New York Southern District Court
Judge:Mary Kay Vyskocil
Case #: 1:23-cv-06481
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause18:2333 Civil Remedies: Anti-Terrorism Act of 1991
Case Filed:Jul 26, 2023
Last checked: Monday Jan 22, 2024 3:55 AM EST
Defendant
Turkiye Halk Bankasi A.S.
Represented By
Eden Schiffmann
Williams & Connolly
contact info
Simon Latcovich
Williams & Connolly LLP
contact info
James Wills Kirkpatrick, III
Williams & Connolly LLP
contact info
Robert M Cary
Robert M. Cary
contact info
Defendant
Reza Zarrab
Plaintiff
Kathleen Alexander
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
B.D.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
B.L.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jessica Benson
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
C.D.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Maria Cardoza
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Ramiro Cardoza, Sr.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Ramiro Cardoza, Jr.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Janice Caruso
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael Collins
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
D.M.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Adam Daehling
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Brenda Daehling
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Kayla Daehling
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Kirk Daehling
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Helena Davis
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Alberto Diaz
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Anthony Diaz
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Frances Diaz
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Kayla Diaz
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Matthew Diaz
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Maximo Diaz
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Kelli-Jo Dodge
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael Donios
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
James Ellis
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Joelle Ellis
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
John Ellis
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
G.L.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
G.P.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Ashley Gerding
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Joanna Gilbert
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Patricia Goins
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Chapman Good
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Erin Goss
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Trecia Brock Hood
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Patricia Hughes
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Joseph Jones, Jr.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Barclay Kamaleson
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Cade Kamaleson
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Cedric Paul Kamaleson
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Nicole Kamaleson
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Kevin King
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Brandon Korona
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
James Landrum
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Janet Landrum
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Miranda Landrum
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Sheila Long
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Brian Martin
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Catherine Martin
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Elizabeth Martin
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Julie Martin
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Annie McBride
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Chester R. McBride, Sr.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Alexandra McClintock
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
George McClintock, III
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Kathleen McEvoy
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Michelle McEvoy
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Patrick McEvoy
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Samantha McNamara
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Stephanie Miller
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Miriam Mullen
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Nancy Mullen
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
William Mullen
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Chet Murach
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
William Murach
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
N.J.A.D.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
N.J.D.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
William Newnham
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Bruce Nichols
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jeanne Nichols
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Molly Nichols
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Anngel Norkist
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Aujza Norkist
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Hart Norkist
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Dan Olmstead
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Tammy Olmstead
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
P.D.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Joyce Paulsen
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Deborah Peters
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Dennis Peters
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Christine Phillips
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Aaron Prescott
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jacob Prescott
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Joseph Prescott
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Joshua Prescott
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Tracey Prescott
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Janice Proctor
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Dana Rainey
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Michelle Riley
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Rodney Riley
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Angel Roldan
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Michelle Rotelli
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
S.P.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Matthew Schrier
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Wendy Shedd
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Mary Smedinghoff
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Thomas Smedinghoff
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Esta Smith
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jimmy Smith
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Martha Smith
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Freddie Sutton
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Harriet Sutton
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Summer Sutton
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Emily Torian
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Joe Torian
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Nathan Torian
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Luann Varney
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Barry Welch
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Lorria Welch
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Zackary Welch
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Thomas Wickliff
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Kapriel Wilson
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Mara Wilson
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Nancy Wilson
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Baily Zimmerman
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Chris Zimmerman
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Michelle Zimmerman
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Emmitt Burns
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Daniel Hughes
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Joan Smedinghoff
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Kristine Zitny
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Lieselotte Roldan
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Mark Smedinghoff
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Matthias Roldan
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Paul Goins, III
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Regina Smedinghoff
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Samantha Roldan
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Sunderraj Kamaleson
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
William M. Burley
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Tejinder Singh
Sparacino PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, February 10, 2025
63 63 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Mon 02/10 10:38 AM
ORDER granting62 Letter Motion to Substitute Attorney. GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to terminate the motion pending at docket entry 62. SO ORDERED. Attorney James Wills Kirkpatrick, III terminated. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 2/10/2025) (tg)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
62 62 motion Substitute Attorney Fri 02/07 4:26 PM
LETTER MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Old Attorney: James W. Kirkpatrick, New Attorney: Rob Cary, Simon Latcovich, and Eden Schiffman addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from James W. Kirkpatrick dated February 7, 2025. Document filed by Turkiye Halk Bankasi A.S...(Kirkpatrick, James)
Related: [-]