Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Steve C Jones
Case #: 1:23-cv-03288
Nature of Suit330 Torts - Personal Injury - Federal Employers’ Liability
Cause45:51 Railways: Fed. Employer's Liability Act
Case Filed:Jul 25, 2023
Terminated:Dec 06, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Jan 21, 2024 3:53 AM EST
Cross Claimant
CSX Transportation, Inc.
Represented By
Eric Leach
Milton, Leach, Whitman, D'Andrea & Eslinger, P.A.
contact info
Cross Defendant
Stan Koch & Sons Trucking, Inc.
Defendant
CSX Transportation, Inc.
Represented By
Eric Leach
Milton, Leach, Whitman, D'Andrea & Eslinger, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
City of Douglas Georgia
Represented By
Evan David Szczepanski
Freeman Mathis & Gary LLP
contact info
Sun S. Choy
Freeman Mathis & Gary
contact info
Defendant
Jill Ann Noland
Represented By
William Scott Weston
O'Daniel Mcdonald, LLC
contact info
Clay Seaton O'Daniel
O'Daniel Mcdonald, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Stan Koch & Sons Trucking, Inc.
Represented By
William Scott Weston
O'Daniel Mcdonald, LLC
contact info
Clay Seaton O'Daniel
O'Daniel Mcdonald, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Todd A. Crosby
Represented By
William Paul Leverett, Jr.
Cook, P.C.
contact info
Robert R Underwood, II
Cook, Leverett & Underwood, LLP
contact info
Edward Shuff Cook
Cook, Leverett & Underwood, LLP
contact info
Lindsey A. Rodgers
Cook, Leverett & Underwood, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Steven R. Saylor
Represented By
William Paul Leverett, Jr.
Cook, P.C.
contact info
Robert R Underwood, II
Cook, Leverett & Underwood, LLP
contact info
Edward Shuff Cook
Cook, Leverett & Underwood, LLP
contact info
Lindsey A. Rodgers
Cook, Leverett & Underwood, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 88 minutes ago
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
27 27 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 12/06 3:19 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Todd A. Crosby, Steven R. Saylor. (Cook, Edward)
Related: [-]
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Wed 12/06 3:29 PM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING27 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(ii). The parties further agree to bear their own attorney's fees and costs. (ddm)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Wed 12/06 3:31 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (ddm)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 03, 2023
26 26 discov Certificate of Service Fri 11/03 12:20 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery on Defendant CSXT by Todd A. Crosby, Steven R. Saylor.(Rodgers, Lindsey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 02, 2023
25 25 discov Certificate of Service Thu 11/02 4:35 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery on Defendants SKST and Noland by Todd A. Crosby, Steven R. Saylor.(Rodgers, Lindsey)
Related: [-]
24 24 discov Certificate of Service Thu 11/02 4:31 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery on Defendants SKST and Noland by Todd A. Crosby, Steven R. Saylor.(Rodgers, Lindsey)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 23, 2023
23 23 discov Initial Disclosures Mon 10/23 10:01 AM
Initial Disclosures by CSX Transportation, Inc..(Leach, Eric)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 20, 2023
22 22 discov Initial Disclosures Fri 10/20 12:59 PM
Initial Disclosures by Jill Ann Noland, Stan Koch & Sons Trucking, Inc..(O'Daniel, Clay)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2023
21 21 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines Thu 10/19 4:23 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER approving the parties'19 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. The Court grants the Parties' request for an eight month discovery period, to conclude on May 22, 2024. As this is twice the time anticipated by the Local Rules for discovery in litigation of this nature, no further extension of discovery will be permitted under any circumstances. Any motions for summary judgment or the proposed consolidated pretrial order must be filed on or before July 5, 2024, 45 days after the close of discovery as requested by the parties. If a motion for summary judgment is filed, the proposed consolidated pretrial order must be filed within 30 days after this Court's ruling thereon. If neither motion(s) for summary judgment nor the proposed pretrial order are timely filed, the Clerk is directed to submit this matter for the Court for consideration. Plaintiffs' Rule 26 expert materials must be produced no later than three months before the end of discovery, and Defendants' Rule 26 expert materials must be produced not later than two months before the close of discovery. The rebuttal expert deadline is set for 15 days after Defendants' Rule 26 expert materials deadline. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 10/19/2023. (ddm)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 13, 2023
20 20 15 pgs discov Initial Disclosures Fri 10/13 10:59 AM
Initial Disclosures by Todd A. Crosby, Steven R. Saylor.(Rodgers, Lindsey)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 09, 2023
19 19 16 pgs misc Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Mon 10/09 10:56 AM
JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Todd A. Crosby, Steven R. Saylor. (Cook, Edward)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
utility Submission to District Judge Fri 09/29 12:02 PM
Submission of12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint , to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (pdw)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 22, 2023
18 18 5 pgs misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 09/22 4:26 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Stan Koch & Sons Trucking, Inc.. (O'Daniel, Clay)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
17 17 11 pgs answer Answer to Crossclaim Thu 09/21 4:03 PM
ANSWER to13 Crossclaim by Jill Ann Noland, Stan Koch & Sons Trucking, Inc.. (O'Daniel, Clay) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 9/21/2023 to edit docket text (ddm)
Related: [-]
16 16 42 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Thu 09/21 4:01 PM
ANSWER to1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Jill Ann Noland, Stan Koch & Sons Trucking, Inc.. (O'Daniel, Clay) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 9/21/2023 to edit docket text (ddm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
15 15 6 pgs respm Reply Brief Wed 09/20 3:59 PM
REPLY BRIEF re12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by City of Douglas Georgia. (Choy, Sun)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 06, 2023
14 14 13 pgs respm Response to Motion Wed 09/06 1:29 PM
RESPONSE re12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Todd A. Crosby, Steven R. Saylor. (Rodgers, Lindsey)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 25, 2023
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Crossclaim Fri 08/25 3:45 PM
Defendant CSX Transportation, Inc's ANSWER to1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand ( Discovery ends on 1/22/2024.), CROSSCLAIM against Stan Koch & Sons Trucking, Inc. with Jury Demand by CSX Transportation, Inc..(Leach, Eric)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 23, 2023
12 12 motion Dismiss Wed 08/23 1:48 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint with Brief In Support by City of Douglas Georgia.(Choy, Sun)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief
Thursday, August 10, 2023
misc Approval of Application for Admission PHV Thu 08/10 10:58 AM
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:11 APPLICATION for Admission of Robert R. Underwood II Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12799446). Attorney Robert R Underwood, II added appearing on behalf of Todd A. Crosby, Steven R. Saylor. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (rvb)
Related: [-]
order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 08/10 12:41 PM
DOCKET ORDER granting11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Robert R. Underwood II. Entered by Judge Steve C. Jones on 8/10/2023. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(pdw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 09, 2023
11 11 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Wed 08/09 12:55 PM
APPLICATION for Admission of Robert R. Underwood II Pro Hac Vice.by Todd A. Crosby, Steven R. Saylor. (Cook, Edward)
Related: [-]
misc Return of Application for Admission PHV Wed 08/09 10:02 AM
RETURN of10 APPLICATION for Admission of Robert R. Underwood II Pro Hac Vice to attorney for correction. Reason for Return: Application does not list both plaintiffs on the application. Since the applicant is representing more than one party, he must check the box on the application that he is representing more than one party and use the text box to identify the party/parties. (rvb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 08, 2023
10 10 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Tue 08/08 2:52 PM
APPLICATION for Admission of Robert R. Underwood II Pro Hac Vice.by Todd A. Crosby, Steven R. Saylor. (Cook, Edward)
Related: [-]
misc Return of Application for Admission PHV Tue 08/08 9:06 AM
RETURN of9 APPLICATION for Admission of Robert R. Underwood II Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12799446) to attorney for correction. Reason for Return: Application is not properly formatted. Please use the form on the court's website. After you complete the form, select Create Application. The application should be 4 pages with the appropriate size margins and font. Additionally, the assigned judge's initials are SCJ. Please correct and resubmit. (rvb)
Related: [-]
utility Docket Correction Tue 08/08 10:26 AM
Notification of Docket Correction re [4,5] Waivers of Service Executed. The answer deadlines have been corrected. Defendant Jill Ann Noland's answer is due by 09/26/2023. Stan Koch & Sons Trucking, Inc.'s answer is due by 09/26/2023. (ddm)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 07, 2023
9 9 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Mon 08/07 8:01 PM
APPLICATION for Admission of Robert R. Underwood II Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12799446).by Todd A. Crosby, Steven R. Saylor. (Cook, Edward)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Return of Service Executed Mon 08/07 12:50 PM
Return of Service Executed by Steven R. Saylor, Todd A. Crosby. City of Douglas Georgia served on 8/2/2023, answer due 8/23/2023. (Cook, Edward)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Return of Service Executed Mon 08/07 12:46 PM
Return of Service Executed by Steven R. Saylor, Todd A. Crosby. CSX Transportation, Inc. served on 8/4/2023, answer due 8/25/2023. (Cook, Edward)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 04, 2023
6 6 notice Notice of Filing Fri 08/04 5:15 PM
COURT'S NOTICE Of Filing INSTRUCTIONS FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE STEVE C. JONES.(pdw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 01, 2023
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 08/01 11:34 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Steven R. Saylor, Todd A. Crosby. Stan Koch & Sons Trucking, Inc. waiver mailed on 7/28/2023, answer due 10/26/2023. (Cook, Edward)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 08/01 11:32 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Steven R. Saylor, Todd A. Crosby. Jill Ann Noland waiver mailed on 7/28/2023, answer due 10/26/2023. (Cook, Edward)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 31, 2023
3 3 misc Letter re:83.1 Mon 07/31 2:12 PM
Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Robert R Underwood, II. Clerk to follow-up by 8/10/2023. (rvb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 25, 2023
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued Thu 07/27 8:14 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Stan Koch & Sons Trucking, Inc, Jill Ann Noland, City of Douglas Georgia, CSX Transportation, Inc. (kng)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 07/27 8:11 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Steven R. Saylor, Todd A. Crosby. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-12768602).(kng)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet