California Central District Court
Judge:Josephine L Staton
Referred: Steve Kim
Case #: 2:23-cv-06007
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Jul 25, 2023
Terminated:Dec 18, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Jan 21, 2024 12:43 AM PST
Defendant
BGMK LLC
Represented By
Martin R. Berman
Law Office Of Pflaster And Berman
contact info
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Kevin Cox
Represented By
Jason J Kim
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Jason T Yoon
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Jason J. Kim
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Jason T. Yoon
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 74 minutes ago
Monday, December 18, 2023
18 18 order Dismissing Case Mon 12/18 6:15 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISMISSING Action for Failure to Prosecute by Judge Josephine L. Staton: This Response isnot sufficient to discharge the Order to Show Cause16 . As a result, the Court DISMISSES this action for Plaintiff's failure to prosecute pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Stay Case and Early Mediation (ADR-21) Mon 12/18 12:34 PM
APPLICATION to Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation, filed by Defendant BGMK LLC. (Attorney Martin R. Berman added to party BGMK LLC(pty:dft)) (Berman, Martin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, December 08, 2023
16 16 misc Response Fri 12/08 5:25 PM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Kevin Coxto Order to Show Cause,15 re: Lack of Service (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
15 15 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Wed 11/29 12:05 PM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge Josephine L. Staton: The Court, on its own motion, hereby ORDERS plaintiffs counsel, to show cause in writing no later than 12/8/2023, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. (See document for further information). (jp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
14 14 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Tue 09/26 2:38 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Counsel and/or the parties are advised that the Court has updated its procedures in civil cases, including procedures encouraging consent to the magistrate judge in ordinary civil cases; setting forth presumptive schedules for class certification motion briefing; simplifying the requirements for substituting named defendants for Doe defendants; clarifying requirements for submission of mandatory chambers copies of voluminous exhibits; substituting compliance with the Local Rule regarding limitations on the number of words in the parties briefing for the Courts previous page limitations on briefing; imposing further limitations on the number of words in reply briefs; updating the Courts procedures in the case of settlement, including procedures for orders imposing stays of proceedings, orders of dismissal, and retention of jurisdiction by the Court; imposing limitations on both the number of and the content of motions in limine; and clarifying trial exhibit preparation, including the requirement to prepare a separate binder of exhibits for each witness. These updates are found on the Courts procedures page, and/or the Courts Initial Standing Order and Civil Trial Order, attached thereto. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cbr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 16, 2023
13 13 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Wed 08/16 11:42 AM
MINUTE MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DECLINING Supplemental Jurisdiction and DISMISSING State-Law Claims Without Prejudice by Judge Josephine L. Staton: The Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiffs Unruh Act claim and other state-law claims in this action, and the claims are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to filing in state court. (See document for further information). (jp)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 11, 2023
12 12 misc Response Fri 08/11 4:01 PM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Kevin Coxto Order to Show Cause,11 re: Supplemental Jurisdiction(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Declaration
Wednesday, August 02, 2023
11 11 3 pgs order Order to Show Cause Wed 08/02 2:18 PM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) Order to Show Cause Re Supplemental Jurisdiction by Judge Josephine L. Staton: Plaintiff is ORDERED to show cause, in writing, no later than ten (10) days from the date of this Order, why the Court should not decline to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiff's Unruh Act claim and other state-law claims. (jp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 27, 2023
10 10 adr Notice to Parties ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-20) Thu 07/27 1:55 PM
Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (gga)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Thu 07/27 1:54 PM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON. (gga)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 26, 2023
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 07/26 9:01 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant BGMK LLC. (et)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Wed 07/26 8:52 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 07/26 8:52 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 07/26 8:51 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (et)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 25, 2023
4 4 notice Summons Request Tue 07/25 12:25 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Kevin Cox. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 07/25 12:24 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Tue 07/25 12:22 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Kevin Cox. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 07/25 12:21 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-35732346 - Fee: $402. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party Kevin Cox(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]