California Southern District Court
Judge:James E Simmons, Jr
Referred: Michelle M Pettit
Case #: 3:23-cv-01342
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1964 Civil Remedies: Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Jul 21, 2023
Terminated:Nov 27, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Jan 18, 2024 12:50 AM PST
Defendant
Ally Financial, Inc.
Defendant
Arlene Marie Arias
Defendant
BCAP LLC
Defendant
BOAC Secured Assets Corp.
Defendant
Banc of America Funding Corporation
Defendant
Bank of America Corporation
Defendant
Bank of America National Association
Defendant
Barclays Capital Inc.
Defendant
Bear Stearns Asset Backed Securities I LLC
Defendant
Birdrock Home Mortgage, LLC
Defendant
CI-MVY Chase Funding LLC
Defendant
CW/VIBS, Inc.
Defendant
CWALT, Inc.
Defendant
Harold G. Campbell
Defendant
Capital One Financial Corporation
Defendant
Capital One, National Association
Defendant
CitiCorp Mortgage Securities, Inc.
Defendant
CitiGroup Financial Products, Inc.
Defendant
CitiMortgage, Inc.
Defendant
Citigroup Global Markets Inc.
Defendant
Citigroup Global Markets Realty Corp.
Defendant
Citigroup Inc.
Defendant
Citigroup Mortgage Loan Trust Inc.
Defendant
Countrywide Financial Corporation
Defendant
Countrywide Home Loans, Inc.
Defendant
Countrywide Securities Corp.
Defendant
Tyler W. Cramer
Defendant
Credit Suisse (USA), Inc.
Defendant
Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Securities Corp.
Defendant
Credit Suisse Holdings (USA), Inc.
Defendant
Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC
Defendant
DB Structured Products, Inc.
Defendant
DB U.S. Financial Market Holding Corporation
Defendant
DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc.
Defendant
Deutsche Alt-A Securities, Inc.
Defendant
Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.
Defendant
John Doe
Defendant
EMC Mortgage Corporation
Defendant
F/ICJA GMAC LLC
Defendant
Fitch, Inc.
Defendant
Lana Franks
Defendant
Richard S. Fuld, JR.
Defendant
GMAC Mortgage Group, LLC
Defendant
Steve Bruce Gold
Defendant
Goldman Sachs & Co.
Defendant
Edward Grieb
Defendant
Ralph Hughes
Defendant
Hughes & Pizzuto, A.P.C
Defendant
IMEI Assets Corp.
Defendant
IMPAC Mortgage Holdings, Inc
Defendant
J.P. Morgan Acceptance Corporation I
Defendant
J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Corp.
Defendant
J.P. Morgan Securities LLC
Defendant
JPMorgan Chase & Co.
Defendant
JPMorgan Sec-uri-t Les Holding, LLC
Defendant
L.P.
Defendant
Jeanne Max
Defendant
Richard Mcicinney
Defendant
Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc.
Defendant
Merrill Lynch Mortgage Investors, Inc.
Defendant
Merrill Lynch Mortgage Lending, Inc.
Defendant
Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated
Defendant
Moody's Corporation
Defendant
Moody's Investors Service, Inc.
Defendant
Morgan Stanley
Defendant
Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc.
Defendant
Morgan Stanley Capital I Inc.
Defendant
Morgan Stanley Mort Gage Capital Holdings LLC
Defendant
Mortgage Asset Securitization Transcations, Inc.
Defendant
Mortgage IT Securities Corp.
Defendant
Mortgage IT. Inc.
Defendant
Matthew D. Murphey
Defendant
Daniel Niednagel
Defendant
Stephen Niednagel
Defendant
Nomura Credit & Capital, Inc.
Defendant
Nomura Holding- America, Inc.
Defendant
Nomura Securities International, Inc.
Defendant
Normura Asset Acceptance Corporation
Defendant
Barry J. O'Brien
Defendant
Christopher M. O'Meara
Defendant
George E. Olmstead
Defendant
John Pieters
Defendant
Robert Pizzuto
Defendant
RBS Acceptance Inc.
Defendant
RBS Financial Prodcuts Inc.
Defendant
RBS Holdings USA Inc.
Defendant
RBS Securities Inc.
Defendant
Residential Accredit Loans, Inc.
Defendant
Residential Funding Company, LLC
Defendant
Susan R. Sakhai
Defendant
Sandler O'Neil + Partners
Defendant
Karl Schorr
Defendant
Kristine Smith
Defendant
Joe Soecker
Defendant
Standard & Poor's Financial Services, LLC
Defendant
Structured Asset Mortgage Investments II Inc.
Defendant
James J. Sullivan
Defendant
Samiir Tabet
Defendant
The Bear Sterns Companies LLC
Defendant
The Mcgraw-Hill Companies, UBS Americas Inc.
Defendant
Ties Securities LLC
Defendant
Troutman Sanders LLP
Defendant
UBS Real Estate Securities Inc.
Defendant
US Bancorp
Defendant
US Bank
Defendant
WAMIJ Capital Corp.
Defendant
WIPAC Funding Corporation
Defendant
Wells Fargo & Company
Defendant
Wells Fargo Asset Securities Corporation
Defendant
Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Defendant
Mark L. Zusy
Plaintiff
Does 1-5000
Plaintiff
Michelle Gold
Represented By
Michelle Gold
The Gold Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Gonzalez-Gold
Plaintiff
Star Martinez

GPO Jul 26 2023
ORDER: (1) Denying Motion for Temporary Restraining Order; and (2) Denying Plaintiffs' Ex-Part Motion (ECF Nos. 2, 5). Signed by District Judge James E. Simmons, Jr on 7/26/2023. (maq)

Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, November 27, 2023
17 17 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 11/27 2:41 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE for Failure to Comply with the Court's Order. Signed by District Judge James E. Simmons, Jr on 11/27/2023. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (maq)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 30, 2023
16 16 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Mon 10/30 4:14 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Why Case Should Not Be Dismissed for Failure to Serve Defendants. Plaintiff must file a written response to this OSC on or before 11/17/2023. Signed by District Judge James E. Simmons, Jr on 10/30/2023. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (maq)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 17, 2023
15 15 order Order of Judge Transfer Thu 08/17 3:01 PM
MINUTE ORDER OF TRANSFER. Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to District Judge James E. Simmons, Jr for all further proceedings. The new case number is 23cv1342 JES-MMP.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (sjt)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Order of Judge Transfer Thu 08/17 11:49 AM
MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo for all further proceedings. The new case number is 23-cv-01342-CAB-MMP.(no document attached) (aas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 16, 2023
13 13 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Wed 08/16 3:25 PM
ORDER (1) Recusing from Case and (2) Requesting Reassignment. Judge Todd W. Robinson is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to District Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro for all further proceedings. The new case number is 23cv1342 RBM-MMP. Signed by Judge Todd W. Robinson on 08/16/2023.(cxl1)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 15, 2023
12 12 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Tue 08/15 10:27 AM
ORDER Recusing from Case and Requesting Reassignment. District Judge Andrew G. Schopler is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Todd W. Robinson for all further proceedings. The new case number is 23cv1342 TWR-MMP. Signed by District Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 8/15/2023.(jms)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 14, 2023
11 11 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Mon 08/14 2:54 PM
ORDER Recusing from Case and Requesting Reassignment. Judge Janis L. Sammartino is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to District Judge Andrew G. Schopler for all further proceedings. The new case number is 23cv1342 AGS-MMP. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/14/23.(aas)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 11, 2023
10 10 1 pgs order Order of Transfer Pursuant to Low Number Rule Fri 08/11 2:09 PM
ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE, re8 Notice of Related Case. Case reassigned to Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit for all further proceedings. District Judge James E. Simmons, Jr, Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major no longer assigned to case. Create association to 3:22-cv-01232-JLS-MMP. The new case number is 23-cv-1342-JLS-MMP. Signed by District Judge James E. Simmons, Jr on 7/24/2023. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 7/25/2023. (maq)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 26, 2023
9 9 6 pgs order Order on Motion for TRO Order on Motion to Expedite Wed 07/26 3:27 PM
ORDER: (1) Denying Motion for Temporary Restraining Order; and (2) Denying Plaintiffs' Ex-Part Motion (ECF Nos.2 ,5 ). Signed by District Judge James E. Simmons, Jr on 7/26/2023. (maq)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 25, 2023
8 8 notice Notice of Related Case Tue 07/25 1:35 PM
NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) of case(s) 22-cv-1232-JLS-AGS. (maq)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 24, 2023
7 7 order Order of Judge Transfer Mon 07/24 2:38 PM
MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major for all further proceedings. The new case number is 23-cv-1342-JES-BLM.(no document attached) (maq)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued Mon 07/24 12:59 PM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (dim)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Expedite Mon 07/24 12:02 PM
Ex-Parte MOTION RE: Pending Injunction. Declaration in Support of Motion for Injunction Supported by attached Evidence RE: Affidavit of Star Martinez; Stephen Mares and Copy of Defendants Notice Foreclosure was Cancelled (False Doc), by Michelle Gold.(Gold, Michelle) (maq)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit EX 1 DEC OF STAR MARTINEZ,
Att: 2 Exhibit EX 2 DEC OF STEPHEN MARES,
Att: 3 Exhibit EX 3 ATTNY TIANGCO
4 4 misc Filing Fee Received Mon 07/24 11:06 AM
FILING FEE: $ 405, Receipt Number 147008, Paid on 7/24/2023. Case Number: 23-cv-1342-JES-DDL (maq)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Order of Judge Transfer Mon 07/24 10:49 AM
MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to District Judge James E. Simmons, Jr for all further proceedings. Pending hearings previously set before the original Judge have been transferred to the newly assigned Judge. The new case number is 23cv1342 JES-DDL.(no document attached) (jmo) Modified on 7/24/2023 (jmo)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 21, 2023
2 2 motion Temporary Restraining Order Fri 07/21 5:52 PM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Michelle Gold. (mjw)
Related: [-]
1 1 30+ pgs cmp Complaint Fri 07/21 5:50 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Ally Financial, Inc., Arlene Marie Arias, BCAP LLC, BOAC Secured Assets Corp., Banc of America Funding Corporation, Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America National Association, Barclays Capital Inc., Bear Stearns Asset Backed Securities I LLC, Birdrock Home Mortgage, LLC, CI-MVY Chase Funding LLC, CW/VIBS, Inc., CWALT, Inc., Harold G. Campbell, Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One, National Association, CitiCorp Mortgage Securities, Inc., CitiGroup Financial Products, Inc., CitiMortgage, Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Realty Corp., Citigroup Inc., Citigroup Mortgage Loan Trust Inc., Countrywide Financial Corporation, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Countrywide Securities Corp., Tyler W. Cramer, Credit Suisse (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Securities Corp., Credit Suisse Holdings (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, DB Structured Products, Inc., DB U.S. Financial Market Holding Corporation, DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc., Deutsche Alt-A Securities, Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., John Doe, EMC Mortgage Corporation, F/ICJA GMAC LLC, Fitch, Inc., Lana Franks, Richard S. Fuld, JR, GMAC Mortgage Group LLC F/KJA GMAC Mortgage Group, Inc., Steve Bruce Gold, Goldman Sachs & Co., Edward Grieb, Ralph Hughes, Hughes & Pizzuto, A.P.C, IMEI Assets Corp., IMPAC Mortgage Holdings, Inc, J.P. Morgan Acceptance Corporation I, J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Corp., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Sec-uri-t Les Holding, LLC, L.P., Jeanne Max, Richard Mcicinney, Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc., Merrill Lynch Mortgage Investors, Inc., Merrill Lynch Mortgage Lending, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Moody's Corporation, Moody's Investors Service, Inc., Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., Morgan Stanley Capital I Inc., Morgan Stanley Mort Gage Capital Holdings LLC, Mortgage Asset Securitization Transcations, Inc., Mortgage IT Securities Corp., Mortgage IT. Inc., Matthew D. Murphey, Daniel Niednagel, Stephen Niednagel, Nomura Credit & Capital, Inc., Nomura Holding- America, Inc., Nomura Securities International, Inc., Normura Asset Acceptance Corporation, Barry J. O'Brien, Christopher M. O'Meara, George E. Olmstead, John Pieters, Robert Pizzuto, RBS Acceptance Inc., RBS Financial Prodcuts Inc., RBS Holdings USA Inc., RBS Securities Inc., Residential Accredit Loans, Inc., Residential Funding Company, LLC, Susan R. Sakhai, Sandler O'Neil + Partners, Karl Schorr, Kristine Smith, Joe Soecker, Standard & Poor's Financial Services, LLC, Structured Asset Mortgage Investments II Inc., James J. Sullivan, Samiir Tabet, The Bear Sterns Companies LLC, The Mcgraw-Hill Companies, UBS Americas Inc., Ties Securities LLC, Troutman Sanders LLP, UBS Real Estate Securities Inc., US Bancorp, US Bank, WAMIJ Capital Corp., WIPAC Funding Corporation, Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Asset Securities Corporation, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, Mark L. Zusy (Filing fee $ 402.), filed by Michelle Gold. The new case number is 3:23-cv-1342-GPC-DDL. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner are assigned to the case. (Gold, Michelle)(mjw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet