Oregon District Court
Judge:Marco A Hernandez
Case #: 3:23-cv-01083
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Case Filed:Jul 25, 2023
Terminated:Aug 08, 2023
Case in other court:Multnomah, 23CV27281
Last checked: Sunday Jan 21, 2024 1:04 AM PST
Defendant
Sunstate Equipment Co., LLC
Represented By
E. Pennock Gheen, III
Bullivant Houser
contact info
Megan S. Cook
Bullivant Houser Bailey PC
contact info
Nelly Greenberg
Bullivant Houser Bailey PC
contact info
Defendant
Arthur Tate
20612 SW Gracie
Beaverton, OR 97006
Plaintiff
Irene Ragan
Represented By
Marc A Johnston
The Johnston Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, August 08, 2023
order Dismissal -Terminate Case Tue 08/08 11:54 AM
ORDER: Pursuant to Plaintiff's Notice of Dismissal5 , this case is DISMISSED. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 8/8/2023.) (jp)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 07, 2023
5 5 notice Voluntary Dismissal of Case Mon 08/07 5:57 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Johnston, Marc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 01, 2023
4 4 oth_doc Jury Demand Tue 08/01 12:51 PM
Demand for Jury Trial by Sunstate Equipment Co., LLC . Filed by Sunstate Equipment Co., LLC. (Cook, Megan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 26, 2023
3 3 order 3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT Wed 07/26 9:15 AM
Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Marco A. Hernandez and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 11/24/2023. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 12/26/2023. Pretrial Order is due by 12/26/2023. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 7/26/2023.) (ecp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 25, 2023
2 2 oth_doc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 07/25 3:46 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Sunstate Equipment Co., LLC. (Cook, Megan)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Tue 07/25 3:40 PM
Notice of Removal of Case Number 23cv27281 from Multnomah. Filing Fee in amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9023773 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Sunstate Equipment Co., LLC. (Cook, Megan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Declaration