Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Rodolfo A Ruiz, II
Case #: 1:23-cv-22788
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
CauseAdministrative Subpoena
Case Filed:Jul 26, 2023
Terminated:Sep 29, 2023
Last checked: Monday Jan 22, 2024 3:46 AM EST
Defendant
Advance Auto Parts, Inc.
Represented By
Jodi Nicole Cohen
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Advance Stores Company, Inc.
Represented By
Jodi Nicole Cohen
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Discount Auto Parts, LLC
Represented By
Jodi Nicole Cohen
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
US Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By
Robert Elliot Weisberg
U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
contact info
Austin Case
Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Monday, December 18, 2023
11 11 2 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Tue 12/19 11:06 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Case Closed. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 12/18/2023. See attached document for full details. (nwn)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 15, 2023
10 10 misc Status Report Fri 12/15 6:15 PM
STATUS REPORT Jointly Filed by US Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Case, Austin)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
9 9 2 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Fri 09/29 5:01 PM
Agreed Order. Case Administratively Closed. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 9/29/2023. See attached document for full details. (lgr)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Settlement Fri 09/29 3:09 PM
Joint MOTION for Settlement Agreed Order by US Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Responses due by 10/13/2023(Case, Austin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Agreed Order
Thursday, July 27, 2023
3 3 Summons Issued as to Advance Auto Parts, Inc., Advance Stores Company, Inc., Discount Auto Parts, LLC. (nwn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 26, 2023
2 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (nwn)
Related: [-]
1 1 21 pgs COMPLAINT Application for an Order to Show Cause Why Administrative Subpoenas Should Not Be Enforced against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00. USA Filer - No Filing Fee Required, filed by US Equal Employment Opportunity Commission.(Case, Austin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet for Administrative Subpoena Enforcement Action,
Att: 2 Summon(s) Summons for Advance Auto Parts, Inc.,
Att: 3 Summon(s) Summons for Discount Auto Parts, LLC,
Att: 4 Summon(s) Summons for Advance Stores Company, Inc.,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit A - Brown Charge of Discrimination,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit B - Warens Charge of Discrimination,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit C - Ramirez Charge of Discrimination,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit D - Respondent Position Statement - Brown,
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit E - Respondents' Position Statement - Warens,
Att: 10 Exhibit Exhibit F - Respondents' Position Statement - Ramirez,
Att: 11 Exhibit Exhibit G- EEOC February 2, 2022 Request for Information Brown, Warens, & Ramirez,
Att: 12 Exhibit Exhibit H - Respondents' March 14 Response to RFI - Brown with Exhibits (highlighted),
Att: 13 Exhibit Exhibit I - EEOC's April 5 Pre-Subpoena Letter Brown, Warens & Ramirez,
Att: 14 Exhibit Exhibit J - Respondents' May 2, 2022 Response to Pre-Subpoena Letters,
Att: 15 Exhibit Exhibit K - Subpoena MIA-22-04,
Att: 16 Exhibit Exhibit L - Subpoena MIA-22-05,
Att: 17 Exhibit Exhibit M - Respondents' Petitions to Revoke,
Att: 18 Exhibit Exhibit N - Respondents' Attachments A-D to Petition to Revoke or Modify,
Att: 19 Exhibit Exhibit O- Respondents' Attachment E-J to Petition to Revoke or Modify,
Att: 20 Exhibit Exhibit P - Commission's Determination Denying Petition to Revoke,
Att: 21 Exhibit Exhibit Q - Respondents' 2-23-23 Letter Responding to the Modified Subpoenas,
Att: 22 Exhibit Exhibit R - Declaration of EEOC District Director and Attachments,
Att: 23 Exhibit Exhibit S - Blank Interview Candidate Rating Sheet,
Att: 24 Exhibit Exhibit T - Retail Parts Pro Job Advertisement (highlighted),
Att: 25 Exhibit Exhibit U - Additional Job Advertisements Commercial Parts Pro, Assistant Manager (highlighted),
Att: 26 Exhibit Exhibit V [Demonstrative] - Showing Revised Subpoena Language