Michigan Eastern District Court
Case #: 2:23-cr-20407
Case Filed:Jul 19, 2023
Last checked: Friday Jul 21, 2023 3:25 AM EDT
Defendant
Jeffrey Robert Neal (1)
Represented By
Federal Community Defender
contact info
James R. Gerometta
Federal Defender Office
contact info
Vincent J. Toussaint
Toussaint Law
contact info
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Louis F. Meizlish
Doj-Edmi-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/21/2023 4:05 AM EDT
Wednesday, July 12, 2023
1 1 COMPLAINT sworn before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford as to Jeffrey Robert Neal (1). (MarW) [2:23-mj-30286-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 13, 2023
Minute Entry for in-person proceedings before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford: Initial Appearance as to Jeffrey Robert Neal held on 7/13/2023. Detention Hearing set for 7/14/2023 at 01:00 PM . Disposition: Defendant temporarily detained. (Court Reporter: Digitally Recorded) (Defendant Attorney: Rhonda Brazile) (AUSA: Louis Meizlish) (MarW) [2:23-mj-30286-DUTY]
Related: [-]
3 3 Public Audio File of Initial Appearance as to Jeffrey Robert Neal held on 07/13/23 before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. AUDIO FILE SIZE (1.3 MB) (DPer) [2:23-mj-30286-DUTY]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL COMMUNITY DEFENDER as to Jeffrey Robert Neal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. (DPer) [2:23-mj-30286-DUTY]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER Regarding Brady Materials as to Jeffrey Robert Neal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. (DPer) [2:23-mj-30286-DUTY]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER SCHEDULING A DETENTION HEARING AND FOR TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Jeffrey Robert Neal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. (DPer) [2:23-mj-30286-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Friday, July 14, 2023
Minute Entry for in-person proceedings before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford: Detention Hearing Not Held as to Jeffrey Robert Neal. Detention Hearing reset for 7/17/2023 01:00 PM .(Court Reporter: Digitally Recorded) (Defendant Attorney: Vincent Toussaint) (AUSA: Louis Meizlish) (MarW) [2:23-mj-30286-DUTY]
Related: [-]
7 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: James R. Gerometta appearing for Jeffrey Robert Neal . (Gerometta, James) [2:23-mj-30286-DUTY]
Related: [-]
8 8 Public Audio File of Proceeding as to Jeffrey Robert Neal held on 07/14/23 before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. AUDIO FILE SIZE (0.8 MB) (DPer) [2:23-mj-30286-DUTY]
Related: [-]
9 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Vincent J. Toussaint appearing for Jeffrey Robert Neal. (DPer) [2:23-mj-30286-DUTY]
Related: [-]
10 10 NOTICE of Change of Assistant U.S. Attorney: Louis F. Meizlish added. Attorney Barbara Lanning terminated. (Meizlish, Louis) [2:23-mj-30286-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Monday, July 17, 2023
Minute Entry for in-person proceedings before Magistrate Judge David R. Grand: Detention Hearing as to Jeffrey Robert Neal held on 7/17/2023, ( Preliminary Examination set for 7/26/2023 01:00 PM ) Disposition: Defendant ordered detained. (Court Reporter: Digitally Recorded) (Defendant Attorney: Vincent Touissant) (AUSA: Louis Meizlish) (EBut) [2:23-mj-30286-DUTY]
Related: [-]
11 11 Public Audio File of Detention Hearing as to Jeffrey Robert Neal held on 07/17/2023 before Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. AUDIO FILE SIZE (16.0 MB) (DAll) [2:23-mj-30286-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 18, 2023
12 12 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Jeffrey Robert Neal Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (EBut) [2:23-mj-30286-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 19, 2023
13 13 4 pgs INDICTMENT as to Jeffrey Robert Neal (1) count(s) 1. (DPer)
Related: [-]