Member Case
Lead case is: 1:23-bk-11177

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:John P Mastando III
Case #: 1:23-bk-11196
Case Filed:Jul 27, 2023
Terminated:Oct 23, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors100-199
Est. Assets$1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Est. Liabilities $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Intrepid Aviation Leasing, LLC
301 Tresser Boulevard Suite 602
Stamford, CT 06901
Represented By
Lauren C. Doyle
Milbank LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee - NY Alexander Hamilton Custom House One Bowling Green, Room 534
New York, NY 10004


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
misc Close Bankruptcy Case Wed 10/23 4:17 PM
Case Closed. (Cantrell, Deirdra)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
5 5 order ~Generic~ Order Fri 10/18 2:50 PM
Order signed on 10/18/2024 (I) Authorizing The Final Decree Closing Each Of The Chapter 11 Cases Except VAH And Vami And (II) Granting Related Relief. (Rodriguez-Castillo, Maria)
Related: [-]
Saturday, July 29, 2023
4 4 order Motion, Joint Administration Sat 07/29 12:01 AM
Order Signed on 7/28/2023 (A) Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases and (II) Granting Related Relief. All Further Pleadings and Other Papers Shall Be Filed In, and All Further Docket Entries, Shall Be Made In Case No. 23-11177 . Related [+]. (Rodriguez-Castillo, Maria)
Related: [-] 2
misc Case Association - Joint Administration Sat 07/29 1:07 AM
An order has been entered in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure directing joint administration for procedural purposes only of the chapter 11 cases as set forth in the Debtors Motion For Entry of an Order Directing Joint Administration of These Chapter 11 Cases, as filed on the docket in Case No. 23-11177 (JPM). The docket in Case No. 23-11177 (JPM) should be consulted for all matters affecting the case . (Rodriguez-Castillo, Maria)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 28, 2023
3 3 ans Statement Fri 07/28 2:19 PM
Statement / Notice of Amendment to List of Creditors who Have the 30 Largest Unsecured Claims and are not Insiders filed by Brian Kinney on behalf of Intrepid Aviation Leasing, LLC. (Kinney, Brian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 27, 2023
2 2 motion Motion, Joint Administration Thu 07/27 7:51 PM
Motion for Joint Administration / Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order Directing Joint Administration of These Chapter 11 Cases filed by Brian Kinney on behalf of Intrepid Aviation Leasing, LLC. (Kinney, Brian)
Related: [-]
1 1 22 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Thu 07/27 5:16 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Order for Relief Entered. Case Designated As Mega as per LBR 1073-1. Filed by Lauren C. Doyle of Milbank LLP on behalf of Intrepid Aviation Leasing, LLC. (Doyle, Lauren)
Related: [-]
misc Add Judge Thu 07/27 5:19 PM
Judge John P. Mastando III added to the case. (Porter, Minnie)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Thu 07/27 5:47 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 23-11196 ) [misc,824] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A16292949. Fee amount 1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #1