Original Case: 2:22-cv-00677

Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-cv-16022
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit441 Civil Rights - Voting
Case Filed:Jul 24, 2023
Terminated:Mar 14, 2025
Last checked: Monday Mar 17, 2025 3:51 AM PDT
Appellant
ANDREW D. PARKER
Represented By
Joseph Alan Pull
Parker Daniels Kibort, LLC
contact info
Andrew D. Parker
Parker Daniels Kibort, LLC
contact info
Appellant
PARKER DANIELS KIBORT, LLC
Represented By
Joseph Alan Pull
Parker Daniels Kibort, LLC
contact info
Andrew D. Parker
Parker Daniels Kibort, LLC
contact info
Appellant
KURT B. OLSEN
Represented By
Joseph Alan Pull
Parker Daniels Kibort, LLC
contact info
Andrew D. Parker
Parker Daniels Kibort, LLC
contact info
Appellant
OLSEN LAW, PC, Counsel for Plaintiffs
Represented By
Joseph Alan Pull
Parker Daniels Kibort, LLC
contact info
Andrew D. Parker
Parker Daniels Kibort, LLC
contact info
Defendant
PIMA COUNTY BOARD OF SUPERVISORS
Defendant
ADELITA GRIJALVA, as a member of the Pima County Board of Supervisors
Defendant
STEVE CHRISTY, as a member of the Pima County Board of Supervisors
Defendant
SHARON BRONSON, as a member of the Pima County Board of Supervisors
Defendant
MATT HEINZ, as a member of the Pima County Board of Supervisors
Defendant
REX SCOTT, as a member of the Pima County Board of Supervisors
Defendant
ADRIAN FONTES, Arizona Secretary of State
Defendant
MARICOPA COUNTY BOARD OF SUPERVISORS
Defendant - Appellee
THOMAS GALVIN, as a member of the Maricopa County Board of Supervisors
Represented By
Joseph E. La Rue
Maricopa County Attorney's Office
contact info
Joseph James Branco
Maricopa County Attorney's Office
contact info
Thomas Purcell Liddy
Maricopa County Attorney's Office
contact info
Emily M. Craiger
Burgess Law, LLC
contact info
Karen Hartman-Tellez
Maricopa County Attorney's Office
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
STEVE GALLARDO, as a member of the Maricopa County Board of Supervisors
Represented By
Joseph E. La Rue
Maricopa County Attorney's Office
contact info
Joseph James Branco
Maricopa County Attorney's Office
contact info
Thomas Purcell Liddy
Maricopa County Attorney's Office
contact info
Emily M. Craiger
Burgess Law, LLC
contact info
Karen Hartman-Tellez
Maricopa County Attorney's Office
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
JACK SELLERS, as a member of the Maricopa County Board of Supervisors
Represented By
Joseph E. La Rue
Maricopa County Attorney's Office
contact info
Joseph James Branco
Maricopa County Attorney's Office
contact info
Thomas Purcell Liddy
Maricopa County Attorney's Office
contact info
Emily M. Craiger
Burgess Law, LLC
contact info
Karen Hartman-Tellez
Maricopa County Attorney's Office
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
CLINT HICKMAN, as a member of the Maricopa County Board of Supervisors
Represented By
Joseph E. La Rue
Maricopa County Attorney's Office
contact info
Joseph James Branco
Maricopa County Attorney's Office
contact info
Thomas Purcell Liddy
Maricopa County Attorney's Office
contact info
Emily M. Craiger
Burgess Law, LLC
contact info
Karen Hartman-Tellez
Maricopa County Attorney's Office
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
BILL GATES, as a member of the Maricopa County Board of Supervisors
Represented By
Joseph E. La Rue
Maricopa County Attorney's Office
contact info
Joseph James Branco
Maricopa County Attorney's Office
contact info
Thomas Purcell Liddy
Maricopa County Attorney's Office
contact info
Emily M. Craiger
Burgess Law, LLC
contact info
Karen Hartman-Tellez
Maricopa County Attorney's Office
contact info
Plaintiff
KARI LAKE
Plaintiff
MARK FINCHEM


Docket last updated: 03/17/2025 3:51 AM PDT
Monday, July 24, 2023
1 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Kurt B. Olsen, Olsen Law, PC, Andrew D. Parker and Parker Daniels Kibort, LLC Mediation Questionnaire due on 07/31/2023. Transcript ordered by 08/18/2023. Transcript due 09/18/2023. Appellants Kurt B. Olsen, Olsen Law, PC, Andrew D. Parker and Parker Daniels Kibort, LLC opening brief due 10/27/2023. Appellees Steve Gallardo, Thomas Galvin, Bill Gates, Clint Hickman and Jack Sellers answering brief due 11/27/2023. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12760256] (JBS) [Entered: 07/24/2023 11:40 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 4 pgs Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule
Att: 2 2 pgs Notice to All Parties and Counsel
Att: 3 1 pgs Mediation Letter
Att: 4 22 pgs Case Opening Packet