Case Filed:Jun 22, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Jul 22, 2023 3:48 AM EDT
Defendant
Cheri Boyette (3)
Represented By
Brett T. Wentz
Wentz Law, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Rashawn Ray McDuffie (1)
Represented By
Ania Gabriella DeJoy
Polk Law PLLC
contact info
John H. Bennett
Law Offices Of John H. Bennett
contact info
Defendant
Dennis Ray Taylor (2)
Represented By
Joshua Brian Howard
Gammon, Howard & Zeszotarski, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Bradford Knott
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/20/2024 5:33 AM EDT
Monday, May 15, 2023
1 1 UNSEALED CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Cheri Boyette (1). (Grady, B.) Modified on 5/25/2023 to show as unsealed (Grady, B.) [7:23-mj-01130-RJ]
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs UNSEALED CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Dennis Ray Taylor (1). (Grady, B.) Modified on 5/25/2023 to show as unsealed. (Grady, B.) [7:23-mj-01128-RJ]
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION to Seal1 Criminal Complaint filed by USA as to Cheri Boyette. (Grady, B.) [7:23-mj-01130-RJ]
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION to Seal1 Criminal Complaint filed by USA as to Dennis Ray Taylor. (Grady, B.) [7:23-mj-01128-RJ]
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER granting2 Motion to Seal1 Criminal Complaint as to Cheri Boyette (1). Signed by US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 5/15/2023. (Grady, B.) [7:23-mj-01130-RJ]
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER granting2 Motion to Seal1 Criminal Complaint as to Dennis Ray Taylor (1). Signed by US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 5/15/2023. (Grady, B.) [7:23-mj-01128-RJ]
Related: [-]
4 4 Arrest Warrant issued by US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. in case as to Cheri Boyette. Copy emailed to US Marshal's Office for service. (Grady, B.) [7:23-mj-01130-RJ]
Related: [-]
4 4 Arrest Warrant issued by US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. in case as to Dennis Ray Taylor. Copy emailed to US Marshal's Office for service. (Grady, B.) [7:23-mj-01128-RJ]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 17, 2023
1 1 UNSEALED CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Rashawn Ray McDuffie (1). (Grady, B.) Modified on 5/25/2023 to show as unsealed. (Grady, B.) [7:23-mj-01135-RJ]
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION to Seal1 Criminal Complaint filed by USA as to Rashawn Ray McDuffie. (Grady, B.) [7:23-mj-01135-RJ]
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER granting2 Motion to Seal1 Criminal Complaint as to Rashawn Ray McDuffie (1). Signed by US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 5/17/2023. (Grady, B.) [7:23-mj-01135-RJ]
Related: [-]
4 4 Arrest Warrant issued by US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. in case as to Rashawn Ray McDuffie. Copy emailed to US Marshal's Office for service. (Grady, B.) [7:23-mj-01135-RJ]
Related: [-]
5 5 AMENDED UNSEALED CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Rashawn Ray McDuffie (1). (Grady, B.)[7:23-mj-01135-RJ]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 18, 2023
Arrest of Rashawn Ray McDuffie. (Grady, B.) [7:23-mj-01135-RJ]
Related: [-]
Arrest of Cheri Boyette. (Grady, B.) [7:23-mj-01130-RJ]
Related: [-]
Arrest of Dennis Ray Taylor. (Grady, B.) [7:23-mj-01128-RJ]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 19, 2023
Set Hearing as to Rashawn Ray McDuffie: Initial Appearance set for 5/22/2023 at 10:30 AM in Wilmington Courtroom 100 before US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. (Grady, B.) [7:23-mj-01135-RJ]
Related: [-]
Set Hearing as to Cheri Boyette: Initial Appearance set for 5/22/2023 at 10:30 AM in Wilmington Courtroom 100 before US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. (Grady, B.) [7:23-mj-01130-RJ]
Related: [-]
Set Hearing as to Dennis Ray Taylor: Initial Appearance set for 5/22/2023 at 10:30 AM in Wilmington Courtroom 100 before US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. (Grady, B.) [7:23-mj-01128-RJ]
Related: [-]
Monday, May 22, 2023
ORAL MOTION to Unseal Case filed by USA as to Rashawn Ray McDuffie. (Grady, B.) [7:23-mj-01135-RJ]
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER granting Oral Motion to Unseal Case as to Rashawn Ray McDuffie (1). Entered by US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 5/22/2023. (Grady, B.) [7:23-mj-01135-RJ]
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION for Detention Pending Trial filed by USA as to Rashawn Ray McDuffie. (Grady, B.) [7:23-mj-01135-RJ]
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION to Unseal Case filed by USA as to Cheri Boyette. (Grady, B.) [7:23-mj-01130-RJ]
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER granting Oral Motion to Unseal Case as to Cheri Boyette (1). Entered by US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 5/22/2023. (Grady, B.) [7:23-mj-01130-RJ]
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION for Detention Pending Trial filed by USA as to Cheri Boyette. (Grady, B.) [7:23-mj-01130-RJ]
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION to Unseal Case filed by USA as to Dennis Ray Taylor. (Grady, B.) [7:23-mj-01128-RJ]
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER granting Oral Motion to Unseal Case as to Dennis Ray Taylor (1). Entered by US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 5/22/2023. (Grady, B.) [7:23-mj-01128-RJ]
Related: [-]
MOTION for Detention Pending Trial filed by USA as to Dennis Ray Taylor. (Grady, B.) [7:23-mj-01128-RJ]
Related: [-]
Set Hearings as to Dennis Ray Taylor: Preliminary Examination and Detention Hearings set for 5/26/2023 at 9:30 AM in Wilmington Courtroom 100 before US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. (Grady, B.) [7:23-mj-01128-RJ]
Related: [-]
5 5 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Cheri Boyette. (Grady, B.) [7:23-mj-01130-RJ]
Related: [-]
5 5 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Dennis Ray Taylor. (Grady, B.) [7:23-mj-01128-RJ]
Related: [-]
6 6 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Rashawn Ray McDuffie. (Grady, B.) [7:23-mj-01135-RJ]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Cheri Boyette. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 5/22/2023. (Grady, B.) [7:23-mj-01130-RJ]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Dennis Ray Taylor. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 5/22/2023. (Grady, B.) [7:23-mj-01128-RJ]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Rashawn Ray McDuffie. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 5/22/2023. (Grady, B.) [7:23-mj-01135-RJ]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER regarding Due Process Protections Act as to Cheri Boyette. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 5/22/2023. (Grady, B.) [7:23-mj-01130-RJ]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER regarding Due Process Protections Act as to Dennis Ray Taylor. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 5/22/2023. (Grady, B.) [7:23-mj-01128-RJ]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER regarding Due Process Protections Act as to Rashawn Ray McDuffie. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 5/22/2023. (Grady, B.) [7:23-mj-01135-RJ]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Cheri Boyette - Detention Hearing set for 5/26/2023 at 9:30 AM in Wilmington Courtroom 100 before US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 5/26/2023. (Grady, B.) [7:23-mj-01130-RJ]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Dennis Ray Taylor - Detention Hearing set for 5/26/2023 at 9:30 AM in Wilmington Courtroom 100 before US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 5/22/2023. (Grady, B.) [7:23-mj-01128-RJ]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Rashawn Ray McDuffie - Preliminary Examination and Detention Hearing set for 5/26/2023 at 9:30 AM in Wilmington Courtroom 100 before Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones Jr. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 5/22/2023. (Grady, B.) [7:23-mj-01135-RJ]
Related: [-]
9 9 Minute Entry for proceeding held before US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr.: Initial Appearance as to Cheri Boyette held on 5/22/2023 in Wilmington Courtroom 100. Assistant US Attorney, present for Government, moves to unseal case; so ordered. Assistant Federal Public Defender present. Defendant requests court-appointed counsel. Court appoints Federal Public Defender. Defendant advised of rights, charges and maximum penalties. Government moves for pretrial detention. Probable Cause and Detention Hearings set for 5/26/2023 at 9:30am in Wilmington Courtroom 100 before US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. Defendant remanded temporarily to US Marshal custody. (Court Reporter FTR Gold) (Grady, B.) [7:23-mj-01130-RJ]
Related: [-]
9 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr.: Initial Appearance as to Dennis Ray Taylor held on 5/22/2023 in Wilmington Courtroom 100. Assistant US Attorney, present for Government, moves to unseal case; so ordered. Assistant Federal Public Defender present. Defendant requests court-appointed counsel. Court appoints Federal Public Defender. Defendant advised of rights, charges and maximum penalties. Government moves for pretrial detention. Probable Cause and Detention Hearings set for 5/26/2023 at 9:30am in Wilmington Courtroom 100 before US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. Defendant remanded temporarily to US Marshal custody. (Court Reporter FTR Gold) (Grady, B.) [7:23-mj-01128-RJ]
Related: [-]
10 10 Minute Entry for proceeding held before US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr.: Initial Appearance as to Rashawn Ray McDuffie held on 5/22/2023 in Wilmington Courtroom 100. Assistant US Attorney, present for Government, moves to unseal case; so ordered. Assistant Federal Public Defender present. Defendant requests court-appointed counsel. Court appoints Federal Public Defender. Defendant advised of rights, charges and maximum penalties. Government moves for pretrial detention. Probable Cause and Detention Hearings set for 5/26/2023 at 9:30am in Wilmington Courtroom 100 before US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. Defendant remanded temporarily to US Marshal custody. (Court Reporter FTR Gold) (Grady, B.) [7:23-mj-01135-RJ]
Related: [-]
10 10 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 5/18/2023 as to Dennis Ray Taylor. (Grady, B.) [7:23-mj-01128-RJ]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 24, 2023
10 10 Notice of Attorney Appearance: Brett T. Wentz appearing for Cheri Boyette . (Wentz, Brett) [7:23-mj-01130-RJ]
Related: [-]
11 11 Pretrial Services Report filed by Ivonne Mendoza as to Rashawn Ray McDuffie. (Edwards, Quameika) [7:23-mj-01135-RJ]
Related: [-]
11 11 First MOTION to Continue Detention Hearing filed by Cheri Boyette. (Wentz, Brett) [7:23-mj-01130-RJ]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
11 11 Notice of Attorney Appearance: Joshua Brian Howard appearing for Dennis Ray Taylor . (Howard, Joshua) [7:23-mj-01128-RJ]
Related: [-]
12 12 Notice of Attorney Appearance: John H. Bennett appearing for Rashawn Ray McDuffie . (Bennett, John) [7:23-mj-01135-RJ]
Related: [-]
13 13 Request for discovery filed by Rashawn Ray McDuffie . (Bennett, John) [7:23-mj-01135-RJ]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 25, 2023
Reset Hearings as to Cheri Boyette: Preliminary Examination and Detention Hearing reset for 6/6/2023 at 9:00 AM in Wilmington Courtroom 100 before US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. (Grady, B.) [7:23-mj-01130-RJ]
Related: [-]
Motion referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr.:12 MOTION to Continue Preliminary Examination and Detention Hearing as to Dennis Ray Taylor. (Grady, B.) [7:23-mj-01128-RJ]
Related: [-]
Reset Hearings as to Dennis Ray Taylor: Preliminary Examination and Detention Hearing reset for 6/6/2023 at 9:00 AM in Wilmington Courtroom 100 before US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. (Grady, B.) [7:23-mj-01128-RJ]
Related: [-]
12 12 ORDER granting11 Motion to Continue as to Cheri Boyette (1). The probable cause and detention hearings are continued to Tuesday, June 6, 2023 at 9:00 a.m., Courtroom 100, Wilmington, North Carolina. The court finds that the ends of justice served by this continuance outweigh the best interests of the public and defendant in a speedy trial. It is therefore ordered further that the periodof delay necessitated by this continuance is excluded from the speedy trial computation pursuant to 18 U.S.C. § 3161(h)(7)(A). Signed by US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 5/25/2023. (Grady, B.) [7:23-mj-01130-RJ]
Related: [-]
12 12 MOTION to Continue Preliminary Examination and Detention Hearing filed by Dennis Ray Taylor. (Howard, Joshua) [7:23-mj-01128-RJ]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
13 13 Pretrial Services Report filed by Toni A. White as to Cheri Boyette. (Assenat, C.) [7:23-mj-01130-RJ]
Related: [-]
13 13 ORDER granting12 Motion to Continue as to Dennis Ray Taylor (1). The probable cause and detention hearing is continued to Tuesday, June 6, 2023 at 9:00 a.m., Courtroom 100, Wilmington, North Carolina. The court finds that the ends of justice served by this continuance outweigh the best interests of the public and defendant in a speedy trial. It is therefore ordered further that the period of delay necessitated by this continuance is excluded from the speedy trial computation pursuant to 18 U.S.C. § 3161(h)(7)(A). Signed by US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr on 5/25/2023. (Grady, B.) [7:23-mj-01128-RJ]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 26, 2023
ORAL MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by John Bennett as to Rashawn Ray McDuffie. (Grady, B.) [7:23-mj-01135-RJ]
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER granting Oral Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. John H. Bennett withdrawn from case as to Rashawn Ray McDuffie (1). The Office of the Federal Public Defender is directed to assign new counsel. Entered by US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 5/26/2023. (Grady, B.) [7:23-mj-01135-RJ]
Related: [-]
14 14 Minute Entry for proceeding held before US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr.: Docket Call as to Rashawn Ray McDuffie held on 5/26/2023 in Wilmington Courtroom 100. Assistant US Attorney present for Government. Counsel, present with Defendant, moves to be withdrawn from case; Court allows withdrawal, directing the Office of Federal Public Defender to assign new counsel. Court continues the probable cause and detention hearings to 6/1/2023 at 10:00 AM in Raleigh - 6th Floor Courtroom before US Magistrate Judge James E. Gates. Court excludes the intervening time for purposes of speedy trial computation and remands Defendant temporarily to US Marshal custody. (Court Reporter FTR Gold) (Grady, B.) [7:23-mj-01135-RJ]
Related: [-]
15 15 ORAL ORDER TO CONTINUE as to Rashawn Ray McDuffie. Defendant's probable cause and detention hearings are continued to 6/1/2023 at 10AM in Raleigh before US Magistrate Judge James E. Gates. It is further ordered that any delay that results from this continuance is excluded from the Speedy Trial Act computation pursuant to 18 U.S.C. § 3161(h)(7)(a) for the reason that the ends of justice served by granting this continuance outweigh the best interest of the public and defendant in a speedy trial. Entered by US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 5/26/2023. (Grady, B.) [7:23-mj-01135-RJ]
Related: [-]
16 16 Notice of Attorney Appearance: Ania Gabriella DeJoy appearing for Rashawn Ray McDuffie . (DeJoy, Ania) [7:23-mj-01135-RJ]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 31, 2023
TEXT ORDER granting17 Motion to Continue as to Rashawn Ray McDuffie (1): For the reasons stated by defendant in his uncontested motion to continue (DE 17) (i.e., the need for defense counsel to confer with defendant and otherwise prepare for the preliminary and detention hearings), the preliminary and detention hearings scheduled for Thursday, 1 June 2023, are hereby continued to Wednesday, 7 June 2023, at 10:00 a.m. in the 6th Floor Courtroom at the Terry Sanford Federal Building and Courthouse in Raleigh, North Carolina. Any delay that results from this continuance shall be excluded from the Speedy Trial Act computation pursuant to 18 U.S.C. § 3161(h)(7)(A) on the grounds that the ends of justice served by granting this continuance (i.e., enabling defendant and his counsel to prepare adequately for the preliminary and detention hearings) outweigh the best interests of the public and the defendant in a speedy trial. Defendant shall remain in custody pending the re-scheduled hearings.Entered by Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 5/31/2023. (Horton, B.) [7:23-mj-01135-RJ]
Related: [-]
Reset Hearings as to Rashawn Ray McDuffie: Preliminary and Detention Hearings continued to 6/7/2023 at 10:00 AM in Raleigh - 6th Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Brian S. Meyers. (Horton, B.) [7:23-mj-01135-RJ]
Related: [-]
14 14 Pretrial Services Report filed by Allison Carlino as to Dennis Ray Taylor. (Durr, Alexandra) [7:23-mj-01128-RJ]
Related: [-]
17 17 MOTION to Continue Detention Hearing and Probable Cause Hearing filed by Rashawn Ray McDuffie. (DeJoy, Ania) [7:23-mj-01135-RJ]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, June 02, 2023
15 15 MOTION to Continue Pending Waiver of Hearings filed by Dennis Ray Taylor. (Howard, Joshua) [7:23-mj-01128-RJ]
Related: [-]
Monday, June 05, 2023
***CHANGE IN HEARING TIME***Reset Hearings as to Rashawn Ray McDuffie: Preliminary and Detention Hearings reset for 6/7/2023 at 09:00 AM in Raleigh - 6th Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Brian S. Meyers. (Horton, B.) [7:23-mj-01135-RJ]
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY- Failure to File Proposed Order regarding:15 Motion to Continue. At the direction of the court, counsel shall file a proposed order. The order must be filed electronically using the event PROPOSED ORDER located in the RESPONSES AND REPLIES category. (Grady, B.) [7:23-mj-01128-RJ]
Related: [-]
Motion referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr.:15 MOTION to Continue Pending Waiver of Hearings as to Dennis Ray Taylor. (Grady, B.) [7:23-mj-01128-RJ]
Related: [-]
Reset Hearings as to Dennis Ray Taylor: Preliminary Examination and Detention Hearing reset for 6/13/2023 at 9:00 AM in Wilmington Courtroom 100 before US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. (Grady, B.) [7:23-mj-01128-RJ]
Related: [-]
16 16 Proposed Order by Dennis Ray Taylor regarding15 MOTION to Continue Pending Waiver of Hearings filed by Dennis Ray Taylor. (Howard, Joshua) [7:23-mj-01128-RJ]
Related: [-]
17 17 ORDER granting15 Motion to Continue Probable Cause and Detention Hearing as to Dennis Ray Taylor (1). The probable cause and detention hearing is continued to Tuesday, June 13, 2023 at 9:00 a.m., Courtroom 100, Wilmington, North Carolina. The court finds that the ends of justice served by this continuance outweigh the best interests of the public and defendant in a speedy trial. It is therefore ordered further that the period of delay necessitated by this continuance is excluded from the speedy trial computation pursuant to 18 U.S.C. § 3161(h)(7)(A). Signed by US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 6/5/2023. (Grady, B.) [7:23-mj-01128-RJ]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 06, 2023
ORAL ORDER finding probable cause and granting Oral Motion for Detention Pending Trial as to Cheri Boyette (1). Entered by US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 6/6/2023. (Grady, B.) [7:23-mj-01130-RJ]
Related: [-]
14 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr.: Preliminary and Detention Hearings as to Cheri Boyette held on 6/6/2023 in Wilmington Courtroom 100. Assistant US Attorney present for Government. Defendant, present with counsel, waives her right to probable cause and detention hearings. Court finds probable cause, grants Government's motion for detention and remands Defendant to US Marshal custody pending trial.(Court Reporter FTR Gold) (Grady, B.) [7:23-mj-01130-RJ]
Related: [-]
15 15 Waiver of Preliminary Hearing by Cheri Boyette. (Grady, B.) [7:23-mj-01130-RJ]
Related: [-]
16 16 Waiver of Detention Hearing by Cheri Boyette. (Grady, B.) [7:23-mj-01130-RJ]
Related: [-]
17 17 ORDER on Probable Cause and Detention as to Cheri Boyette. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 6/6/2023. (Grady, B.) [7:23-mj-01130-RJ]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 07, 2023
ORAL ORDER granting Oral Motion for Detention Pending Trial as to Rashawn Ray McDuffie (1). Entered by Magistrate Judge Brian S. Meyers on 6/7/2023. (Horton, B.) [7:23-mj-01135-RJ]
Related: [-]
18 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Brian S. Meyers in Raleigh. Preliminary and Detention Hearings as to Rashawn Ray McDuffie held on 6/7/2023. Assistant U.S. Attorney present for government. Defendant present with counsel. Evidence presented by oral testimony. The governments motion for detention is allowed. The court finds that the government has shown by clear and convincing evidence that there is no condition or set of conditions to reasonably assure the safety of the community and by a preponderance of the evidence that there is no condition or set of conditions to reasonably assure the defendants appearance as required if the defendant were to be released before trial. Defendant ordered detained and remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal. (Court Reporter - FTR) (Horton, B.) [7:23-mj-01135-RJ]
Related: [-]
Monday, June 12, 2023
19 19 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Rashawn Ray McDuffie. Follows oral order of 6/7/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian S. Meyers on 6/12/2023. (Pendergrass, Carson) [7:23-mj-01135-RJ]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 13, 2023
ORAL ORDER finding probable cause and granting Oral Motion for Detention Pending Trial as to Dennis Ray Taylor (1). Entered by US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 6/13/2023. (Grady, B.) [7:23-mj-01128-RJ]
Related: [-]
18 18 Minute Entry for proceeding held before US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr.: Preliminary and Detention Hearings as to Dennis Ray Taylor held on 6/13/2023 in Wilmington Courtroom 100. Assistant US Attorney present for Government. Defendant, present with counsel, waives his right to probable cause and detention hearings. Court finds probable cause, grants Government's motion for detention and remands Defendant to US Marshal custody pending trial. (Court Reporter FTR Gold) (Grady, B.) [7:23-mj-01128-RJ]
Related: [-]
19 19 Waiver of Preliminary Hearing by Dennis Ray Taylor. (Grady, B.) [7:23-mj-01128-RJ]
Related: [-]
20 20 Waiver of Detention Hearing by Dennis Ray Taylor. (Grady, B.) [7:23-mj-01128-RJ]
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 22, 2023
21 21 5 pgs INDICTMENT as to Rashawn Ray McDuffie (1) counts 1, 3, Dennis Ray Taylor (2) counts 1, 3, 4, Cheri Boyette (3) counts 1, 2. The foreperson's signature has been redacted pursuant to the E-Government Act. The unredacted version of this document has been filed under seal. (Pendergrass, Carson)
Related: [-]
22 22 Unredacted Document21 Indictment (Pendergrass, Carson)
Related: [-]
23 23 1 pgs Notice of Related Case filed by USA. (Pendergrass, Carson)
Related: [-]
24 24 Penalty Sheet (Selected Participants Only) as to Rashawn Ray McDuffie (Pendergrass, Carson)
Related: [-]
25 25 Penalty Sheet (Selected Participants Only) as to Dennis Ray Taylor (Pendergrass, Carson)
Related: [-]
26 26 Penalty Sheet (Selected Participants Only) as to Cheri Boyette (Pendergrass, Carson)
Related: [-]