Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Leo T Sorokin
Case #: 1:23-cv-11693
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Jul 27, 2023
Terminated:Jan 23, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 23, 2024 4:02 AM EST
Counter Claimant
American iGaming Solutions, LLC
Represented By
Emir Sehic
Sehic Law, PLLC
contact info
Richard I. Dreitzer
Fennemore Craig, P.C.
contact info
Counter Claimant
Jason A. Rosenberg
Represented By
Emir Sehic
Sehic Law, PLLC
contact info
Richard I. Dreitzer
Fennemore Craig, P.C.
contact info
Counter Defendant
Isaac Akiva
Represented By
Walter H. Jacobs
Walter H. Jacobs, M.D., J.D. Attorney At Law
contact info
Counter Defendant
Headway Consulting Services, LLC
Represented By
Walter H. Jacobs
Walter H. Jacobs, M.D., J.D. Attorney At Law
contact info
Defendant
American iGaming Solutions, LLC
2720 Blairgowrie Drive
Henderson, NV 89044
Represented By
Emir Sehic
Sehic Law, PLLC
contact info
Richard I. Dreitzer
Fennemore Craig, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Jason A. Rosenberg
2720 Blairgowrie Drive
Henderson, NV 89044
Represented By
Emir Sehic
Sehic Law, PLLC
contact info
Richard I. Dreitzer
Fennemore Craig, P.C.
contact info
Mediator
Judge Marianne B. Bowler
U.S. District Court 1 Courthouse Way
Boston, MA 02210
Plaintiff
Isaac Akiva
160 Carlton Lane
North Andover, MA 01845
Represented By
Walter H. Jacobs
Walter H. Jacobs, M.D., J.D. Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Headway Consulting Services, LLC
160 Carlton Lane
North Andover, MA 01845
Represented By
Walter H. Jacobs
Walter H. Jacobs, M.D., J.D. Attorney At Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Monday, May 06, 2024
36 36 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 05/06 5:28 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint by Isaac Akiva, Headway Consulting Services, LLC. (Jacobs, Walter)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
35 35 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 04/22 8:12 AM
District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered: re34 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to May 6, 2024 to Respond to Nisi Order. ALLOWED. (Dore, Samantha)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 21, 2024
34 34 3 pgs motion Extension of Time Sun 04/21 10:05 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to May 6, 2024 to Respond to Nisi Order by Isaac Akiva, Headway Consulting Services, LLC.(Jacobs, Walter)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
33 33 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Mon 03/25 8:06 AM
District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered: re32 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to April 22, 2024 to File. ALLOWED. (Dore, Samantha)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
32 32 motion Extension of Time to File Document Fri 03/22 4:01 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to April 22, 2024 to File by Isaac Akiva, Headway Consulting Services, LLC.(Jacobs, Walter)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
31 31 order Settlement Order of Dismissal Tue 01/23 4:07 PM
District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. 60 DAY SETTLEMENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL& CLOSING ORDER (Dore, Samantha)
Related: [-]
30 30 adr Report of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider Tue 01/23 3:59 PM
REPORT of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider. Settled. Your clerk should enter a 60 day order of dismissal.(Simeone, Maria)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
28 28 notice Notice of ADR Conference Mon 11/27 2:00 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of ADR Conference. The Alternative Dispute Resolution Hearing has been set for 1/23/2024 10:00 AM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. TRIAL COUNSEL and ALL NAMED PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANTS are ORDERED to be present and to have full settlement authority UNLESS EXCUSED BY THE COURT VIA MOTION. A brief mediation memorandum in double spaced format, addressing both the merits of the case and the filing party's settlement position should be submitted to the court via email as an attachment to maria_simeone@mad.uscourts.gov THREE BUSINESS DAYS before the hearing. The mediation memo should be marked "Confidential - Not for Docketing" and is not to be served upon opposing parties. It shall be understood (a) that all parties and counsel will participate in this court-sponsored mediation in good faith and with the interest of settling the matter on mutually acceptable terms, (b) that the entire mediation process, including all communications during any in-person, video or audio part thereof, is confidential, (c) that all statements made during the course of mediation are privileged settlement discussions, made without prejudice to any party's legal position, and inadmissible for any purpose in any legal proceeding, (d) that no party, participant, or representative shall seek in any proceeding to hereafter compel the mediator to testify and/or produce any document with respect to the mediation, and (e) that all parties, counsel and other participants agree that, by participating in this court-sponsored mediation, they are bound by these conditions and shall keep confidential all communications exchanged during the mediation process. This hearing will be held in a remote proceeding unless the parties jointly agree to proceed in person at which point the mediation can then be converted to an in person proceeding. Counsel shall review the Zoom process and technical procedures with their clients and conduct a successful test run prior to the date of the mediation to ensure accessibility. Counsel are asked to accommodate this date. In the event this date poses a serious conflict, or any party believes that the case is not ripe for mediation, please do NOT contact the Courtroom Deputy directly regarding mediation scheduling; instead, the parties are to confer promptly and file on CM/ECF a motion to cancel the mediation or to continue the mediation, as appropriate. In the case of motions to continue the mediation, the parties should include therein several proposed dates for which all counsel and principals are available. (Simeone, Maria)
Related: [-]
27 27 utility Notice of Assignment to ADR Provider Mon 11/27 12:59 PM
Notice of assignment to ADR Provider. Judge Marianne B. Bowler appointed.(Simeone, Maria)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2023
26 26 order Order Referring Case to ADR Mon 11/20 10:15 AM
District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution. This case is referred for mediation as soon as possible after January 1, 2024. (Dore, Samantha)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 17, 2023
25 25 misc Status Report Fri 11/17 7:20 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report Regarding Pre-Mediation Discovery by American iGaming Solutions, LLC, Jason A. Rosenberg. (Dreitzer, Richard)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 06, 2023
24 24 order Order Mon 11/06 8:32 AM
District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered: re23 Joint Status Report Pursuant To ECF No. 22 And Joint Request For Additional Time To Identify Pre-Mediation Discovery. ALLOWED. (Dore, Samantha)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 03, 2023
23 23 misc Status Report Fri 11/03 7:01 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report Pursuant To ECF No. 22 And Joint Request For Additional Time To Identify Pre-Mediation Discovery by American iGaming Solutions, LLC, Jason A. Rosenberg. (Dreitzer, Richard)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 27, 2023
22 22 minutes Motion Hearing 1 - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Set Deadlines Fri 10/27 12:27 PM
Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: Motion Hearing held on 10/27/2023 re4 MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S. District Court of Nevada filed by Jason A. Rosenberg, American iGaming Solutions, LLC. Parties Issac Akiva (in person) and Jason Rosenberg (by video) appear for the hearing. Court hears from the parties regarding issues in the case. Court hears argument on motion. Court takes the motion under advisement. Court discusses the Court's mediation program and process. Parties will file a joint status report by 11/3/2023 indicating if they wish to go to mediation, what pre-mediation discovery would be necessary and a timeframe for any pre-mediation discovery. (Court Reporter: Rachel Lopez at raeufp@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Walter Jacobs for the plaintiff and Richrd Dreitzer (by video) and Emir Sehic for defendants) (Belmont, Kellyann)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
21 21 misc Errata Wed 10/25 1:40 PM
Errata by American iGaming Solutions, LLC, Jason A. Rosenberg to20 Response to Court Order . (Dreitzer, Richard)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Response to Court Order Wed 10/25 12:47 PM
RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER by American iGaming Solutions, LLC, Jason A. Rosenberg Defendants' Statement of Citizenship .(Dreitzer, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Saturday, October 21, 2023
19 19 misc Statement of fact Sat 10/21 12:37 PM
STATEMENT of facts Regarding Citizenship .(Jacobs, Walter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Business Entity Summary
Friday, October 20, 2023
18 18 notice Notice Setting or Resetting Hearing on Motion Fri 10/20 5:04 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion4 MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S. District Court of Nevada. : Motion Hearing set for 10/27/2023 11:00 AM in Courtroom 13 (In person only) before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. (Belmont, Kellyann)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Order Fri 10/20 5:03 PM
District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Diversity provides the basis for this Court's subject matter jurisdiction over this action. Two parties are LLCs (one a plaintiff and one a defendant). The citizenship of these entities for diversity purposes flows from the citizenship of their members, including the members of any LLC members. D.B. Zwirn Special Opportunities Fund, L.P. v. Mehrotra , 661 F.3d 124, 126-27 (1st Cir. 2011). By close of business on Wednesday, October 26, 2023, each LLC party shall file a statement of the citizenship of each of its members. For each LLC member, the statement shall also state the citizenship of the members of each such LLC member. The Court will hold a hearing on the Motion to Transfer (Doc. No. 4) on Friday, October 27, 2023, at 11:00 a.m. This hearing will proceed in person. Counsel from Massachusetts shall appear in person. Out of state counsel may appear by Zoom, if they so prefer, by making the arrangements with the clerk. Both Mr. Akiva and Mr. Rosenberg shall attend the hearing. They may attend by Zoom. No one else may attend by Zoom in the absence of express order of the Court.(Belmont, Kellyann)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 14, 2023
16 16 service Certificate of Service pursuant to LR 5.2 Mon 08/14 2:06 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE pursuant to LR 5.2 by American iGaming Solutions, LLC, Jason A. Rosenberg re15 Reply to Response to Motion . (Dreitzer, Richard)
Related: [-]
15 15 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 08/14 1:27 PM
REPLY to Response to4 MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S. District Court of Nevada. filed by American iGaming Solutions, LLC, Jason A. Rosenberg.(Dreitzer, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A
14 14 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Mon 08/14 9:32 AM
District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re13 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue by American iGaming Solutions, LLC, Jason A. Rosenberg. ALLOWED; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Belmont, Kellyann)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 11, 2023
13 13 motion Leave to File Document Fri 08/11 7:47 PM
MOTION for Leave to File a Reply in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue by American iGaming Solutions, LLC, Jason A. Rosenberg.(Dreitzer, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1
Wednesday, August 09, 2023
12 12 notice Certificate of Consultation pursuant to LR 7.1 Wed 08/09 5:14 PM
CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION pursuant to LR 7.1 by Richard I. Dreitzer on behalf of All Defendants. (Dreitzer, Richard)
Related: [-]
11 11 respm Opposition to Motion Wed 08/09 4:49 PM
Opposition re4 MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S. District Court of Nevada. filed by Isaac Akiva, Headway Consulting Services, LLC.(Jacobs, Walter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 2 pgs Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8
Wednesday, August 02, 2023
10 10 2 pgs order Order Wed 08/02 8:15 AM
District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: New Civil Cases General Procedural ORDER entered. (Dore, Samantha)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 01, 2023
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Tue 08/01 7:30 PM
Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Jason A. Rosenberg, American iGaming Solutions, LLC.(Dreitzer, Richard)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 08/01 6:09 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Richard I. Dreitzer on behalf of American iGaming Solutions, LLC, Jason A. Rosenberg (Dreitzer, Richard)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 28, 2023
7 7 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Fri 07/28 9:09 AM
District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added David A. McCarville and Richard I. Dreitze. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account. You must put the docket number on your form when registering or it will be rejected. Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions [LINK:https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm] . A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Dore, Samantha)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel Fri 07/28 9:03 AM
Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (Dore, Samantha)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Case Assignment Fri 07/28 8:56 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Cook, Savannah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 27, 2023
4 4 motion Transfer Case Thu 07/27 7:30 PM
MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S. District Court of Nevada. by American iGaming Solutions, LLC, Jason A. Rosenberg.(Sehic, Emir)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
3 3 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 07/27 7:19 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of David A. McCarville, Richard I. Dreitzer Filing fee: $ 250, receipt number AMADC-9967030 by American iGaming Solutions, LLC, Jason A. Rosenberg.(Sehic, Emir)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Certification of David A. McCarville,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Certification of Richard I. Dreitzer
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 07/27 7:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Emir Sehic on behalf of American iGaming Solutions, LLC, Jason A. Rosenberg (Sehic, Emir)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 07/27 7:04 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American iGaming Solutions, LLC, Jason A. Rosenberg ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9967005 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid)(Sehic, Emir)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Category Form,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1,
Att: 4 Exhibit 2,
Att: 5 Exhibit 3,
Att: 6 Exhibit 4,
Att: 7 Exhibit 5,
Att: 8 Exhibit 6,
Att: 9 Exhibit 7,
Att: 10 Exhibit 8