Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Michael R Barrett
Case #: 1:23-cv-00475
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jul 27, 2023
Terminated:Aug 09, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 23, 2024 4:09 AM EST
Defendant
Annette Chambers-Smith
Represented By
Marcy Ann Vonderwell
Ohio Attorney General
contact info
D. Chadd McKitrick
Ohio Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Deputy Warden
In his personal and professional capacity NORTHEAST OHIO CORRECTIONAL CENTER 2240 HUBBARD ROAD
YOUNGSTOWN, OH 44505
Defendant
Unit Manager Douglass
In her Personal and Professional Capacity NORTHEAST OHIO CORRECTIONAL CENTER 2240 HUBBARD ROAD
YOUNGSTOWN, OH 44505
Defendant
Core Civic Corporation
Represented By
Timothy James Bojanowski
contact info
Defendant
Doug Fender
Represented By
Timothy James Bojanowski
contact info
Defendant
Assistant Investigator Wyman
In his Personal and Professional Capcaity NORTHEAST OHIO CORRECTIONAL CENTER 2240 HUBBARD ROAD
YOUNGSTOWN, OH 44505
Represented By
Timothy James Bojanowski
contact info
Defendant
Former Warden David Bobby
Defendant
Cynthia Davis
Defendant
Chief Inspector Chris Lambert
Represented By
Marcy Ann Vonderwell
Ohio Attorney General
contact info
D. Chadd McKitrick
Ohio Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Defendant
J. Oppy
Defendant
Ryan Rush
Plaintiff
Yusuf Brown-Austin
SOUTHERN OHIO CORRECTIONAL FACILITY P.O. Box 45699
Lucasville, OH 45699
Represented By
Eric J Allen
The Law Office Of Eric J Allen Ltd
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, August 09, 2024
utility Terminate Civil Case Fri 08/09 12:41 PM
***Civil Case Terminated. (kkz)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
44 44 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 08/08 9:14 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Yusuf Brown-Austin (Allen, Eric)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
43 43 notice Notice (Other) Thu 07/11 4:52 PM
NOTICE by Defendants Doug Fender, Investigator Wyman re39 MOTION to Strike37 Response to Motion, [for Summary Disposition) (Bojanowski, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
42 42 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 07/01 1:35 PM
ORDER denying31 Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time to Perfect Service. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 7/1/2024. (kkz)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
41 41 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 06/26 12:13 PM
ORDER denying as moot9 and11 Motions to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 6/26/2024. (zmc)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
40 40 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 06/24 4:20 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re25 Supplemental MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Second Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Annette Chambers-Smith, Chris Lambert, Interested Party State of Ohio. (McKitrick, D.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 19, 2024
39 39 motion Strike Wed 06/19 7:39 PM
MOTION to Strike37 Response to Motion, by Defendants Doug Fender, Investigator Wyman. (Bojanowski, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
38 38 respm Response to Motion Thu 06/13 6:57 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re25 Supplemental MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Second Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Yusuf Brown-Austin. (Allen, Eric)
Related: [-]
37 37 respm Response to Motion Thu 06/13 5:45 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re26 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM [Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint for Relief Under 42 U.S.C. 1983 & 1985] filed by Plaintiff Yusuf Brown-Austin. (Allen, Eric)
Related: [-]
36 36 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 06/13 1:15 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re34 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply New date requested 6/14/2024. filed by Defendants Doug Fender, Investigator Wyman. (Bojanowski, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Email from PLF counsel 6-12-24
misc Notice of Corrective Docket Entry Thu 06/13 1:31 PM
Notice of Correction re: 35 Response to Motion has been restricted and refiled as36 Response in Opposition to Motion to correct the event. (zmc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
35 35 respm Response to Motion Wed 06/12 4:11 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re34 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply New date requested 6/14/2024. filed by Defendants Doug Fender, Investigator Wyman. (Bojanowski, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Email from PLF counsel 6-12-24
34 34 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 06/12 10:41 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply New date requested 6/14/2024. by Plaintiff Yusuf Brown-Austin. (Allen, Eric)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
33 33 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 06/11 2:44 PM
MOTION for Disposition of Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 26) re26 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM [Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint for Relief Under 42 U.S.C. 1983 & 1985] by Defendants Doug Fender, Investigator Wyman. (Bojanowski, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
32 32 respm Response to Motion Fri 06/07 7:38 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re31 MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 7/29/2024. filed by Defendants Doug Fender, Investigator Wyman. (Bojanowski, Timothy)
Related: [-]
31 31 motion Extension of Time Fri 06/07 9:43 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 7/29/2024. by Plaintiff Yusuf Brown-Austin. (Allen, Eric)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
30 30 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 05/10 4:37 PM
ORDER granting29 Motion to Extend Time to File Responses. Responses to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss are due on or before 6/10/2024. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 5/10/2024. (kkz)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2024
29 29 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 05/09 7:47 AM
Final MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply New date requested 6/9/2024. by Plaintiff Yusuf Brown-Austin. (Allen, Eric)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
28 28 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 04/24 1:50 PM
ORDER granting27 Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time to File Responses. Plaintiff shall file any responses to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss on or before 5/9/2024. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 4/24/2024. (kkz)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
27 27 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 04/09 10:45 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply New date requested 5/9/2024. by Plaintiff Yusuf Brown-Austin. (Allen, Eric)
Related: [-]
notice Notice Terminating Deadlines/Hearings Tue 04/09 12:12 PM
NOTICE TERMINATING DEADLINES/HEARINGS - Please be aware that the Hearing on8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction set for 4/17/2024 is hereby TERMINATED date to be reset as necessary. (kkz)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
26 26 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 03/26 8:40 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM [Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint for Relief Under 42 U.S.C. 1983 & 1985] by Defendants Doug Fender, Investigator Wyman. (Bojanowski, Timothy)
Related: [-]
25 25 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 03/26 3:52 PM
Supplemental MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Second Amended Complaint by Defendants Annette Chambers-Smith, Chris Lambert, Interested Party State of Ohio. (McKitrick, D.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
minutes Status Conference ~Util - Terminate Motions Tue 03/12 1:52 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael R. Barrett: Status Conference held on 3/12/2024; no appearance for Plaintiff; D. Chadd McKitrick and Marcy Vonderwall appeared for ODRC Defendants; Timothy Bojanowski appeared for Core Civic Corporation Defendants;8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Yusuf Brown-Austin is STAYED pending a decision on Defendants Motions to Dismiss;16 MOTION to Stay Briefing on the motion to dismiss is DENIED;17 AMENDED COMPLAINT is DEEMED as being properly filed; accordingly,18 Defendants MOTION to Strike17 Amended Complaint is DENIED; Defendants shall have fourteen (14) days to file any supplemental briefing on their Motions to Dismiss in order to respond to the Second Amended Complaint; Plaintiffs response is due according to the normal response time; and therefore Plaintiffs24 MOTION for Extension of Time is DENIED as MOOT. (bjc)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
24 24 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 02/26 1:15 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply New date requested 3/1/2024. by Plaintiff Yusuf Brown-Austin. (Allen, Eric)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2024
23 23 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 02/23 12:22 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re18 MOTION to Strike17 Amended Complaint, [Defendants' Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint for Relief Under 42 U.S.C. 1983 and 1985 (Dkt. 17) [Defendants' Joint Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint (Dkt. 18)] filed by Defendants Doug Fender, Investigator Wyman. (Bojanowski, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 15, 2024
22 22 notice Notice (Other) Thu 02/15 5:17 PM
NOTICE by Defendants Doug Fender, Investigator Wyman [Defendants' Notice of Service of Discovery] (Bojanowski, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
21 21 respm Response to Motion Fri 02/09 11:54 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re18 MOTION to Strike17 Amended Complaint, [Defendants' Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint for Relief Under 42 U.S.C. 1983 and 1985 (Dkt. 17) filed by Plaintiff Yusuf Brown-Austin. (Allen, Eric)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
20 20 notice Notice (Other) Tue 01/30 4:02 PM
NOTICE by Defendants Doug Fender, Investigator Wyman [Defendants' Notice of Service] (Bojanowski, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
19 19 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 01/26 1:28 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re16 MOTION to Stay Briefing on the motion to dismiss [Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Stay (Dkt. 16)] filed by Defendants Doug Fender, Investigator Wyman. (Bojanowski, Timothy)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Strike Fri 01/26 1:24 PM
MOTION to Strike17 Amended Complaint, [Defendants' Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint for Relief Under 42 U.S.C. 1983 and 1985 (Dkt. 17) by Defendants Doug Fender, Investigator Wyman. (Bojanowski, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 15, 2024
17 17 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 01/15 3:27 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Yusuf Brown-Austin. (Allen, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Sworn statement,
Att: 2 Affidavit Sworn statement,
Att: 3 Affidavit Sworn statement,
Att: 4 Affidavit Sworn statement,
Att: 5 Affidavit Sworn statement
Friday, January 12, 2024
16 16 motion Stay Fri 01/12 10:28 AM
MOTION to Stay Briefing on the motion to dismiss by Plaintiff Yusuf Brown-Austin. (Allen, Eric)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 01/05 11:25 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael R. Barrett: Status Conference held on 1/5/2024; Eric Allen appeared for Plaintiff; D. Chadd McKitrick and Marcy Vonderwall appeared for ODRC Defendants; Timothy Bojanowski appeared for Core Civic Corporation Defendants; the parties agree on the following deadlines and hearing dates: 1/16/2024 Plaintiff's witness disclosure due; 1/30/2024 Defedant's witness disclosure due; Written discovery regarding the8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction due 2/15/2024; any Response to written discovery due 3/15/2024; depositions shall occur between 2/1/2024 and 3/29/2024; a Status Conference is set for 3/12/2024 at 10:30 AM by Teleconference before Judge Michael R. Barrett; a Hearing as to8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction is set for 4/17/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 109 - Cincinnati before Judge Michael R. Barrett. NOTE: parties shall refer to the entry on 10/27/2023 for conferencing instructions. (kkz)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 15, 2023
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 12/15 11:37 AM
ORDER - This matter is before the Court upon Plaintiffs Motion to Extend Time to File Response. (Doc.14 ). For good cause shown, Plaintiffs Motion is hereby GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file any response to Defendants Motions to dismiss on or before January 15, 2024. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 12/15/2023. (bjc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 14, 2023
14 14 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 12/14 9:03 AM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply New date requested 1/15/2024. by Plaintiff Yusuf Brown-Austin. (Allen, Eric)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 07, 2023
minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 12/07 12:07 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael R. Barrett: Status Conference held on 12/7/2023; Eric Allen appeared for Plaintiff; D. Chadd McKitrick and Marcy Vonderwall appeared for ODRC Defendants; Timothy Bojanowski appeared for Core Civic Corporation Defendants; parties to confer and agree on scheduling and format of motion hearing; a Scheduling Conference is set for 1/5/2024 at 10:30 AM by Teleconference before Judge Michael R. Barrett. NOTE: parties shall refer to the entry on 10/27/2023 for conferencing instructions. (kkz)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 12/05 11:32 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael R. Barrett: Status Conference held on 12/5/2023; Counsel for plaintiff did not appear; Chadd McKitrick and Marcy Vonderwell appeared for ODRC Defendants; Timothy Bojanowski appeared for Core Civic Corporation Defendants; the Status Conference is reset for 12/7/2023 at 10:30 AM by Teleconference before Judge Michael R. Barrett. NOTE: parties shall refer to the entry on 10/27/2023 for conferencing instructions. (kkz)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 14, 2023
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 11/14 2:51 PM
NOTATION ORDER granting13 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 11/14/2023. (kkz)
Related: [-]
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 11/14 2:52 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM [Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint for Relief Under 42 U.S.C. 1983] . Responses due by 12/15/2023 (kkz)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 11/13 2:54 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael R. Barrett: Status Conference held on 11/13/2023; Eric Allen appeared for Plaintiff; D. Chadd McKitrick appeared for ODRC Defendants; Timothy Bojanowski appeared for Core Civic Corporation Defendants; case matters discussed; Court to review filings in preparation of next status conference; a follow up Status Conference is set for 12/5/2023 at 11:00 AM by Teleconference before Judge Michael R. Barrett. NOTE: parties shall refer to the entry on 10/27/2023 for conferencing instructions. (kkz)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 09, 2023
13 13 motion Extension of Time Thu 11/09 10:14 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 12/15/2023. by Plaintiff Yusuf Brown-Austin. (Allen, Eric)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 11/07 3:27 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael R. Barrett: Status Conference held on 11/7/2023; Eric Allen appeared for Plaintiff; D. Chadd McKitrick appeared for ODRC Defendants; Timothy Bojanowski appeared for Core Civic Corporation Defendants; case matters discussed; counsel for ODRC Defendants to confirm transfer of plaintiff; a follow up Status Conference is set for 11/13/2023 at 2:30 PM by Teleconference before Judge Michael R. Barrett. NOTE: parties shall refer to the entry on 10/27/2023 for conferencing instructions. (kkz)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 06, 2023
12 12 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 11/06 7:15 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendants Annette Chambers-Smith, Chris Lambert. (McKitrick, D.)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 11/06 3:47 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Annette Chambers-Smith, Chris Lambert. (McKitrick, D.)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 27, 2023
minutes Motion Hearing ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 10/27 12:09 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael R. Barrett: Preliminary Hearing held on 10/27/2023 re8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction; case matters discussed; a follow up Status Conference is set for 11/7/2023 at 1:30 PM by Teleconference before Judge Michael R. Barrett. NOTE: Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1274 to participate in the telephone conference with Judge Michael R. Barrett. The conference access code is 1387504 and the security code is 23475. (kkz)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2023
10 10 respm Response to Motion Thu 10/19 4:28 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendants Doug Fender, Investigator Wyman. (Bojanowski, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 13, 2023
9 9 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 10/13 4:14 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM [Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint for Relief Under 42 U.S.C. 1983] by Defendants Doug Fender, Investigator Wyman. (Bojanowski, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 05, 2023
8 8 motion Preliminary Injunction Thu 10/05 5:24 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Yusuf Brown-Austin. (Allen, Eric)
Related: [-]
7 7 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 10/05 5:23 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Yusuf Brown-Austin. (Allen, Eric)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 09/29 10:11 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines re docs5 and6 : Annette Chambers-Smith answer due 11/6/2023; Doug Fender answer due 10/16/2023. (kh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 09/28 1:28 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Annette Chambers-Smith on 9/28/2023, answer due 11/27/2023. (Allen, Eric)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 09/28 1:25 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Doug Fender on 9/28/2023, answer due 11/27/2023. (Allen, Eric)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 27, 2023
4 4 cmp Complaint Thu 07/27 8:35 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants, filed by Yusuf Brown-Austin. (Allen, Eric)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Non-Compliance of Local Rule 5.1(c) (Clerk's Notice) Thu 07/27 4:24 PM
Clerk's Notice of Non-Compliance Local Rule 5.1 (c): The Clerk's Office has reviewed your filing, docket1 Complaint, and it appears that one or more of the PDFs are not text searchable and therefore is not in compliance with Local Rule 5.1 (c). You shall refile docket1 Complaint as a text searchable document(s), linking the document back to the original entry within 24-hours. Non-Compliance Deadline due by 7/28/2023. (kh)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice (Other) Thu 07/27 12:54 PM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Yusuf Brown-Austin (Allen, Eric)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 07/27 12:48 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: BOHSDC-9526898), filed by Yusuf Brown-Austin. (Allen, Eric)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Thu 07/27 4:03 PM
If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (kh)
Related: [-]