Texas Western District Court
Judge:David Counts
Referred: Ronald C Griffin
Case #: 7:23-cv-00116
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jul 26, 2023
Terminated:Dec 05, 2023
Case in other court:Texas Eastern, 6:23-cv-00356
Last checked: Monday Jan 22, 2024 3:08 AM CST
Defendant
Jane Doe
Defendant
Anthony Goyang
Defendant
District Attorney Laura Nodolf
Defendant
Andrew Stallings
Asst. District Attorney, 385th Judicial District 310 W. Wall Street Suite 816
Midland, TX 79701
Plaintiff
Christopher R. Enderby
17512 County Road 4174 West
Lindale, TX 75771


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
11 11 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 12/06 8:19 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge David Counts. (je3)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
10 10 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend Complaint Wed 10/18 11:42 AM
ORDER DENYING7 Motion to Amend Complaint AND REQUIRING SERVICE OF ORIGINAL COMPLAINT ON DEFENDANTS Signed by Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (je3)
Related: [-]
9 9 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 10/18 11:37 AM
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTIONTO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES OR COSTS2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (je3)
Related: [-]
8 8 2 pgs order Order Wed 10/18 11:34 AM
ADVISORY TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (je3)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
order Order on Motion to Amend Complaint Tue 10/17 1:14 PM
Text Order MOOTING6 Motion to Amend Complaint. The instant motion is MOOTED because it is a duplicate of the Doc. 7 Motion to Amend Complaint. It is so ORDERED. Entered by Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (TGlc)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 16, 2023
7 7 motion Amend Complaint Mon 10/16 10:58 AM
MOTION to Amend Complaint by Christopher R. Enderby.. Motions referred to Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (je3)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Amended Complaint
Friday, October 13, 2023
6 6 motion Amend Complaint Fri 10/13 3:03 PM
MOTION to Amend Complaint by Christopher R. Enderby.. Motions referred to Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (je3) (je3)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (10/13/2023) Proposed Complaint
Wednesday, July 26, 2023
5 5 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Wed 07/26 12:36 PM
Case electronically transferred in from the Eastern District of Texas-Tyler Division; Case Number 6:23-cv-00356.
Related: [-]
4 4 2 pgs order Order Wed 07/26 11:51 AM
ORDER OF TRANSFER. It is ORDERED that this case is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Western District of Texas, Midland-Odessa Division. The Clerk of Court shall transfer the case forthwith and without delay. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 7/26/2023. (wea, 6)
Related: [-]
Interdistrict transfer to the Western District of Texas, Midland-Odessa Division. (wea, 6) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 7/26/2023.]
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 07/26 3:33 PM
Case assigned to Judge David Counts. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (je3)
Related: [-]
utility Case Transferred Out - District Transfer Wed 07/26 11:53 AM
Interdistrict transfer to the Western District of Texas, Midland-Odessa Division. (wea, 6)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 07/31 3:27 PM
Case assigned to Judge Ronald C. Griffin. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (je3)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 21, 2023
3 3 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge John D. Love. (wea, 6) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 7/26/2023.]
Related: [-]
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . MAILED Consent form to Plaintiff. (wea, 6) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 7/26/2023.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 20, 2023
2 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Christopher R. Enderby. (wea, 6) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 7/26/2023.]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against Jane Doe, Anthony Goyang, Laura Nodolf, Andrew Stallings, filed by Christopher R. Enderby.(wea, 6) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 7/26/2023.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Envelope