted as to danger and denied as to flight. Defendant ordered detained without prejudice. Order of detention to be filed by Court. Bond set as to Manuel Joseph Mariscal (1) No Bail. Rule 5 advisement provided. ( Preliminary Hearing set for 7/6/23 at 2:00pm before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher. Arraignment set for 7/20/23 at 2:00pm before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher.) Judge update in case as to Manuel Joseph Mariscal. Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher added to the case. Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo is no longer assigned to case and Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher is now assigned to the case. The new case number is 23MJ2055-DEB. (Sealed Clerk Notified) (CD# 6/23/2023 DEB 23-1:2:00-2:24). (Plaintiff Attorney Aaron McElhose AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Carson Baucher, Carmel Abuzaid FD-S/A). (aje) [3:23-mj-02055-DEB]
Related: [-]
7 7 ***English. No Interpreter needed as to Manuel Joseph Mariscal (no document attached) (aje) [3:23-mj-02055-DEB]
Related: [-]
8 8 3 pgs ORDER OF DETENTION as to Manuel Joseph Mariscal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 6/23/2023. (cxl) [3:23-mj-02055-DEB]
Related: [-]
9 9 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Manuel Joseph Mariscal (cxl) [3:23-mj-02055-DEB]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 27, 2023
10 10 1 pgs Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 6/21/2023, in case as to Manuel Joseph Mariscal, re 3 Warrant Issued. (jpp) [3:23-mj-02055-DEB]
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 29, 2023
11 11 1 pgs NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Roxana Sandoval appearing for Manuel Joseph Mariscal (Sandoval, Roxana)Attorney Roxana Sandoval added to party Manuel Joseph Mariscal(pty:dft) (sjt) [3:23-mj-02055-DEB]
Related: [-]
12 12 1 pgs Notice of Assertion of Rights by Manuel Joseph Mariscal (Sandoval, Roxana) (sjt). [3:23-mj-02055-DEB]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 05, 2023
13 13 1 pgs Order on Stipulated Continuance of a Preliminary Hearing as to Manuel Joseph Mariscal. Preliminary Hearing set for 7/20/2023 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 07/05/23. (rxc) [3:23-mj-02055-DEB]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 12, 2023
14 14 3 pgs Joint MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Discovery by USA as to Manuel Joseph Mariscal. (Carter, Lyndzie) (rxc). [3:23-mj-02055-DEB]
Related: [-]
Monday, July 17, 2023
15 15 3 pgs ORDER granting14 Motion for Protective Order as to Manuel Joseph Mariscal (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 07/17/23.(rxc) [3:23-mj-02055-DEB]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 19, 2023
16 16 4 pgs INDICTMENT as to Manuel Joseph Mariscal (1) count(s) 1, 2-3.(rxc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted