Original Case: 6:23-cv-00048

Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-cv-35494
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jul 21, 2023
Terminated:Jun 14, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 18, 2024 2:07 AM PDT
Defendant - Appellee
AUSTIN KNUDSEN, in his official capacity, Attorney General of the State of Montana
Represented By
Terisa Marie Oomens
Montana Department of Justice
contact info
Alan Zackheim
Montana Department of Justice
contact info
Kali Dimmitt-Griffin
Montana Department of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
GRAND RIVER ENTERPRISES SIX NATIONS, LTD.
Represented By
Randolph Henry Barnhouse
Barnhouse Keegan Solimon & West LLP
contact info
Robert C. Lukes
Garlington Lohn & Robinson, PLLP
contact info
Adam G. Unikowsky
Jenner & Block, LLP
contact info
Leonard R. Powell
Jenner & Block, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/18/2024 2:05 AM PDT
Friday, July 21, 2023
1 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: to be set. Preliminary Injunction Appeal. C.R. 3-3. [12759420] (RT) [Entered: 07/21/2023 10:53 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Docketing Letter
Att: 2 2 pgs Notice to All Parties and Counsel
Att: 3 1 pgs Mediation Letter
Att: 4 2 pgs Mediation Questionnaire
Att: 5 22 pgs Case Opening Packet
2 2 2 pgs Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: MCD): Ninth Circuit Rule 3-3 will apply to this appeal. The mediation questionnaire is due three days after the date of this order. If they have not already done so, within 7 calendar days after the filing date of this order, the parties shall make arrangements to obtain from the court reporter an official transcript of proceedings in the district court that will be included in the record on appeal. The opening brief and excerpts of record are due no later than August 17, 2023. The answering brief is due September 14, 2023. The optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. See 9th Cir. R. 3-3(b). In addition to all other issues the parties wish to raise in their briefs, the parties must address the basis for this court’s jurisdiction over this appeal. See Religious Tech. Ctr., Church of Scientology Int’l, Inc. v. Scott, 869 F.2d 1306, 1308 (9th Cir. 1989) (“Ordinarily, an appeal does not lie from the denial of an application for a temporary restraining order.”); see also Bennett v. Medtronic, Inc., 285 F.3d 801, 804 (9th Cir. 2002) (“Ordinarily, temporary restraining orders, in contrast to preliminary injunctions, are not appealable.”) No streamlined extensions of time will be approved. See 9th Cir. R. 31-2.2(a)(3). Any request for an extension of time to file a brief must be made by written motion under Ninth Circuit Rule 31-2.2(b). Failure to file timely the opening brief will result in the automatic dismissal of this appeal by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. [12759681] (AF) [Entered: 07/21/2023 02:37 PM]
Related: [-]