Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 7:23-mj-01274
Case Filed:Jul 19, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Jul 22, 2023 2:32 AM CDT
Defendant
Rafael Becerra-Palmillas (2)
Represented By
Richard (MR) Garza
Attorney At Law
contact info
Defendant
Yurith Yaneth Gonzalez-Ibarra (1)
Represented By
Federal Public Defender - McAllen
contact info
Yvonne Marie Gomez
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Jongwoo Chung
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/22/2023 3:14 AM CDT
Wednesday, July 19, 2023
Arrest of Yurith Yaneth Gonzalez-Ibarra, filed. (SandraSilva, 7)
Related: [-]
Arrest of Rafael Becerra-Palmillas, filed. (SandraSilva, 7)
Related: [-]
1 1 CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Yurith Yaneth Gonzalez-Ibarra (1), Rafael Becerra-Palmillas (2), filed. Initial Appearance set for 7/20/2023 at 09:01 AM before Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker (SandraSilva, 7)
Related: [-]
2 2 AO 257 Information Sheet as to Yurith Yaneth Gonzalez-Ibarra, filed.(SandraSilva, 7)
Related: [-]
3 3 AO 257 Information Sheet as to Rafael Becerra-Palmillas, filed.(SandraSilva, 7)
Related: [-]