Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Charlene Edwards Honeywell
Referred: Sean P Flynn
Case #: 8:23-cv-01675
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Case Filed:Jul 26, 2023
Terminated:Nov 03, 2023
Last checked: Monday Jan 22, 2024 3:46 AM EST
Defendant
Summit Design + Build LLC
Represented By
Avery Holloman
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
David Lisko
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Jessica Sarah Kramer
Holland & Knight, Llp - Tampa
contact info
Plaintiff
Ruth P. Bohan
Represented By
Ashwin Robert Trehan
Wenzel Fenton Cabassa, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, January 08, 2024
25 25 utility *Remark Tue 01/09 10:52 AM
*** CASE CLOSED. (RLK)
Related: [-]
24 24 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 01/08 8:06 PM
ORDERED: This action is dismissed, with prejudice. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Senior Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 1/8/2024. (SLB)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 01/08 10:17 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Ruth P. Bohan. (Trehan, Ashwin)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 03, 2023
22 22 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 11/03 12:06 PM
60 DAY ORDER dismissing case. After that 60-day period, however, dismissal shall be with prejudice. Any pending motions are denied as moot and the Clerk is directed to terminate all deadlines and administratively close the file. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 11/3/2023. (MMS)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Notice of settlement Fri 11/03 11:09 AM
NOTICE of settlement by Ruth P. Bohan (Trehan, Ashwin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 26, 2023
20 20 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / Reply Thu 10/26 5:26 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 19 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Upon a showing of good cause, Plaintiff's deadline to respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or Transfer 16 is extended to and including November 3, 2023. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 10/26/2023. (MMS)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Extension of Time to File Response / Reply Thu 10/26 4:50 PM
Time Sensitive MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to16 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint for Improper Venue or, in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer Venue by Ruth P. Bohan. (Trehan, Ashwin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
18 18 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / Reply Wed 10/18 1:38 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 17 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Plaintiff may respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or Transfer on or before October 27, 2023. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 10/18/2023. (MMS)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Extension of Time to File Response / Reply Wed 10/18 11:44 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to16 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint for Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer Venue by Ruth P. Bohan. (Trehan, Ashwin)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
16 16 motion Dismiss Fri 09/29 3:05 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint for Improper Venue or, in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer Venue by Summit Design + Build LLC.(Lisko, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
15 15 order Order on Motion to Dismiss / Lack of Jurisdiction Tue 09/19 9:29 AM
ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot 9 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim, in light of the filing of the Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 9/19/2023. (MMS)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
14 14 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 09/15 5:09 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Summit Design + Build LLC with Jury Demand. filed by Ruth P. Bohan. Related document: 1 Complaintfiled by Ruth P. Bohan.(Trehan, Ashwin)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 28, 2023
13 13 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 08/28 12:58 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Summit Design + Build LLC. (Lisko, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 25, 2023
12 12 notice Notice of appearance Fri 08/25 3:55 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Avery Holloman on behalf of Summit Design + Build LLC (Holloman, Avery)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of appearance Fri 08/25 3:46 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Sarah Kramer on behalf of Summit Design + Build LLC (Kramer, Jessica)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Fri 08/25 3:39 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by David Lisko on behalf of Summit Design + Build LLC. Lead Counsel: David J. Lisko. (Lisko, David)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Dismiss / Lack of Jurisdiction Fri 08/25 3:27 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction for Improper Venue or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue, and Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Summit Design + Build LLC.(Lisko, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Dispute Resolution Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Bohan Signed Dispute Resolution Agreement
Friday, August 11, 2023
8 8 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 08/11 11:47 AM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Ruth P. Bohan. (Trehan, Ashwin)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of a Related Action Fri 08/11 11:45 AM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Ruth P. Bohan. Related case(s): Yes (Trehan, Ashwin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 09, 2023
6 6 service Summons returned executed Wed 08/09 3:24 PM
RETURN of service executed on August 4, 2023 by Ruth P. Bohan as to Summit Design + Build LLC. (Trehan, Ashwin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 27, 2023
5 5 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Thu 07/27 11:27 AM
NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge . (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CAB)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Thu 07/27 11:27 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement. Counsel must make their disclosures using the standard court form. The Disclosure Statement form can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CAB)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons issued Thu 07/27 10:30 AM
SUMMONS issued as to Summit Design + Build LLC. (ABC)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 07/27 9:16 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:23-cv-1675-CEH-SPF. (AM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 26, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 07/26 4:01 PM
COMPLAINT against SUMMIT DESIGN + BUILD LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-21083173) filed by RUTH P. BOHAN.(Trehan, Ashwin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons