Washington Eastern District Court
Case #: 2:23-cr-00085
Case Filed:Jul 19, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Jul 22, 2023 12:41 AM PDT
Defendant
Carol Dacaymat Casilla (1)
Represented By
Federal Public Defender - SPO
Spokane Office
contact info
John Barto McEntire, IV
Federal Defenders - Spo
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Daniel Hugo Fruchter
U S Attorney'S Office - Spo
contact info
Tyler Howard Louis Tornabene
U S Attorney'S Office - Spo
contact info

GPO Jul 24 2023
ORDER granting 17 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice.

Docket last updated: 07/22/2023 1:30 AM PDT
Wednesday, July 19, 2023
1 1 INDICTMENT as to Carol Dacaymat Casilla (1) - Counts 1-23, 24-46. (REM, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
3 3 Charges and Penalties - FORFEITURE NOTICE - as to Carol Dacaymat Casilla (1). (REM, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
5 5 MOTION TO SEAL INDICTMENT by USA as to Carol Dacaymat Casilla (1). (REM, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER TO SEAL INDICTMENT; granting5 MOTION TO SEAL INDICTMENT as to Carol Dacaymat Casilla (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge James A. Goeke. (REM, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]