New York Northern District Court
Judge:Gary L Sharpe
Case #: 1:23-cv-00892
Nature of Suit422 Bankruptcy - Appeal 28 USC 158
Cause28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BA
Case Filed:Jul 25, 2023
Terminated:Oct 26, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Jan 21, 2024 3:45 AM EST
Appellant
M&T Bank
Represented By
Gregory J. Mascitti
Mccarter & English, Llp - Ny Office
contact info
Phillip Pavlick
Mccarter & English
contact info
Appellee
Schiller, Knapp, Lefkowitz & Hertzel, LLP
Represented By
Michael L. Boyle
Boyle Legal, LLC
contact info
Interested Party
Christian H. Dribusch
Chapter 7 Trustee
Albany, NY 12204
Represented By
Christian H. Dribusch
Dribusch Law Firm
contact info
Notice Only Party
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee Leo W. O'Brien Federal Building 11A Clinton Ave., Room 620
Albany, NY 12207
Represented By
Amy Judith Ginsberg
Doj-Ust
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
9 9 order Stipulation and Order Wed 11/29 2:38 PM
STIPULATION/ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF APPEAL. Signed by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 11/29/2023. (jel, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
8 8 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 10/25 4:04 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by M&T Bank submitted to Judge Honorable Gary L. Sharpe. (Mascitti, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 23, 2023
7 7 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 10/23 3:48 PM
Text Only Order - On August 29, 2023, the court issued a bankruptcy scheduling notice. Appellant's brief was due on October 10, 2023. Appellant has failed to file its appellant's brief. Appellant is directed to file its brief on or before October 31, 2023. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 10/23/2023. (jel, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 06, 2023
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 09/06 10:19 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Phillip Pavlick on behalf of M&T Bank (Pavlick, Phillip)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 29, 2023
5 5 notice Bankruptcy Scheduling Notice Tue 08/29 10:46 AM
Bankruptcy Scheduling Notice: Appellant Brief due by 10/10/2023. (jel, )
Related: [-]
Monday, August 28, 2023
4 4 bktcy Designation of Record on Appeal Mon 08/28 1:53 PM
Appellee Designation of Additional Items to be Included in the Record on Appeal filed by U.S. Trustee re1 Notice of Appeal.(usbcns, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Documents Designated by Appellee
3 3 bktcy Designation of Record on Appeal Mon 08/28 1:36 PM
Appellant's Designation of Record on Appeal filed by M&T Bank re1 Notice of Appeal.(usbcns, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Ch. 11 Petition,
Att: 2 Declaration of Gary Lefkowitz,
Att: 3 Motion to Use Cash Collateral,
Att: 4 Obj. by M&T Bank,
Att: 5 Sua Sponte Order Converting Case,
Att: 6 Order Denying Use of Cash Collateral,
Att: 7 Notice Appointing Ch. 7 Trustee,
Att: 8 Motion to Abandon,
Att: 9 Limited Objection,
Att: 10 Letter requesting hearing,
Att: 11 Reply,
Att: 12 Affidavit,
Att: 13 Cert. of Service,
Att: 14 Supplemental Objection,
Att: 15 Supplemental Response,
Att: 16 Supplemental Response,
Att: 17 Response,
Att: 18 Order Granting Abandonment,
Att: 19 7/6/23 Transcript,
Att: 20 Notice of Filing of Transcript,
Att: 21 6/7/23 Transcript,
Att: 22 Notice of Filing of Transcript,
Att: 23 Notice of Appeal,
Att: 24 Appeal Cover Letter,
Att: 25 Court Certificate of Mailing,
Att: 26 Transmission Cover Sheet,
Att: 27 Transcript Ordered - U.S. Trustee,
Att: 28 Transcript Ordered - M&T Bank,
Att: 29 6/28/23 Transcript,
Att: 30 Notice of Filing of Transcript,
Att: 31 6/29/23 Transcript,
Att: 32 Notice of Filing of Transcript,
Att: 33 Transcript Ordered - M&T Bank
2 2 appeal Bankruptcy Record on Appeal Mon 08/28 12:46 PM
BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL.(usbcns, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Compliance
Tuesday, July 25, 2023
1 1 appeal Bankruptcy Appeal Tue 07/25 2:13 PM
Notice of Appeal filed with the Bankruptcy Court on 7/24/2023. Bankruptcy Court case number 23-10558 (usbcns, )
Related: [-]